Steven Bivens v. Select Portfolio Servicing, In
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-15119

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2016 at 12:17 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109188737 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wayne Charles for Steven Bivens. (ECF: Wayne Charles)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109188394 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexandra Marie Dishun for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (ECF: Alexandra Dishun)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109188380 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Joy Campbell for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (ECF: Alexandra Dishun)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109144753 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Appendix filed [5 VOLUMES] by Appellant Steven Bivens.--[Edited 09/14/2016 by MM] (ECF: Wayne Charles)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 01109143749 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Appellant's brief filed by Steven Bivens. (ECF: Wayne Charles)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109129298 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexandra Marie Dishun for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Alexandra Dishun)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109128796 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER: The motion for leave to file the appellant's civil appeal statement out of time is GRANTED. (AGW)[7886642-2]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109127867 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OUT OF TIME filed by Steven Bivens. Motion is Unopposed. [7886642-1] (ECF: Wayne Charles)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109127771 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Wayne Charles for Appellant Steven Bivens. (ECF: Wayne Charles)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109121743 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Attorney Wayne Charles for Appellant Steven Bivens has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109107580 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Wayne Charles)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109096137 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Steven Bivens on 07/24/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/06/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 08/12/2016 as to Appellant Steven Bivens
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 327 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?