United States v. Morrison
Criminal Case Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cr-00237

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2021 at 5:41 PM DT (4.8 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Kristen Pettersen Morrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caryll S. Alpert +1 615 736 5047 caryll_alpert@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Nashville
Filed 11/30/2016
County Williamson
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Indictment 11/30/16 18:1343 Wire fraud
Count 9-10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
Indictment 11/30/16 18:1028A(a)(1) Aggravated identity theft
Defendant Custody Status Released
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Amended Judgment
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None ~Util - Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None ~Util _ Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/25/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT on sentencing held on 7/20/18 as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Plea of guilty to Counts 5-8. Imprisonment for 12 months and 1 day as to Counts 5-8, to run concurrently. Deft to self-report before 2 PM on 9/5/18. Three years supervised rele ase as to Counts 5-8, to run concurrently, with conditions. $400 special assessment. $264,667.11 restitution. Forfeiture, see Consent Order of Forfeiture (DE No. 28 ). Counts 1-4, 9, and 10 are dismissed on motion by Govt. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/27/18. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None 1 - Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/28/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Kristen Pettersen Morrison (Alpert, Caryll)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Jury Trial is reset for 7/11/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/1/16. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Motion by deft to continue February 14 trial and extend time for filing pretrial motions [12] is granted conditioned upon the timely filing of a waiver of speedy trial. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/1/16. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017, Terminated: 2/1/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue February 14 Trial and Extend the Time for Filing Pretrial Motions by Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (Alpert, Caryll)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Order on Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Motion by deft to extend time for filing pretrial motions [10] is granted. Motions due by 2/1/17. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/4/17. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/4/2017 Motion to Extend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Extend time for filing pretrial motions by Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (Alpert, Caryll)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Jury Trial is set for 2/14/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/14/16. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison: Deft released on own recognizance with conditions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/6/16. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/6/16. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison held on 12/6/2016. R. David Baker appeared with deft on behalf of appointed counsel Caryll S. Alpert. Deft entered a plea of not guilty. Deft released on conditions. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Warrant executed on 12/6/16 as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest of Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant issued as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT: Indictment with grand jury foreperson signature. Document sealed pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Criminal Case Files. THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT FOR PUBLIC DISCLOSURE. (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT filed as to Kristen Pettersen Morrison. (Attachment: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (jb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4,896 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?