Lewis v. Midland Funding LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2807

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 26, 2016 at 11:25 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 09/22/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1882948] [16-2807] [Entered: 10/13/2016 10:12 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PAPERS, objection to motion to dismiss appeal, RECEIVED.[1871682] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/27/2016 11:36 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1869087] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/22/2016 04:01 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss [17] filed by Appellee Midland Funding LLC, by RAK, RCW, PWH, copy to pro se, FILED. [1869085][27] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/22/2016 04:00 PM]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Appellee's Designation of Additional Transcript, on behalf of Appellee Midland Funding LLC, FILED. Service date 09/13/2016 by US mail.[1862321] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/13/2016 04:46 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/13/2016, on behalf of Appellee Midland Funding LLC , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 09/13/2016 by US mail.[1862317] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/13/2016 04:45 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Motion to Dismiss Appeal, on behalf of Appellee Midland Funding LLC, FILED. Service date 09/12/2016 by US mail.[1861228] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/12/2016 04:55 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Midland Funding LLC, FILED. Service date 09/12/2016 by US mail. [1861070] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/12/2016 03:32 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jake Lewis, informing Court of proposed due date 11/09/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2016 by US mail.[1854308] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/01/2016 09:48 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jake Lewis, FILED. Service date 08/27/2016 by US mail.[1854304] [16-2807] [Entered: 09/01/2016 09:48 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 28 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?