Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Wallace
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Western District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01674

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 4:15 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Mail returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Mail returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for attorney fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Memorandum RulingCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM RULING re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/15/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 9 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment by default be entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. See Judgment for terms. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/20/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Motion Setting
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (Form Included)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Entry of Default
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?