Christina Felts v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-16314

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 1:32 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109513159 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 06/19/2017 in Miami, Florida. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109513159 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 06/19/2017 in Miami, Florida. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109481930 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Assigned to tentative calendar number 22 in Miami during the week of June 19, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109481930 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Assigned to tentative calendar number 22 in Miami during the week of June 19, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109423029 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Assigned to tentative calendar number 20 in Atlanta during the week of May 15, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109423029 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Assigned to tentative calendar number 20 in Atlanta during the week of May 15, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109405583 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Assigned to tentative calendar number 19 in Atlanta during the week of May 8, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109405583 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Assigned to tentative calendar number 19 in Atlanta during the week of May 8, 2017. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 01109383127 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Reply Brief filed by Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Aaron Swift)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109383127 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Reply Brief filed by Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Aaron Swift)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109355381 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Amended Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant Christina Felts.
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109355381 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Amended Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant Christina Felts.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109350737 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RETURNED UNFILED: Motion to seal documents [8014737-2] received from Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A. is returned unfiled as unnecessary.
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109350737 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RETURNED UNFILED: Motion to seal documents [8014737-2] received from Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A. is returned unfiled as unnecessary.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109347415 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109347415 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109337647 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109337647 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109280656 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Aaron M. Swift for Christina Felts. (ECF: Aaron Swift)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109280656 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Aaron M. Swift for Christina Felts. (ECF: Aaron Swift)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109280286 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Appendix filed [Seven (7) VOLUMES] by Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109280286 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Appendix filed [Seven (7) VOLUMES] by Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109272553 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Appellant's brief filed by Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109272553 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Appellant's brief filed by Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109230813 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109209924 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Christina Felts. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/09/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109209594 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. No hearings.
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109209440 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109209437 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109209434 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ian Richard Leavengood for Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109208409 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda M. Reck for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Linda Reck)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109208388 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michele L. Stocker for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Michele Stocker)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109208388 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michele L. Stocker for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Michele Stocker)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109208382 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly S. Mello for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109208382 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly S. Mello for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109192356 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christina Felts on 09/29/2016. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 10/21/2016 as to Appellant Christina Felts
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109192356 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Christina Felts on 09/29/2016. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 10/21/2016 as to Appellant Christina Felts
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109230813 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Kimberly Mello)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109209924 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Christina Felts. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/09/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109209594 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. No hearings.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109209440 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109209437 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ian Richard Leavengood for Appellant Christina Felts. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109209434 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ian Richard Leavengood for Christina Felts. (ECF: Ian Leavengood)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109208409 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda M. Reck for Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (ECF: Linda Reck)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?