Citizens For Balanced Use v. Erickson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00017
District Judge Sam E Haddon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 28, 2016 at 11:41 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Citizens For Balanced Use, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine A. Laughner +1 406 585 0888 +1 406 551 1059 cathyl@bkbh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN, P.C. - BOZEMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY M. Christy S. McCann +1 406 443 6820 +1 406 443 6883 christy@bkbh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle W. Nelson +1 406 587 0618 +1 406 587 5144 knelson@goetzlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Mary Erickson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Cotter +1 406 247 4689 +1 406 657 6055 michael.cotter@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared S Pettinato +1 202 305 0203 +1 202 305 0274 Jared.Pettinato@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Forest Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Cotter +1 406 247 4689 +1 406 657 6055 michael.cotter@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared S Pettinato +1 202 305 0203 +1 202 305 0274 Jared.Pettinato@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
No Logo Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny K. Harbine +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 jharbine@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Helle +1 406 589 9699 shelle@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Honnold +1 406 586 9699 +5869 586 586 9695 dhonnold@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org
No Logo Montana Wilderness, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny K. Harbine +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 jharbine@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Helle +1 406 589 9699 shelle@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Honnold +1 406 586 9699 +5869 586 586 9695 dhonnold@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org
No Logo The Wilderness Society, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny K. Harbine +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 jharbine@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Helle +1 406 589 9699 shelle@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas L. Honnold +1 406 586 9699 +5869 586 586 9695 dhonnold@earthjustice.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Catherine A. Laughner and M. Christy S. McCann terminated. ORDERED: 1. Catherine A. Laughner, M. Christy S. McCann Motion for Order Authorizing W/D of Cnsl is GRANTED. 2. Chatherine A. Laughner and M. Christy S. McCann are relieved of responsibility as cnsl for Pla. Kyle W. Nelson will continue as cnsl of record. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/24/2012. (ELL, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine A. Laughner appearing for Plaintiff Citizens For Balanced Use (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Consent to Withdrawal of Counsel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (Laughner, Catherine) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society, United States Forest Service, Mary Erickson against Citizens For Balanced Use Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2012. (ELL, ) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. 1. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 2.Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary judgment is GRANTED. 3. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 4. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/25/2012. (ELL, ) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam E Haddon: Time Start at 10:02 a..Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2012 re 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Citizens For Balanced Use, 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Forest Service, Mary Erickson, 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society, Greater Yellowstone Coalition. Prsent in courtroom are Kyle Nelson for Plaintiff, Jared Pettinato for USFS and Sean Helle for intervenors. Stmts by ea cnsl. Matter will be taken under advisement. Charts used as demonstrations during hearing will be held in the Clerk's office for the Court's reference. Court recesses at 10:50 a.m. (Court Reporter Tina Brilz.) (ELL, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment, 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 at 10:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/29/2012. (ELL, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Brief/Response to Order to File Supplemental Briefs filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Brief/Response to Order for Supplemental Briefing filed by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Brief/Response to Order Directing Briefs on the Remaining Issues for the Court to Decide filed by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1: Declaration of Kimberly Schlenker, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A: February 29, 2012, Presentation Summary) (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Erickson, The Wilderness Society. (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/13/2012. (CRM, ) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sean M. Helle appearing for Amicus Parties Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Statement of Genuine Issues re: 59 Response to Motion filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order No: 10-11-00-02, # 2 Exhibit Order No: 11-11-00-03) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE to Motion re 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society filed by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re 56 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Sean M. Helle appearing for Amicus Parties Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Helle on behalf of Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 53 Motion to Vacate. ORDERED: 1. The motion is GRANTED. 2. The Court's 8/23/11 Order staying proceedings in this case is VACATED. 3. Dft-Intervenors MT Wilderness Assoc, Greater Yellowstone Coalition and The Wilderness Society (collectively, Intervenors) will file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opening brief on or before 12/9/11. 4. Pla Citizens for Balanced Use will file any resp brf on or before 1/6/12 and 5. Intervenors and Dfts Erickson and the USFS will file any separate reply brfs on or before 1/20/12. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/28/2011. (ELL, ) Modified on 11/28/2011 to correct date (ELL, ). (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          JOINT MOTION TO VACATE THE STAY ORDER AND FOR A SCHEDULING ORDER AND STATUS REPORT , Third, Joint Motion to Vacate the Stay Order, and Joint Motion for a Scheduling Order by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1: Order, Mont. Wilderness Ass'n v. McAllister, No. 09-36051 (9th Cir. Nov. 8, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 2: Forest Service Order Number 11-11-00-03, # 4 Exhibit 3: Forest Service Order Number 11-11-00-03 Map) (Pettinato, Jared) Modified on 11/28/2011 to convert this entry into the correct Motion as it was filed using an incorrect event (ELL, ). (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STATUS REPORT , JOINT, by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay; granting 49 Motion to Vacate. ORDERED: 1. The parties Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings is GRANTED. 2. All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending resolution of settlement negotiations in the Weldon case. 3. The 9/9/11 ddl for submission of position stmts and status conf set for 9/16/11 are VACATED. 4. The parties shall file a joint status report on the progress of settlement negotiations in the Weldon case on or before 9/30/11 and on or before the final business day of ea mo. thereafter pending resolution of settlement negotiations in the Weldon case. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/23/2011. (ELL, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay re 48 Order Setting,, Joint MOTION to Vacate 48 Order Setting, Jared S. Pettinato appearing for Plaintiff Citizens For Balanced Use, Defendants Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service, Amicus Parties Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit JS-1, Ninth Circuit Order in Weldon Regarding Scheduling, # 3 Exhibit JS-2, Ninth Circuit Order in Weldon Regarding Mediation) (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Order Setting: The Court will conduct a status conf at 9:30 am on 9/16/11 at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthosue in Butte, Montana. Status Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 09:30 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/4/2011. (ELL, ) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MANDATE of USCA as to 14 Notice of Appeal, (ELL, ) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        OPINION/MEMORANDUM of USCA as to 14 Notice of Appeal REVERSED AND REMANDED. (ELL, ) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment, 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Statement of Genuine Issues re: 43 Response to Motion, filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Declarations) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment And Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 30 filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Declarations) (Nelson, Kyle) Modified on 5/23/2011 to add link re reply to mot for sum jgmt (ELL, ). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amicus Curiae Brief) filed by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Preso, Timothy) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society. (Preso, Timothy) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Statement of Genuine Issues re: 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Excerpts from the Transcript of the Joint Hearing on S. 3091 and S. 2926 (Mar. 22, 1976), # 2 Cent. Mont. Wildlands v. Kimball, No. 04-175-M-DWM (D. Mont. Sept. 1., 2004)) (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Jared S. Pettinato appearing for Defendants Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Ex. 1: Excerpts from the Transcript of the Joint Hearing on S. 3091 and S. 2926 (Mar. 22, 1976), # 3 Cent. Mont. Wildlands v. Kimball, No. 04-175-M-DWM (D. Mont. Sept. 1., 2004), # 4 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 5 Defendants' Statement of Genuine Issues) (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File to File an Amicus-Curiae Brief. HEREBY ORDERED that Montana Wilderness Assoc, Greater Yellowstone Coalition and the Wildesness Society be permitted to file an Amicus-Curiae Brief in support of Defendants no later than 7 days after Defendants file their principal brief. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/29/2011. (ELL, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File an AMICUS-CURIAE BRIEF Timothy J. Preso, Jenny K. Harbine, Douglas L. Honnold appearing for Interested Parties Greater Yellowstone Coalition, Montana Wilderness, The Wilderness Society (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ELL, ) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                WITHDRAWAL of Motion re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment, 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support by Citizens For Balanced Use filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 30 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment Kyle W. Nelson appearing for Plaintiff Citizens For Balanced Use (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED: 1. Pla unopposed mot to amend pla's cross mot for sum jgmt, memo in support of cross mot for sum jgmt and stmt of undisputed facts is GRANTED. 2. Pla shall file its amended cross mot for sum jgmt, memo in support of cross mot for sum jgmt and stmt of undisputed facts on or before 4/8/11. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/5/2011. (ELL, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 25 Statement of Undisputed Fact Kyle W. Nelson appearing for Plaintiff Citizens For Balanced Use (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Amended Cross Motion for SJ, # 3 Exhibit Amended Memo in Support of Cross Motion for SJ, # 4 Exhibit Amended SUF for Cross Motion for SJ) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED 1. The Court resets the following briefing deadlines for the cross-motions for summary judgment in its 10/6/10 Order:G. 5/2/11 - Due date for Dfts to file a combined resp to pla motion for summary judgment and cross motion for summary judgment. H. 5/20/11. Due date for Pla combined resp to Dfts cross motion for summary judgment. I. 6/6/11 - Due date for Dfts reply to cross motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/24/2011. (ELL, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 Order Setting, the Briefing Schedule for the Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Jared S. Pettinato appearing for Defendants Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Citizens For Balanced Use filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Kyle W. Nelson appearing for Plaintiff Citizens For Balanced Use (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jared S. Pettinato on behalf of Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service (Pettinato, Jared) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by proposed Intervenors; do not intend to designate any portion of the transcript. (ELL, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Order Setting: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2010. Plaintff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/25/11. Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due 4/1/11. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/6/2010. (CRM, ) Modified on 1/4/2011 to correct text (CRM, ). (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service of Lodging of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification, # 2 Exhibit Index) (Thrower, Julie) Modified on 10/4/2010 to indicate that document has wrong case number. Cnsl advised that the document is in the correct case (ELL, ). (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Order Vacating PPT Conf set for 10/1/10. The parties shall file an amended case mgmt sched on or before 10/8/10. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/29/2010. (ELL, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 10-35823 and Time Scheduling Order for 14 Notice of Appeal. (DED, ) Modified on 9/17/2010 to add adtl text re time scheduling order (DED, ). (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Order Setting: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/29/2010 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. The Court will conduct a tele conf w/cnsl to discuss the Joint Mot to Vacate 7/21/10, Order and to set case management plan on 9/29/10 at 2:30 pm. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/16/2010. (ELL, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Proposed Defendant Intervenors as to 12 Order on Motion to Intervene. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number MTX2000000722. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Order Being Appealed, # 3 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement) (ELL, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Vacate 8 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, and to Set Case Management Plan Julie Sharon Thrower appearing for Defendants Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 5 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/25/2010. (APP, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9) (CRM, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address for counsel for proposed defendant-intervenors Montana Wilderness Association, Greater Yellowstone Coalition, and The Wilderness Society. (CRM, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/22/2010. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/22/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2010 11:30 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon.. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/20/2010. (ELL, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steger Smith on behalf of Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 5 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Scott Bischke, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David Gaillard, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Katherine Gibson, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Bob Ekey, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Appendix E, # 6 Exhibit 6 - News Release, # 7 Exhibit 7 - S. 393) (CRM, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer) (CRM, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service. (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service of Related Case (Thrower, Julie) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CRM, ) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT Request for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Mary Erickson, United States Forest Service ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0977-721911.), filed by Citizens For Balanced Use. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Erickson Summons, # 3 US Attorney for Dist. Montana Summons, # 4 US Attorney General Summons) (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?