Colman et al v. Theranos, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-06822-NC
Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2019 at 12:23 AM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hilary Taubman-Dye, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
inidividually and on behalf of all others similarly situtated Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com
inidividually and on behalf of all others similarly situtated Peter E. Borkon +1 510 725 3000 peterb@hbsslaw.com
inidividually and on behalf of all others similarly situtated Nicholas S. Singer +1 510 725 3000 +1 510 725 3001

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
No Logo Robert Colman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Peter E. Borkon +1 510 725 3000 peterb@hbsslaw.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Nicholas S. Singer +1 510 725 3000 +1 510 725 3001

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
v.
Holmes, Elizabeth A. Holmes, Elizabeth A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elizabeth Holmes"
No Logo Balwani, Ramesh, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ramesh Balwani"
Theranos, Inc. Theranos, Inc., Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 11/28/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (334) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [317]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Amended document
    AMENDED DOCUMENT by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. Amendment to [316] Redacted Document, Correction of Docket No. 316-5. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
      MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 316 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Redacted Document
        Plaintiff's Notice and Renewed Motion for Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial. REDACTION to [315] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Danielle Smith (unsealed), # (2) Exhibit A (unsealed), # (3) Exhibit B (unsealed), # (4) Exhibit C (redacted), # (5) Exhibit D (redacted), # (6) Exhibit G (redacted))(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/30/2018) Modified on 7/30/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 316-5 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER [319](jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/31/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/31/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Re: ECF [274]. By 7/30/2018, plaintiffs must ensure all documents submitted with the sealing motion at ECF [274] are filed in compliance with this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 314 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER: (1) Dismissing Case Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) Providing for Continued Jurisdiction for Limited Purposes; and (3) Amending Protective Order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/20/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
              LREF
              Legal Document 313 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018, Terminated: 7/20/2018 stipulation
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (1) Dismissing Case Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) Providing for Continued Jurisdiction for Limited Purposes; and (3) Amending Protective Order filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
                LREF
                Blank 312 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Clerks Notice
                CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING briefing schedule and hearing re: Renewed Motion for Class Certification [274]. Telephonic case management conference set for 8/8/2018 at 01:00 PM. Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy to obtain the call-in number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                  PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/11/2018 2:17:52 PM ]. File Size [ 6704 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:13:58 ]. (courtspeak).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 310 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing held on 7/11/2018 regarding revising case management scheduling order: Court grants Stipulation to extend fact discovery deadline to 8/15/2018 [308], to allow deposition of Walgreen Co. to proceed on 8/10/2018. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Reed Kathrein, Jason Forge. Attorneys for Theranos: Jessica Lewis, Tim Perla. Attorney for Elizabeth Holmes: Kathleen Goodhart. Attorneys for Ramesh Balwani: Stephen Rummage, Allison Davis. Attorney for Walgreen Company: Kristen Seegler. (FTR Time: 2:17pm - 2:31pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2018)
                      LREF
                      Blank 309 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                      CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Telephonic Hearing re: Stipulation Revising Case Management Scheduling Order [308]. Hearing set for 7/11/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel, including counsel for witness Walgreens, must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to obtain the call-in number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2018 stipulation
                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Revising Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 307 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 7/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case did not settle.FTR Time: Not Recorded Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Reed Kathrein and Jason Forge Defendant Balwani Attorney: Stephen RummageDefendant Holmes Attorney: John DwyerDefendant Theranos Attorney: Michael Mugmon (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2018)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 306 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING ADDENDUM TO PROTECTIVE ORDER [D.E. 62] permitting counsel to Intervenor Jigsaw productions LLC access to protected material re [304. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/2/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Joint Case Management Statement
                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT re Confidentiality Designation Process filed by Jigsaw Productions LLC. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Proposed Order
                                Proposed Order re [270] Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,, Stipulated [Proposed] Addendum to Protective Order by Jigsaw Productions LLC. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Declaration in Support
                                  Declaration of Jessica Lewis in Support of Maintaining Under Seal Portions of Exhibits A-D to the Declaration of Danielle Smith in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 302 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO HEAR PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Re: ECF [274], [282]. Defendants must file an opposition to the renewed motion by 7/20/2018, and Plaintiffs may file a reply by 7/27/2018. A hearing is set for 8/8/2018 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/28/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 301 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      REPLY (re [274] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Notice and Renewed Motion For Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) ) Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Brief on Timeliness of Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Brief on Timeliness of Renewed Motion for Class Certification, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2a, # (4) Exhibit 2b, # (5) Exhibit 2c, # (6) Exhibit 3a, # (7) Exhibit 3b, # (8) Exhibit 4a, # (9) Exhibit 4b, # (10) Exhibit 4c, # (11) Exhibit 4d)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 300 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                        Order granting [299] Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 6/27/2018 motion for leave to file
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Brief on Timeliness of Renewed Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 274) filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Brief on Timeliness of Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                                              PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2018 12:40:16 PM ]. File Size [ 7904 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:28 ]. (courtspeak).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                                                PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2018 11:07:48 AM ]. File Size [ 39152 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:34 ]. (courtspeak).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 295 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings [284] held on 6/26/2018: Holmes' Motion to Stay denied, for the reasons stated on record. Theranos and Balwani did not take a position on the motion. Holmes' counsel ordered to produce copy of her SEC testimony and related communications with SEC to plaintiffs' counsel by 5:00 PM today. The production is subject to the existing protective order in this case. Attorney for Plaintiffs: Jason Forge. Attorney for Elizabeth Holmes: Kathleen Goodhart. Attorneys for Ramesh Balwani: Stephen Rummage, Kelly Gorton. Attorney for Theranos: Michael Mugmon. Attorney for Jigsaw Productions: Joshua Koltun. (FTR Time: 11:07am-12:29pm/12:40pm-12:56pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2018)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Brief
                                                    Brief re [282] Order, [274] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Notice and Renewed Motion For Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) Plaintiffs' Brief on Timeliness of Renewed Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 274) filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Related document(s)[282], [274]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 293 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [284] MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings ) to Defendant Elizabeth Holmes's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Elizabeth Holmes's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 292 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE RE LETTER BRIEF [291]: Request to stay or extend June 25 Balwani deposition denied. Request to move June 25 hearing granted, as ordered by Judge Cousins. Hearing reset to 6/26/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Counsel for Jigsaw may participate by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 LETTER BRIEF
                                                          Letter Brief Joint Discovery Letter Brief relating to June 25 Balwani Deposition filed byRamesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit to Discovery Letter)(Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 6/22/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                            MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing June 25, at 2pm re Motion to Stay filed by Jigsaw Productions LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/22/2018).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [284] MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings ) as to Redesignations of Confidentiality filed byJigsaw Productions LLC. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time [286]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                  Declaration of Kathleen H. Goodhart in Support of [286] MOTION to Shorten Time filed byElizabeth Holmes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[286]) (Lombard, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018, Terminated: 6/20/2018 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                    MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Elizabeth Holmes. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lombard, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice re [284] MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings filed byElizabeth Holmes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[284]) (Lombard, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018, Terminated: 6/26/2018 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                                        MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings filed by Elizabeth Holmes. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/5/2018. Replies due by 7/12/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lombard, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                          Reset Deadlines as to Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings [284]: Plaintiffs' opposition due by 6/22/2018; Hearing set for 6/25/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO SEALING MOTION. Re: ECF [280]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/19/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Re: ECF [274]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/19/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 281 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that a telephone conference is set for 6/26/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties shall access the phone conference by dialing (888) 684-8852 and entering access code 537 9839. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 letter
                                                                                  Letter from Defendants re [279] Declaration of Jessica Lewis. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Jessica Lewis in Support of [274] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Notice and Renewed Motion For Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[274]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6.13.2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Jigsaw Productions LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/18/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 6/18/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey David Lombard (Lombard, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/17/2018, Entered: 6/17/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/13/2018, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [267] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 7/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018. (Related documents(s) [267]) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 275 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018, Terminated: 7/23/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Notice and Renewed Motion For Class Certification or, Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification, or Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) [Sealed], # (4) Declaration of Danielle Smith In Support Of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification, or Alternatively, to Alter or Amend Denial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C) [Sealed], # (5) Exhibit A-D and G [Sealed], # (6) Exhibit E-F and H-J, # (7) Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion for Class Certification, # (8) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/14/2018).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request to Strike Evidence and GRANTING Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order [263]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/14/2018. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement. The parties must contact Stephen Ybarra at 405.522.3694 immediately for scheduling. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/14/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL. Re: Dkt. No. [261]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/14/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 270 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER SUMMARIZING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MOTION TO INTERVENE. Re: ECF [225], [242, [251]. The parties and Jigsaw must file a status report of their meet and confer by June 29. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Digital Audio File Uploaded
                                                                                                        PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/13/2018 2:15:34 PM ]. File Size [ 27864 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:58:03 ]. (courtspeak).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/13/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Lewis, Jessica) (Filed on 6/14/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 6/14/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins:. Hearing held on 6/13/2018 re: Motion for Protective Order filed by Theranos, Inc. [225], Motion to Intervene filed by Jigsaw Productions, LLC [242], [251]. Court grants [242] and denies [225]. Attorney for Plaintiffs: Reed Kathrein. Attorney for Theranos: Jessica Lewis. Attorney for Ramesh Balwani: David Ross. Attorney for Elizabeth Holmes: Shannon Eagan. Attorney for Jigsaw Productions: Joshua Koltun. (FTR Time: 2:15pm - 3:13pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2018)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 266 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                REDACTION to [255] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order UNSEALED, # (2) Exhibit C UNSEALED, # (3) Exhibit D REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit G REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit K REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit L REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit M REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit N REDACTED, # (9) Exhibit O REDACTED)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2018, at 2:00 PM regarding the Motions to Intervene and for Protective Order filed by Ramesh Balwani [264]. Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018, Terminated: 6/12/2018 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing scheduled for June 13, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. regarding the Motions to Intervene and for Protective Order filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Grossberg, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re [257] Reply to Opposition/Response Plaintiffs' Objection to Reply Evidence Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3(d)(1) and, in the Alternative, Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Fefendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - [Proposed] Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Kathrein Declaration in Support of [Proposed] Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (3) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SUSAN VAN KEULEN. Available dates for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen are Friday, June 22nd, Friday, June 29th and Friday July 6th at 9:30 a.m. Parties to meet and confer to agree upon a date to be set forth in the Joint Statement referenced below. If the parties are unable to agree, the Court will select a date. Parties to submit a joint settlement conference statement by 4 p.m. on Thursday, June 14 in accordance with Court's standing order re settlement conference procedures at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svkorders. Parties may also submit confidential statements. Joint statement to identify with specificity any information necessary for the parties to exchange in advance of the settlement conference. Pre-settlement call will be held on Friday, June 15th at 10 a.m. Conference call information for June 15th call will be emailed to counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for a Settlement Conference at a time to be determined by her. Parties must contact Oscar Rivera at Oscar_Rivera@cand.uscourts.gov by 6/12 for scheduling. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/8/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re: Settlement Conference by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Settlement. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(C) Protective Order [256]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [225] MOTION for Protective Order filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[225]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [225] MOTION for Protective Order ) (Redacted) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018, Terminated: 6/7/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (4) Unredacted Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' SEALING MOTION. Re: ECF [241]. By June 12, Plaintiffs must publicly file all the currently under-seal documents with their sealing motion, ECF [241], with only the redactions listed in the order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(C) Protective Order and Supporting Declaration of Alexander Ryan White pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and Civil L.R. 79-5 [223]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [241] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[241]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03-28-2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/3/2018, Entered: 6/3/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION to Intervene CORRECTING CITATION ERRORS filed by Jigsaw Productions LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/6/2018. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 250 Filed: 6/2/2018, Entered: 6/2/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING FOR JUNE 13, 2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael Cousins Re: Motion to Intervene filed by Jigsaw Productions LLC [242]; opposition due 6/6; Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Protective Order[223]; Motion for Protective Order [225]; Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order [241]. Parties to confer and file joint status report by 6/8 as to whether and when they would like to be referred for a settlement conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 249 Filed: 6/2/2018, Entered: 6/2/2018 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Order granting in part and denying in part [226] Motion to Expedite entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. The Court will hear the Defendants Motion for Protective Order on June 13 at 2:00 p.m. in San Jose courtroom 5. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 6/2/2018, Entered: 6/2/2018 Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Order granting in part and denying in part [224] Discovery Letter Brief entered by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. In consideration of competing proposals for the date of Balwani and Holmes depositions, and the proposed (and opposed) protective order, the Court orders the two depositions to be taken by June 29. The Court also extends the fact discovery deadline to July 16 and the expert report deadline to July 30. The Court will hear the proposed intervention and protective order issues on June 13 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                        Reset Deadlines as to Motion for Protective Order [225] and Motion to Intervene [242]: Hearing set for 6/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [242] MOTION to Intervene filed byJigsaw Productions LLC. (Related document(s)[242]) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [242] MOTION to Intervene by Jigsaw Productions LLC. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [242] MOTION to Intervene filed byJigsaw Productions LLC. (Related document(s)[242]) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Erika Cheung in Support of [242] MOTION to Intervene filed byJigsaw Productions LLC. (Related document(s)[242]) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Alex Gibney in Support of [242] MOTION to Intervene filed byJigsaw Productions LLC. (Related document(s)[242]) (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 242 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene filed by Jigsaw Productions LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/6/2018. Replies due by 6/6/2018. (Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 241 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018, Terminated: 6/5/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrien in Opposition to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order Denying Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (3) [SEALED] Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (4) Declaration [SEALED] of Reed Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (5) Exhibit A, # (6) Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit C [SEALED], # (8) Exhibit D [SEALED], # (9) Exhibit E, # (10) Exhibit F, # (11) Exhibit G [SEALED], # (12) Exhibit H, # (13) Exhibit I, # (14) Exhibit J, # (15) Exhibit K [SEALED], # (16) Exhibit L [SEALED], # (17) Exhibit M [SEALED], # (18) Exhibit N [SEALED], # (19) Exhibit O [SEALED], # (20) Proposed Order, # (21) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 240 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Re: ECF [177]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/31/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 239 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING the hearing set for 5/25/2018 01:00 PM re: Motion for Protective Order [225]. Court finds the motion suitable for decision without oral argument and takes the motion under submission. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Benjamin Z. Grossberg Pro Hac Vice [230]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Eric D. Selden Pro Hac Vice [229]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney David E. Ross Pro Hac Vice [228]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018, Terminated: 5/24/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [226] MOTION to Expedite , [225] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Shen Sciarani (Sciarani, Kevin) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA re [226] MOTION to Expedite by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, # (2) Proposed Order (Corrected))(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA re [225] MOTION for Protective Order by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (2) Proposed Order (Corrected))(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [223] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Notice of Errata) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Rule 26(c) Protective Order, # (2) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[223]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018, Terminated: 5/21/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Z. Grossberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12370419.) filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018, Terminated: 5/21/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Eric D. Selden ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12370400.) filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018, Terminated: 5/21/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12370355.) filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Ann Davis of David E. Ross, Eric D. Selden, and Benjamin Z. Grossberg of Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 6/2/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite filed by Theranos, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Jessica Lewis in Support of Motion to Expedite)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order filed by Theranos, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/1/2018. Replies due by 6/8/2018. (Attachments: # (1) White Declaration in Support of Motion for Protective Order (redacted), # (2) Declaration in Support of Motion for Protective Order, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 6/2/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter Brief relating to defendants' depositions filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3)(Forge, Jason) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018, Terminated: 6/5/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # (2) Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Unredacted), # (3) Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (Redacted), # (4) Declaration of Alexander R. White in Support of Motion for Protective Order (Unredacted), # (5) Declaration of Alexander R. White in Support of Motion for Protective Order (Redacted), # (6) Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Marie Stenstedt Leeper Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Elizabeth Holmes (Leeper, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE SCHEDULE. Re: ECF [215]. Fact discovery deadline is extended to 6/29/2018; deadline to serve opening expert reports is extended to 7/16/2018. All other deadlines remain as previously set. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Nos. [217-27] and [217-31] [219]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018, Terminated: 5/3/2018 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket Nos. 217-27 and 217-31 filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTION to [213] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Constantine Economides In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Motion for Class Certification (Unsealed), # (2) Exhibit A (Unsealed), # (3) Exhibit B (Unsealed), # (4) Exhibit C (Unsealed), # (5) Exhibit E (Unsealed), # (6) Exhibit F (Unsealed), # (7) Exhibit G (Unsealed), # (8) Exhibit H (Unsealed), # (9) Exhibit I (Unsealed), # (10) Exhibit J (Redacted), # (11) Exhibit K (Unsealed))(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 217 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTION to [213] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Unsealed), # (2) Exhibit A (Unsealed), # (3) Exhibit B (Redacted), # (4) Exhibit C (Redacted), # (5) Exhibit D (Redacted), # (6) Exhibit E (Redacted), # (7) Exhibit F (Redacted), # (8) Exhibit G (Redacted), # (9) Exhibit H (Redacted), # (10) Exhibit I (Redacted), # (11) Exhibit J (Redacted), # (12) Exhibit K (Unsealed), # (13) Exhibit L (Unsealed), # (14) Exhibit M (Redacted), # (15) Exhibit N (Redacted), # (16) Exhibit O (Redacted), # (17) Exhibit P (Redacted), # (18) Exhibit Q (Redacted), # (19) Exhibit R (Redacted), # (20) Exhibit S (Unsealed), # (21) Exhibit T (Redacted), # (22) Exhibit U (Unsealed), # (23) Exhibit V (Unsealed), # (24) Exhibit W (Unsealed), # (25) Exhibit X (Redacted), # (26) Exhibit Y (Redacted), # (27) (REMOVED per Order [219]), # (28) Exhibit GG (Unsealed), # (29) Exhibit HH (Unsealed), # (30) Exhibit JJ (Unsealed), # (31) REMOVED per Order [219]), # (32) Exhibit LL (Redacted), # (33) Exhibit MM (Unsealed), # (34) Exhibit NN (Unsealed), # (35) Exhibit OO (Unsealed), # (36) Exhibit PP (Unsealed), # (37) Exhibit QQ (Unsealed), # (38) Exhibit RR (Unsealed))(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/3/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 217-27 and 217-31 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER [220] Modified on 5/4/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 216 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re-filed per Order [213] ; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Rule 23(B)(3) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) White Declaration, # (2) REDACTED Unni Declaration, # (3) Perla Declaration, # (4) Perla Declaration Exhibit 1, # (5) REDACTED Perla Declaration Exhibit 2, # (6) Perla Declaration Exhibit 4, # (7) Perla Declaration Exhibit 5, # (8) Perla Declaration Exhibit 7, # (9) Perla Declaration Exhibit 8, # (10) Perla Declaration Exhibit 10, # (11) Perla Declaration Exhibit 19, # (12) Perla Declaration Exhibit 20, # (13) Perla Declaration Exhibit 21, # (14) Perla Declaration Exhibit 24, # (15) Perla Declaration Exhibit 27, # (16) Perla Declaration Exhibit 31, # (17) Perla Declaration Exhibit 32, # (18) REDACTED Perla Declaration Exhibit 37, # (19) REDACTED Perla Declaration Exhibit 41, # (20) REDACTED Perla Declaration Exhibit 42)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Revising Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stephen M. Rummage iso Stipulation Revising Case Management Scheduling Order)(Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: 4/28/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Defendants Responding to April 20, 2018 Letter from Alex Gibney of Jigsaw Productions . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 213 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Re: ECF [177], [187], 195]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge Cousins from Alex Gibney of Jigsaw Productions dated April 20, 2018 regarding public access to pleadings, exhibits, and other sealed documents. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 211 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, [195] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification, [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification, # (2) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 Kathrein Declaration, # (3) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex A, # (4) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex B, # (5) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex C, # (6) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex D, # (7) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex E, # (8) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex F, # (9) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex G, # (10) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex H, # (11) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex I, # (12) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex J, # (13) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex M, # (14) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex N, # (15) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex O, # (16) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex P, # (17) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex Q, # (18) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex R, # (19) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex T, # (20) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex U, # (21) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex X, # (22) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex QQ, # (23) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 177 K. Ex RR, # (24) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 Opposition Brief, # (25) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 White Declaration, # (26) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 Unni Declaration, # (27) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 Perla Declaration, # (28) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 1, # (29) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 2, # (30) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 4, # (31) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 5, # (32) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 7, # (33) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 8, # (34) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 10, # (35) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 19, # (36) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 20, # (37) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 21, # (38) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 24, # (39) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 27, # (40) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 31, # (41) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 32, # (42) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 37, # (43) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 41, # (44) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 187 P. Ex. 42, # (45) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 195 Reply Brief, # (46) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 195 E. Ex. D, # (47) Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 195 E. Ex. J)(Related document(s)[177], [195], [187]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO PROVIDE PROPOSED OMNIBUS ORDER. Re: ECF [177], [187], [195]. The proposed omnibus order and compiled, highlighted proposed redactions are due 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/18/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on March 28, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [208] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 4/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2018. (Related documents(s) [208]) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/28/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Lewis, Jessica) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 4/4/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification held on 3/28/2018: Court takes motion under submission. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Constantine Economides, Jason Forge, Reed Kathrein, Jason Forge, Danielle Smith. Attorneys for Theranos: Timothy Perla, Jessica Lewis. Attorney for Ramesh Balwani: Stephen Rummage. Attorney for Elizabeth Holms: Kathleen Goodhart. (FTR Time: 1:54pm - 3:00pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING RELATION OF CASES PURSUANT TO L.R. 3-12 [198]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [198] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 ) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [198] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 ) filed bySecurities And Exchange Commission. (Katz, Marc) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [195] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Maintaining under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Constantine P. Economides) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) [REDACTED] Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Pltfs' Motion to Certify Class_Redacted, # (2) [REDACTED] Declaration of CPE and Exhibits A - K in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief_Redacted)(Related document(s)[195]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Bailey W. Heaps in Support of [195] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byDonald A. Lucas. (Related document(s)[195]) (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Mark Campbell in Support of [195] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byPVG Management III, L.L.C, Peer Ventures Group IV, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[195]) (De Jong, Jared) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ana Quintana in Support of [183] Pretrial Memorandum Supporting Sealing of Exhibits FF and KK (Supplemental) filed byBlack Diamond Ventures XII-B, LLC. (Related document(s)[183]) (Stigi, John) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re [195] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018, Terminated: 3/27/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. Responses due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Economides, Constantine) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of [191] Declaration in Support,,,, [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [188] Opposition/Response to Motion, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment 1: Proposed Redacted Version of Perla Decl. Exhibit 5, ECF No. 191-5)(Related document(s)[191], [187], [188]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Eric Munson in Support of [191] Declaration in Support,,,, [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [188] Opposition/Response to Motion, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[191], [187], [188]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018, Terminated: 4/26/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Constantine P. Economides in Opposition to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [SEALED] Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # (4) [SEALED] Declaration of Constantine P. Economides and Exhibits A through K in Support of Plaintiffs Reply Brief, # (5) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Economides, Constantine) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Mark Campbell in Support of [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPVG Management III, L.L.C, Peer Ventures Group IV, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[187]) (De Jong, Jared) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Bailey W. Heaps in Support of [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byDonald A. Lucas. (Related document(s)[187]) (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Notice of Errata of Unredacted Exhibit 1 and Replacement Exhibit 1) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) (Replacement) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[187]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Timothy Perla in Support of [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [188] Opposition/Response to Motion, (Declaration of Timothy Perla in Support of Defednants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification under Rule 23 (B) (3) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44)(Related document(s)[187], [188]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Dr. Sanjay Unni in Support of [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [188] Opposition/Response to Motion, (Declaration of Dr. Sanjay Unni in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[187], [188]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [188] Opposition/Response to Motion, (Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Rule 23(B)(3) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[187], [188]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, [187] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Under Rule 23 (B)(3)) filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018, Terminated: 4/26/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service, # (4) Redacted Opposition, # (5) Declaration Redacted - White Declartion, # (6) Declaration Redacted - Unni Declaration, # (7) Declaration Redacted - Perla Declaration, # (8) Exhibit 2 Redacted, # (9) Exhibit 4 Redacted, # (10) Exhibit 7 Redacted, # (11) Exhibit 8 Redacted, # (12) Exhibit 10 Redacted, # (13) Exhibit 24 Redacted, # (14) Unredacted Opposition, # (15) Declaration Underacted Declaration White, # (16) Declaration Unredacted Declaration Unni, # (17) Declaration Unredacted Declaration Perla, # (18) Exhibit 1 Underacted, # (19) Exhibit 2 Underacted, # (20) Exhibit 4 Underacted, # (21) Exhibit 5 Underacted, # (22) Exhibit 7 Underacted, # (23) Exhibit 8 Underacted, # (24) Exhibit 10 Underacted, # (25) Exhibit 19 Underacted, # (26) Exhibit 20 Underacted, # (27) Exhibit 21 Underacted, # (28) Exhibit 24 Underacted, # (29) Exhibit 27 Underacted, # (30) Exhibit 31 Underacted, # (31) Exhibit 32 Underacted, # (32) Exhibit 37 Underacted, # (33) Exhibit 41 Underacted, # (34) Exhibit 42 Underacted)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Bailey W. Heaps in Support of [184] Declaration in Support, of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Corrected Exh 2) filed byDonald A. Lucas. (Related document(s)[184]) (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) (Proposed Redacted) Motion for Class Certification, # (3) (Proposed Redacted) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, # (4) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit A to Kathrein Declaration, # (5) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit B to Kathrein Declaration, # (6) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit C to Kathrein Declaration, # (7) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit D to Kathrein Declaration, # (8) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit E to Kathrein Declaration, # (9) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit F to Kathrein Declaration, # (10) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit G to Kathrein Declaration, # (11) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit H to Kathrein Declaration, # (12) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit I to Kathrein Declaration, # (13) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit J to Kathrein Declaration, # (14) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit M to Kathrein Declaration, # (15) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit N to Kathrein Declaration, # (16) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit O to Kathrein Declaration, # (17) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit P to Kathrein Declaration, # (18) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit Q to Kathrein Declaration, # (19) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit R to Kathrein Declaration, # (20) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit T to Kathrein Declaration, # (21) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit U to Kathrein Declaration, # (22) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit X to Kathrein Declaration, # (23) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit QQ to Kathrein Declaration, # (24) (Proposed Redacted) Exhibit RR to Kathrein Declaration)(Related document(s)[177]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Bailey W. Heaps in Support of [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byDonald A. Lucas. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Related document(s)[177]) (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 3/1/2018)Ex 2 Locked per filer, filed in error Modified on 3/5/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING SEALING OF EXHIBITS FF AND KK FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DECLARATION OF ANA QUINTANT by Black Diamond Ventures XII-B, LLC. (Stigi, John) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by PVG Management III, L.L.C, Peer Ventures Group IV, L.P. (De Jong, Jared) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Mark Campbell in Support of [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byPeer Ventures Group IV, L.P., PVG Management III, L.L.C. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit CC, # (2) Exhibit II, # (3) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[177]) (De Jong, Jared) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Eric Munson in Support of [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[177]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Time for Parties to Respond to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [178]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [177] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Extending Time for Parties to Respond to Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 177 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 4/26/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein In Opposition to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [SEALED] Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # (4) Declaration [SEALED] Declaration of Reed Kathrein In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # (5) Exhibit [SEALED] Exhibits A-Y, # (6) Exhibit Exhibits Z-BB, # (7) Exhibit [SEALED] Exhibits CC-RR, # (8) Exhibit Exhibits SS-TT, # (9) Proposed Order for Granting Class Certification, # (10) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Lewis for Defendant Theranos, Inc. (Lewis, Jessica) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Amended Complaint [173] Amended Complaint byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Donald Benedetto (Benedetto, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 173 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byHilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTION to [171] Redacted Document,, Correction of Re-filed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Non-Party Donald A. Lucas's Motion to Quash by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REDACTION to [170] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Non-Party Donald A. Lucas's Motion to Quash by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Non-Party Donald A. Lucas's Motion to Quash, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/21/2017) Modified on 12/21/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. [165], [166]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/17/2017, Entered: 12/17/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [166] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket 165 filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[166]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/06/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Elizabeth Holmes, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Kort, Jacqueline) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING DONALD LUCAS'S MOTION TO QUASH. Re: ECF [162]. By 1/5/2018, Lucas must produce all responsive information, subject to protective order. He must be deposed by 1/19/2018, at a location to be determined by plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket 165 filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017, Terminated: 12/14/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **Only Administrative Motion to File Under Seal was Filed in Error. Please See Corrected Version in Document [166]** Opposition to Non-Party Donald A. Lucas's Motion to Quash filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [Redacted] Opposition to Motion to Quash, # (4) [Sealed] Opposition to Motion to Quash, # (5) Declaration [Redacted] Kathein Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash, # (6) Declaration [Sealed] Kathein Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash, # (7) Declaration of Danielle Charles ISO Opposition to Motion to Quash, # (8) Declaration)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/13/2017) Modified on 12/14/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING re Motion to Quash [162]. Hearing set for 12/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Opposition due by 12/13/2017. Reply due by 12/18/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 12/6/2017, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [158] Transcript Order, ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2018. (Related documents(s) [158]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017, Terminated: 12/14/2017 motion to quashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash filed by Donald A. Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 12/20/2017. Replies due by 12/27/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (4) Exhibit C to Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (5) Exhibit D to Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (6) Exhibit E to Declaration of Jeffrey R. Chanin, # (7) Declaration of Donald A. Lucas, # (8) Proposed Order)(Chanin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Wilson Heaps (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Chanin (Chanin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: JOINDER OF PARTIES. Re: Dkt. No. [63]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/6/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/06/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 12/6/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: LYDIA ZINN) Modified on 12/6/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Last day to amend pleadings and add parties 1/5/2018; Motion for class certification due 2/16/2018; Opposition due 3/9/2018; Reply due 3/16/2018; Hearing on motion for class certification and CMC set for 3/28/2018 01:00 PM; Fact discovery to be completed by 6/1/2018; Expert discovery to be completed by 8/15/2018; Last day to file dispositive motions 8/31/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2018 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 12/10/2018 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/6/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2017: Order to Show Cause is discharged; Motion hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor; Court to issue scheduling order. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Reed Kathrein, Jason Forge. Defendants' Attorneys: Robert K. Smith, Stephen Rummage, Kathleen Goodhart. (FTR Time: 10:09am - 10:30am.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 8/23/2017, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [153] Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Related documents(s) [153]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order (Updated) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/23/2017 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 12/1/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: LYDIA ZINN) Modified on 12/1/2017 (jy, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTION to [150] Order Redacted Exhibits A, B and D to Joint Statement per Order Dkt No. 150 by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A [Redacted], # (2) Exhibit B [Redacted], # (3) Exhibit D [Redacted])(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Re: Dkt. No. [147]. Plaintiffs must re-file redacted documents by 11/21/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/14/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Maintaining Under Seal Portions of Exhibits to November 9, 2017 Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute [147] filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Re: Dkt. No. [147-3]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017, Terminated: 11/13/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Theranos, # (4) Exhibit A [Sealed], # (5) Exhibit B [Sealed], # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D [Sealed], # (8) Exhibit E)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference [145]. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/9/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017, Terminated: 11/9/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference , filed by Theranos, Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2017. Replies due by 11/29/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference for 11/29/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIMIT CLASS. Re: Dkt. No. [102]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the July 31, 2017 Hearing Transcript [140]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Re: ECF [110-3]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/25/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017, Terminated: 9/6/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the July 31, 2017 Hearing Transcript filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) REDACTED July 31, 2017 Hearing Transcript, # (5) UNREDACTED July 31, 2017 Hearing Transcript)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Motion to Limit the Putative Class Definition [102] held on 8/23/2017: Court grants motion and order to issue. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Reed Kathrein. Defendants' Attorneys: Timothy Perla, Robert Smith. (FTR Time 1:09pm - 1:16pm.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2017) Proceedings transcribed by [Lydia Zinn] Modified on 12/1/2017 (jy, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS Attachment B re 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Attachment B to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[138]. *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re [127] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, REDACTED- Attachment B to the Parties July 14, 2017 Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute (ECF No. 110-5) by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/14/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTION Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTION Plaintiffs' Response and Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Class Definition by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, # (2) Exhibit C-Redacted, # (3) Exhibit R, # (4) Exhibit S, # (5) Exhibit T, # (6) Exhibit W, # (7) Exhibit X-Redacted, # (8) Exhibit Y, # (9) Exhibit Z, # (10) Exhibit AA, # (11) Exhibit BB, # (12) Exhibit CC, # (13) Exhibit DD)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re-filed per Orders [127] & [131]; Defendants' Motion to Limit Class Definition filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) REDACTED Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of Motion to Limit the Putative Class Definition, # (2) Exhibit A to Timothy Perla Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Timothy Perla Declaration)(Related document(s)[101]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-11, CIVIL L.R. 79-5, AND COURT'S ORDER (ECF NO. 127) [129]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Robert K. Smith Supplemental Declaration in Support of [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017, Terminated: 8/10/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Related to [127], [116] filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Robert K. Smith Declaration ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) REDACTED Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (5) UNREDACTED Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (6) REDACTED Corrected Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Fund Class, # (7) UNREDACTED Corrected Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Fund Class)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Timothy Perla on Behalf of Theranos, Inc., Re: New Information Relevant to the July 14, 2017 Joint Statement, Docket No. [110]-3. (Perla, Timothy) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. [101], [109], [110], [111], [116], [120]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [102] MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Hearing re Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class [109] held on 7/31/2017: Court denies motion for the reasons stated on the record; Parties ordered to confer further on discovery issues. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jason Forge, Reed Kathrein, Constantine Economides. Defendants' Attorney Timothy Perla, Megan Barriger, Kelly Gorton, Allison Davis, Allison Davidson. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Total Time in Court 1 hour, 34 mins.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, and Plaintiffs' Response and Partial Opposition to Defendants' M Re: Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[120]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [120] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, and Plaintiffs' Response and Partial Opposition to Defendants' M Re: Plaintiffs' Response and Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Class Definition filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[120]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [116] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF ERRATA: CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [104], [115], [116], [117] filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected 6/30/17 Alexander Ryan White Declaration REDACTED, # (2) Corrected 6/30/17 Alexander Ryan White Declaration UNREDACTED, # (3) Corrected 6/30/17 Timothy Perla Declaration, # (4) Corrected Robert K. Smith Declaration, # (5) Corrected 7/24/17 Alexander Ryan White Declaration UNREDACTED, # (6) Corrected 7/24/17 Timothy Perla Declaration REDACTED, # (7) Corrected 7/24/17 Timothy Perla Declaration UNREDACTED, # (8) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s)[116], [101]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, and Plaintiffs' Response and Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Class Definition filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein in Opposition to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (4) Declaration of Reed Kathrein In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (5) Exhibit EE, # (6) Exhibit FF, # (7) Exhibit GG, # (8) Plaintiffs' Response and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Class Definition, # (9) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Constantine Economides Pro Hac Vice [118]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017, Terminated: 7/27/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11580282.) filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Economides, Constantine) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Appendix A, # (2) Redacted Alexander Ryan White Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (3) Exhibit A of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (4) Redacted Exhibit B of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (5) Redacted Exhibit C of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (6) Redacted Exhibit D of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (7) Redacted Exhibit E of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (8) Redacted Exhibit F of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (9) Redacted Exhibit G of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (10) Redacted Exhibit H of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (11) Redacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (12) Redacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (13) Exhibit 2 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (14) Exhibit 3 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (15) Exhibit 4 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (16) Exhibit 5 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (17) Exhibit 6 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (18) Exhibit 7 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (19) Exhibit 8 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (20) Exhibit 9 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (21) Redacted Exhibit 10 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (22) Exhibit 11 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (23) Exhibit 12 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (24) Exhibit 13 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (25) Exhibit 14 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (26) Exhibit 15 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (27) Exhibit 16 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (28) Exhibit 17 of Timothy Perla Declaration)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) Unredacted Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (5) Appendix A, # (6) Unredacted Alexander Ryan White Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (7) Unredacted Exhibit B of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (8) Unredacted Exhibit C of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (9) Unredacted Exhibit D of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (10) Unredacted Exhibit E of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (11) Unredacted Exhibit F of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (12) Unredacted Exhibit G of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (13) Unredacted Exhibit H of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # (14) Redacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (15) Unredacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (16) Redacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (17) Unredacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # (18) Unredacted Exhibit 10 of Timothy Perla Declaration)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Appendix A, # 2 Redacted Alexander Ryan White Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 3 Exhibit A of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 4 Redacted Exhibit B of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 5 Redacted Exhibit C of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 6 Redacted Exhibit D of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 7 Redacted Exhibit E of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 8 Redacted Exhibit F of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 9 Redacted Exhibit G of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 10 Redacted Exhibit H of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 11 Redacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 12 Redacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 2 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 3 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 4 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 5 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 6 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 7 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 8 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 9 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 21 Redacted Exhibit 10 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 11 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 12 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 13 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 14 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 15 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 16 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 17 of Timothy Perla Declaration)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [110] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Attachment B to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[110]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Unredacted Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 5 Appendix A, # 6 Unredacted Alexander Ryan White Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 7 Unredacted Exhibit B of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Exhibit C of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit D of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Exhibit E of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Exhibit F of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Exhibit G of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 13 Unredacted Exhibit H of Alexander Ryan White Declaration, # 14 Redacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 15 Unredacted Timothy Perla Declaration in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # 16 Redacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 17 Unredacted Exhibit 1 of Timothy Perla Declaration, # 18 Unredacted Exhibit 10 of Timothy Perla Declaration)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of [109] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, Motion to Shorten Time, Kathrein Declaration and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[109]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING OF MOTIONS. Re: Dkt. No. [109]. Defendants must oppose the motion for injunctive relief and provisional class certification by 7/24/2017. Plaintiffs must reply by 7/27/2017. A hearing will be held on 7/31/2017, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Attachment B to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s) 110 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert K. Smith in Support of 109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, Motion to Shorten Time, Kathrein Declaration and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2017, Entered: 7/16/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/16/2017, Entered: 7/16/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Robert K. Smith in support of Defendants' Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Redacted Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time, # (4) Unredacted Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Attachment B to the Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jason A. Forge, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Joint Statement regarding Discovery Dispute, # (4) Attachment A, # (5) Attachment B, # (6) Attachment C, # (7) Attachment D, # (8) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Forge, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 109 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, Motion to Shorten Time, Kathrein Declaration and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein in Opposition to Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) [Sealed] Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (4) Declaration [Sealed] Kathrein Declaration ISO Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (5) Exhibit A-B, # (6) Exhibit C-F [Sealed], # (7) Exhibit G-I, # (8) Exhibit J-L [Sealed], # (9) Exhibit M-Q, # (10) Exhibit R-T [Sealed], # (11) Exhibit U-V, # (12) Exhibit W-DD [Sealed], # (13) Declaration of Robert Colman in Support of Class Certification, # (14) Declaration of Hilary Taubman-Dye in Support of Class Certification, # (15) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Injunctive Relief, # (16) [Sealed] Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Motion for Injunctive Relief and to Provisionally Certify a Mandatory Limited Fund Class, # (17) Declaration of Reed Kathrein in Support of Motion to Shorten Time, # (18) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time, # (19) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA re [104] Declaration in Support,, [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Redacted Versions of Exhibits 3 & 6 of Declaration of Alexander Ryan White by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Redacted Version of Ex 3 White Declaration, # (2) Corrected Redacted Version of Ex 6 White Declaration)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Non-Opposition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Related document(s)[101]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to [102] MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2017. Replies due by 8/7/2017. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Timothy Perla in Support of [102] MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Related document(s)[102]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of [102] MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17)(Related document(s)[102]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [102] MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Timothy Perla in Support of 102 MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re 101 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 9/6/2017 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re [101] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/14/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of 102 MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re 101 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 8/4/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order re Motion to Seal, # (3) Redacted Version of Motion to Limit Putative Class Definition, # (4) Redacted Version of Appendix A to Putative Class Motion, # (5) Redacted Version of White Declaration, # (6) Redacted Version of Ex 1 White Dec, # (7) Redacted Version of Ex 2 White Dec, # (8) Redacted Version of Ex 3 White Dec, # (9) Redacted Version of Ex 4 White Dec, # (10) Redacted Version of Ex 5 White Dec, # (11) Redacted Version of Ex 6 White Dec, # (12) Redacted Version of Ex 7 White Dec, # (13) Redacted Version of Ex 8 White Dec, # (14) Redacted Version of Ex 11 White Dec, # (15) Redacted Version of Ex 14 White Dec, # (16) Redacted Version of Ex 15 White Dec, # (17) Redacted Version of Ex C Perla Dec, # (18) Redacted Version of Ex D Perla Dec, # (19) Unredacted Version of Motion to Limit Putative Class Definition, # (20) Unredacted Version of Appendix A to Putative Class Motion, # (21) Unredacted Version of White Declaration, # (22) Unredacted Version of Ex 1 White Dec, # (23) Unredacted Version of Ex 2 White Dec, # (24) Unredacted Version of Ex 3 White Dec, # (25) Unredacted Version of Ex 4 White Dec, # (26) Unredacted Version of Ex 5 White Dec, # (27) Unredacted Version of Ex 6 White Dec, # (28) Unredacted Version of Ex 7 White Dec, # (29) Unredacted Version of Ex 8 White Dec, # (30) Unredacted Version of Ex 10 White Dec, # (31) Unredacted Version of Ex 11 White Dec, # (32) Unredacted Version of Ex 14 White Dec, # (33) Unredacted Version of Ex 15 White Dec, # (34) Unredacted Version of Ex 16 White Dec, # (35) Unredacted Version of Ex 17 White Dec, # (36) Unredacted Version of Ex A Perla Dec, # (37) Unredacted Version of Ex B Perla Dec, # (38) Unredacted Version of Ex C Perla Dec, # (39) Unredacted Version of Ex D Perla Dec)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 102 MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re 101 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Limit the Putative Class Definition re 101 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/14/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on June 20, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [94] Transcript Order, [93] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 7/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017. (Related documents(s) [94], [93]) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order re Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion to Limit Putative Class Definition, # 4 Redacted Version of Appendix A to Putative Class Motion, # 5 Redacted Version of White Declaration, # 6 Redacted Version of Ex 1 White Dec, # 7 Redacted Version of Ex 2 White Dec, # 8 Redacted Version of Ex 3 White Dec, # 9 Redacted Version of Ex 4 White Dec, # 10 Redacted Version of Ex 5 White Dec, # 11 Redacted Version of Ex 6 White Dec, # 12 Redacted Version of Ex 7 White Dec, # 13 Redacted Version of Ex 8 White Dec, # 14 Redacted Version of Ex 11 White Dec, # 15 Redacted Version of Ex 14 White Dec, # 16 Redacted Version of Ex 15 White Dec, # 17 Redacted Version of Ex C Perla Dec, # 18 Redacted Version of Ex D Perla Dec, # 19 Unredacted Version of Motion to Limit Putative Class Definition, # 20 Unredacted Version of Appendix A to Putative Class Motion, # 21 Unredacted Version of White Declaration, # 22 Unredacted Version of Ex 1 White Dec, # 23 Unredacted Version of Ex 2 White Dec, # 24 Unredacted Version of Ex 3 White Dec, # 25 Unredacted Version of Ex 4 White Dec, # 26 Unredacted Version of Ex 5 White Dec, # 27 Unredacted Version of Ex 6 White Dec, # 28 Unredacted Version of Ex 7 White Dec, # 29 Unredacted Version of Ex 8 White Dec, # 30 Unredacted Version of Ex 10 White Dec, # 31 Unredacted Version of Ex 11 White Dec, # 32 Unredacted Version of Ex 14 White Dec, # 33 Unredacted Version of Ex 15 White Dec, # 34 Unredacted Version of Ex 16 White Dec, # 35 Unredacted Version of Ex 17 White Dec, # 36 Unredacted Version of Ex A Perla Dec, # 37 Unredacted Version of Ex B Perla Dec, # 38 Unredacted Version of Ex C Perla Dec, # 39 Unredacted Version of Ex D Perla Dec)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2017) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT [100]. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on June 21, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [94] Transcript Order, [93] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 7/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2017. (Related documents(s) [94], [93]) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/29/2017) Modified on 6/30/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER [96]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/26/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND F.R.E. 502(D) ORDER [95]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017, Terminated: 6/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (HIPAA) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017, Terminated: 6/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 6/23/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 6/23/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 6/23/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal unredacted version of the Joint Statement regarding Discovery Dispute and Attachment F. [87]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/21/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute [87] held on 6/20/2017: Discovery motion was resolved by stipulation as stated on the record. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jason Forge, Reed Kathrein, Danielle Charles. Defendants' Attorneys: Timothy Perla, Robert Smith, Jacqueline Kort. (FTR Time 10:05am-10:12am/12:09pm-12:15pm.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye re [87] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING on Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute [87] for 6/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties should plan for substantial further meet and confer before their dispute is presented to Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in Support of [87] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Per Civil L.R. 79-5(D)(1)(A)), filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[87]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017, Terminated: 6/21/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Reed Kathrein Declaration to Uncontested Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Uncontested Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (3) Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute - Redacted, # (4) Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute - Filed Under Seal, # (5) Attachment A, # (6) Attachment B, # (7) Attachment C, # (8) Attachment D, # (9) Attachment E, # (10) Attachment F - Redacted, # (11) Attachment F - Filed Under Seal, # (12) Attachment G, # (13) Attachment H, # (14) Attachment I, # (15) Attachment J, # (16) Attachment K)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on May 24, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [81] Transcript Order, [79] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (Related documents(s) [81], [79]) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order Extending ADR DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Extending ADR Deadline [83]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousin on 6/2/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in Support of [83] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Deadline for Completing ADR Process filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Related document(s)[83]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 6/2/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Deadline for Completing ADR Process filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute [75]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 5/25/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/25/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 5/25/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/25/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Hearing re Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute [75] held on 5/24/2017. Court to issue order. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jason Forge, Reed Kathrein. Defendants' Attorneys: Timothy Perla, Robert Kingsley Smith, Kelly Gorton, Kathleen Goodhart. (FTR Time 11:33am-12:16pm.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING JOINT STATEMENT RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [75] for hearing 5/24/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit F to Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute filed by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman [75]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/15/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in Support of [75] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit F to Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B)(Related document(s)[75]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit F to Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F - submitted under seal, # (10) Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit H, # (12) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/1/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 5/9/2017 (lhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Alexander Ryan White in Support of [72] Response to Order to Show Cause filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[72]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Order to Show Cause re [63] byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [63] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Non-Party Lucas Venture Group XI, LLC's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Lucas Venture Group XI, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Donald A. Lucas, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Chanin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Lees Allen (Allen, Julia) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Wilson Heaps (Heaps, Bailey) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Chanin (Chanin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of [64] Response to Order to Show Cause filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Related document(s)[64]) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support of [64] Response to Order to Show Cause filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Related document(s)[64]) (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re [63] by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye . (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2017) Linkage added on 4/28/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JOINDER OF LUCAS VENTURE GROUP, CELADON TECHNOLOGY FUND, AND SHAREPOST. Re: Dkt. [29]. Response due 4/26/2017. Defendants may respond by 5/3/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets on Behalf of All Parties. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/14/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017, Terminated: 4/14/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets on Behalf of All Parties filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Redacted Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redaction of [59] Transcript,,,, Sealed Transcript,,, (Related documents(s) [59]) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/07/2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [57] Transcript Order ), Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/07/2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017. (Related documents(s) [57]) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: 4/8/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 7, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Robert Colman, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 4/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/7/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing held on 4/7/2017 re Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Prevent Settlements with Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review [50]. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Reed R. Kathrein, Jason Forge. Defendants' Attorneys: Timothy Perla, Kathleen Goodhart, Megan Barriger, Allison Davis. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. (Total Time: 1 hour 46 min, 2:49pm-3:12pm SEALED). Attachment Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in Support of [53] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[53]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of David Taylor in Support of [53] Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTheranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[53]) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [50] MOTION re [48] MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) to Prevent Settlements with Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review CORRECTION OF DOCKET #48 ) filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Steven Berman Pro Hac Vice [47]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME [49]. Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) to Prevent Settlements With Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review [50] will be heard 4/7/2017 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/7/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION re [48] MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) to Prevent Settlements with Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review CORRECTION OF DOCKET #48 filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. Responses due by 4/14/2017. Replies due by 4/21/2017. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2017 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) to Prevent Settlements with Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Reed Kathrein, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d) to Prevent Settlements with Absent Class Members Pending Discovery and Court Review filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. Responses due by 4/14/2017. Replies due by 4/21/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Declaration of Reed Kathrein, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11271391.) filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Paul J. Geller Pro Hac Vice [39]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye Notice of Withdrawal of Nicholas S. Singer as Counsel of Record (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 03/01/17, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: 03/01/17. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [43] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2017. (Related documents(s) [43]) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03-01-2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Theranos, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 3/2/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint [29] held on 3/1/2017: Court takes motion under submission. Counsel for Plaintiffs: Reed Kathrein, Jason Forge. Counsel for Defendant Theranos, Inc.: Michael Mugmon, Robert Smith. Counsel for Defendant Elizabeth Holmes: Patrick Gibbs, Allison Davis. (FTR Time 1:11pm - 1:40pm.) This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE CASES ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Forge (Forge, Jason) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017, Terminated: 3/16/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11178571.) filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Geller, Paul) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Herman (Herman, Dennis) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byRamesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Order Referring Case to Private ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REFERRING CASE to Private ADR [34]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/10/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017, Terminated: 2/10/2017 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc. and Plaintiffs Robert Colman and Hilary Taubman-Dye filed by Ramesh Balwani, Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel for Theranos, Inc. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options 2-08-17 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed byRobert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Theranos, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017, Terminated: 4/18/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 2/7/2017. Replies due by 2/21/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2017) Modified text to correct party filer name on 1/18/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Stephen M. Rummage Pro Hac Vice [27]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Stephen M. Rummage) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11054481.) filed by Ramesh Balwani. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Theranos, Inc... (Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ramesh Balwani.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Ann Davis (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Holmes.. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Dwyer Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Elizabeth Holmes (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Christopher Davies Pro Hac Vice [20]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Davies ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11032319.) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Good Standing Certificate)(Davies, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/3/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Re: Complaint [14]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Application for Admission of Attorney Megan E. Barriger Pro Hac Vice [13]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Application for Admission of Attorney Robert K. Smith Pro Hac Vice [12]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Application for Admission of Attorney Timothy Perla Pro Hac Vice [11]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Complaint, filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Megan E. Barriger, ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11019593.) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Good Standing Certificate)(Barriger, Megan) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Smith ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11019556.) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Good Standing Certificate)(Smith, Robert) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Perla ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11019494.) filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Good Standing Certificate)(Perla, Timothy) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Mugmon on behalf of Theranos, Inc., (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. Service waived by Elizabeth Holmes waiver sent on 12/15/2016, answer due 2/13/2017. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. Theranos, Inc. served on 11/30/2016, answer due 12/21/2016. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Summons Returned Executed. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[7] Certificate of Service filed by Hilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye re [1] Complaint, on Defendant Theranos, Inc. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Colman, Hilary Taubman-Dye.. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2017 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/28/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Volations of California's Securities, Unfair Competition, and Common Laws against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10960078.). Filed byHilary Taubman-Dye, Robert Colman. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 388 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?