Dixon v. A Better Way Wholesale Autos,
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2852

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2017 at 11:38 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [2035053] [16-2852] [Entered: 05/15/2017 11:16 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED. Service date 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2015564] [16-2852] [Entered: 04/20/2017 11:50 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2015027] [16-2852] [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:36 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [2003279] [16-2852] [Entered: 04/03/2017 04:47 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [94], on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED.[2002314] [16-2852] [Entered: 03/31/2017 04:45 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kenneth Votre, Esq. for Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989785] [16-2852] [Entered: 03/15/2017 05:00 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Brian Lewis Bromberg for Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989708] [16-2852] [Entered: 03/15/2017 04:31 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989094] [16-2852] [Entered: 03/15/2017 12:00 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Karen Dixon Brief due date as 03/15/2017, FILED.[1936244] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/28/2016 11:12 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, informing Court of proposed due date 03/15/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 12/27/2016 by CM/ECF.[1935868] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/27/2016 05:04 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/22/2016 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email. [1934619] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/22/2016 06:13 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/22/2016 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email. [1934592] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/22/2016 05:19 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Supplemental Appendix volumes 1-2, [76], on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED.[1934363] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/22/2016 03:35 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion to extend time in light of the dismissal and subsequent reinstatement of the appeal [46] filed by Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. [1931708][75] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/20/2016 11:43 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [70] filed by Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. [1931504][73] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/20/2016 10:23 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1931246] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/19/2016 06:12 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, US mail. [1929747] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/16/2016 12:01 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Appendix, [52], on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED.[1929262] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/15/2016 04:13 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1928027] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/14/2016 03:43 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion to reinstate appeal [55] filed by Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., by RKW, FILED. [1927511][58] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/14/2016 10:57 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/12/2016 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email. [1925670] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/12/2016 04:42 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/12/2016 by 3rd party, CM/ECF, email. [1925606] [16-2852] [Entered: 12/12/2016 03:39 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ORDER, dated 09/26/2016, setting Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc.'s brief and appendix filing date for on or before 11/28/2016, FILED.[1870390] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/26/2016 10:01 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1870114] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/23/2016 04:40 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER, assigning Robert Kheel, Court-Appointed Mediator, FILED.[1866345] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/20/2016 09:45 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CORRECTED ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1862737] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/14/2016 11:07 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 12/23/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2016 by CM/ECF.[1859773] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/09/2016 01:07 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED. Service date 09/09/2016 by CM/ECF. [1859741] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/09/2016 12:40 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1859537] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/09/2016 11:01 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE, to Appellee Karen Dixon , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1855363] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/02/2016 08:54 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., past due material(s) to be submitted by 09/12/2016, SENT.[1855356] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/02/2016 08:51 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/29/2016 by CM/ECF.[1851868] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/29/2016 04:36 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [10], on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED.[1851031] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/29/2016 08:44 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1850248] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/26/2016 11:34 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1850243] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/26/2016 11:32 AM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1911937] [16-2852] [Entered: 11/22/2016 09:36 AM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED. Service date 09/28/2016 by CM/ECF. [1872976] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/28/2016 01:07 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [40], on behalf of Appellee Karen Dixon, FILED.[1872958] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/28/2016 12:45 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              AMENDED FORM D, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/27/2016 by email.[1872209] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/27/2016 04:16 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                DISTRICT COURT ORDER RE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT, dated 07/22/2016, RECEIVED.[1843946] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/18/2016 11:11 AM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amended Form D, [34], on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED.[1872193] [16-2852] [Entered: 09/27/2016 04:10 PM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant A Better Way Wholesale Autos, Inc., FILED. [1843944] [16-2852] [Entered: 08/18/2016 11:06 AM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?