Charles Steed v. Equifax Information Services
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-16315

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 12:09 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010024207 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: The parties' "Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice" is GRANTED. This appeal is dismissed with prejudice. [8405254-2] (EEC, RSR and PEH) [Entered: 03/26/2018 10:43 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010014483 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8405254-1] (ECF: Zachary McEntyre) [Entered: 03/19/2018 02:56 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109933059 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER: The joint motion to extend the time for filing a motion to dismiss the appeal, up to and including March 19, 2018, is GRANTED. Further extensions of time are unlikely to be granted, barring extenuating circumstances. [8355256-2] (RSR) [Entered: 01/25/2018 09:22 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109928326 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to stay further appellate proceedings filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8355256-1] (ECF: Zachary McEntyre) [Entered: 01/23/2018 11:18 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109886656 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER: The mediator's final report dated December 18, 2017, reports that "the parties have agreed on terms to settle this matter and to result in a dismissal of the appeal, which counsel request they be allowed to finalize by January 17, 2018." Based on this final report, the parties shall finalize their settlement of this matter and dismiss this appeal by January 17, 2018. (RSR) [Entered: 12/20/2017 05:18 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109769864 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER: The mediator has requested that the due date for the mediator's final mediation report, originally set for June 27, 2017, and then extended to September 28, 2017, be extended to December 18, 2017. The mediator's request is GRANTED. The mediator's final mediation report is due December 18, 2017. (RSR) [Entered: 10/05/2017 05:11 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109514075 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER: After hearing oral argument in this appeal and conferring about it, the Court is of the opinion that the case can and should be settled. Under FRAP 33 and 11th Circuit Rule 33-1, the case is referred to the Kinnard Mediation Center in Atlanta for mediation. The parties and their counsel are directed to telephone the mediators at 404-335-6260 no later than seven days from the date of this order to schedule a convenient time and place to explore a resolution of their differences. The mediator will issue a report to the Court not later than sixty days from the date of this order, unless that deadline is extended by the Court. The Court will consider extending the deadline if the mediator requests it and indicates that progress is being made toward a settlement and that an extension would be helpful in bringing one about. The Court will not enter any decision in the appeal until the expiration of the deadline or extended deadline, unless it is advised by the mediator before then that there will be no settlement. See order for complete text. (EEC, RSR and PEH) [Entered: 04/28/2017 01:46 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109269496 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Micah S. Adkins for Charles Edward Steed and Amy Summers is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required membership renewal form.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109267904 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Appellant's brief filed by Charles Edward Steed and Amy Summers. (ECF: James Francis)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109265879 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Micah S. Adkins for Charles Edward Steed and Amy Summers. (ECF: Micah Adkins)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109256273 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meryl W. Roper for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (ECF: Meryl Roper)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109253433 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James A. Francis for Charles Edward Steed and Amy Summers. (ECF: James Francis)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 98 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?