Abdul Nevarez v. Forty Niners Football Company, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-07013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 9, 2021 at 1:13 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abdul Nevarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein Borgen Dardarian Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond A Wendell +1 510 763 9800 rwendell@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Mary Dardarian +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 ldar@gbdhlegal.com
Space Andrew Paul Lee +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 alee@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Cabalo +1 510 832 5001 +1 510 832 4787 ccabalo@reinlawoffice.com
Space Adam Brett Wolf +1 415 766 3545 +1 415 402 0058 awolf@prwlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah S Colby +1 415 421 7100 sscolby@schneiderwallace.com
Space Guy Burton Wallace +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 gwallace@schneiderwallace.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A Uhrowczik +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 juhrowczik@schneiderwallace.com
No Logo Priscilla Nevarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein Borgen Dardarian Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond A Wendell +1 510 763 9800 rwendell@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Mary Dardarian +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 ldar@gbdhlegal.com
Space Andrew Paul Lee +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 alee@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Cabalo +1 510 832 5001 +1 510 832 4787 ccabalo@reinlawoffice.com
Space Adam Brett Wolf +1 415 766 3545 +1 415 402 0058 awolf@prwlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah S Colby +1 415 421 7100 sscolby@schneiderwallace.com
Space Guy Burton Wallace +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 gwallace@schneiderwallace.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A Uhrowczik +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 juhrowczik@schneiderwallace.com
No Logo Sebastian DeFrancesco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Paul Lee +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 alee@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy Burton Wallace +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 gwallace@schneiderwallace.com
v.
No Logo City of Santa Clara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Forty Niners Football Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Chilleen +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 MChilleen@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Francis Hurley +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 GHurley@sheppardmullin.com
National Football League National Football League, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2017 Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Santa Clara Stadium Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com
No Logo Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Chilleen +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 MChilleen@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Francis Hurley +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 GHurley@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Ticketmaster L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Chilleen +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 MChilleen@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Francis Hurley +1 714 513 5100 +1 714 513 5130 GHurley@sheppardmullin.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101
Nature of Suit American with Disabilities - Other
  Entries (454) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Appendix
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' DECEMBER 21, 2018 DISCOVERY DISPUTES 297 ; 298 by Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INTERIM ORDER IN RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES [ECF 297 ; ECF 298 (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES OCTOBER 19, 2018 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting in part and denying in part 256 Discovery Letter Brief. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FURTHER ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES OCTOBER 8, 2018 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 238 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on October 16, 2018. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY SUBMISSIONS ECF 244, ECF 245 AND ECF 246 by Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen re 198 Discovery Letter Brief. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Judge Susan van Keulen granting 182 Discovery Letter Brief. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None order on motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None order on motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 135 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 6/14/18 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument. The 6/14/18 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re 175 Objection, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Reply Evidence by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Colby, Sarah) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 168 Reply to Opposition/Response, by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 172 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Memorandum in Support of Objections to Blackseth Declaration by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 172 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Memorandum in Support of Objections to Blackseth Declaration ) filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Memorandum in Support of Objections to Blackseth Declaration filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. Responses due by 6/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Johnson, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark Johnson, # 3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 135 MOTION to Certify Class ) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 157 filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 135 MOTION to Certify Class ) Reply To Third Party Defendants Joinder In Opposition/Response To Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Guy B. Wallace in Support of 135 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 5/29/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 linking entry to document #135 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 135 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary Waters, # 2 Declaration of Jeff Mastin, # 3 Declaration of Donald MacRitchie, # 4 Declaration of Abdul Nevarez, # 5 Declaration of Priscilla Nevarez, # 6 Declaration of Sebastian DeFrancesco, # 7 Declaration of Karen Maxey)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE DISCLOSURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/16/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 164 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Turner/Devcon re 162 Request for Judicial Notice, 160 Opposition/Response to Motion, 161 Declaration in Support, (Creech, Randall) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice re 160 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byTurner/Devcon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Creech, Randall) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Randall C. Creech in Support of 160 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byTurner/Devcon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F to Declaration of Randall C Creech)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Creech, Randall) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 135 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byTurner/Devcon. (Creech, Randall) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority re 154 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Brian P. Maschler In Support Of Defendants' Administrative Motion For Leave To File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted Version Of Attachment A To Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Version Of Exhibit B To Declaration Of Maria L. Lampasona In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion For Leave To File Documents Under Seal)(Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 139 Appendix, Defendants' Objection To Plaintiffs' Appendix In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix re 154 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Defendants' Appendix Of Declarations In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 154 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration Of Maria L. Lampasona In Support Of Defendants Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, City Of Santa Clara, And Santa Clara Stadium Authority's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A To Declaration of Maria L. Lampasona, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B To Declaration of Maria L. Lampasona, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C through Q To Declaration of Maria L. Lampasona)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 135 MOTION to Certify Class ) Defendants Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, City Of Santa Clara, And Santa Clara Stadium Authority's Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Opposition To Motion For Class Certification filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 150 Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Joseph Pohle (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix re 135 MOTION to Certify Class Appendix of Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - CORRECTED VERSION OF DOCKET # 139 filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 123 Order filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ASSOCIATION of Counsel by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Cominos, Dion) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Johnson (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Alexei Offill-Klein in Support of 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Related document(s) 145 ) (Offill-Klein, Alexei) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 144 Request for Judicial Notice, 135 MOTION to Certify Class by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah Colby in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1- Unredacted Version of Exhibit J to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 3 Exhibit 2- Unredacted Version of Exhibit K to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 4 Exhibit 3- Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 5 Exhibit 4- Unredacted Version of Exhibit S to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 6 Exhibit 5- Unredacted Version of Exhibit W to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 7 Exhibit 6- Unredacted Version of Exhibit V to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 8 Exhibit 7- Redacted Version of Exhibit V to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 135 MOTION to Certify Class by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Linda M. Dardarian in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Adam Wolf in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Guy Wallace in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 2 Exhibit H, Part 1 to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 3 Exhibit H, Part 2 to Declaration of Guy Wallace, # 4 Exhibit I-Z to Declaration of Guy Wallace)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix re 135 MOTION to Certify Class Appendix of Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of William Scott McBrayer in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jeffrey Scott Mastin in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-R to Declaration of Jeffrey Mastin)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Gary Waters in Support of 135 MOTION to Certify Class filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gary Waters, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gary Waters, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 1 to Declaration of Gary Waters, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 2 to Declaration of Gary Waters, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 3 to Declaration of Gary Waters, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Gary Waters)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Certify Class filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/21/2018. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Plaintiff's List of Physical Barriers at Parking Lots Pursuant to Court's February 28, 2018 Order by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Plaintiffs' List of Physical Barriers at Bourbon Pub, Bourbon Steak, and the Tailgate Pursuant to Court's February 28, 2018 Order by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement (Plaintiffs' List of Physical Barriers at Levi's Stadium Pursuant to Court's February 28, 2018 Order) by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/28/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING MARCH 1, 2018 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/5/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/28/2018, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 124 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2018. (Related documents(s) 124 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Catherine Cabalo RE: STATUS OF NEVAREZ ARBITRATIONS W/ TICKETMASTER LLC & LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. filed byAbdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/28/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Scheduling of Depositions Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/28/2018 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/28/2018. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/28/18 from 4:05 - 4:47 PM (42 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 7/11/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Guy Burton Wallace and Catherine M. Cabalo. For Defendant(s): Maria M. Lampasona, Randall C. Creech, and Gregory F. Hurley, appearing telephonically for a portion of the hearing only. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2017 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Third Party Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial byTurner/Devcon. (Creech, Randall) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER RE NOTICE TO PROPOSED CLASS MEMBERS, granting ECF No. 117 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/24/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Proposed Form of Notice to Class filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Notice to Class)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/29/2017, before Judge Koh. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 111 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (Related documents(s) 111 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 114 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Notice)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING 108 DECEMBER 14, 2017 JOINT DISCOVERY STATEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/5/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority re 107 Third Party Complaint, 112 Summons Issued (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Turner/Devcon. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/17 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION WITH DEFENDANTS LIVE NATION AND TICKETMASTER by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 12/14/2017) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, # 8 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order)(Colby, Sarah) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Turner/Devcon. Filed byForty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 104 Leave to File Third Party Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING RULE 34 SITE INSPECTIONS (In re: ECF No. 98 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/8/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Third Party Complaint filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/29/17 from 2:28 - 2:50 PM (22 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 2/28/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Andrew Paul Lee and Guy Burton Wallace. For Defendant(s): Alexei Nathan Offill-Klein and Maria M. Lampasona. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2017) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Request for a Site Inspection Under Rule 34 by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Offill-Klein, Alexei) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 98 Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen Proposed Order re Rule 34 Site Inspections by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (In re: ECF Nos. 94 and 95 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/27/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: 11/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/24/2017. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Redline Version of Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/16/17 before Lucy H. Koh by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/16/2017, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 89 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2017. (Related documents(s) 89 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/16/2017 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Plead filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 8/25/2017) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/16/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/16/17 from 2:24-3:12 PM (48 minutes). A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 11/29/17 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Guy B. Wallace, Sarah Colby, Andrew P. Lee, and Catherine Cabalo. For Defendant(s): Maria M. Lampasona, appearing telephonically. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2017) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 60 Motion to Compel Arbitration.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting 82 - Defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh 8/14/17.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting 79 - Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh 8/9/17.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone on August 16, 2017 filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Santa Clara Stadium Authority, Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Filed byPriscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, Sebastian DeFrancesco. (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2017) Modified text on 8/9/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez for Judge Koh's Standing Orders (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Dismiss of Forty Niners Football Company LLC; Forty Niners SC Stadium Company LLC; Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC; City of Santa Clara; and Santa Clara Stadium Authority.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re 67 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Related document(s) 67 ) (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, an Initial CMC has been set for 8/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 58 and 60 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 8/3/17 at 1:30 PM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting 71 - Defendants' Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signedby Hon. Lucy H. Koh 7/27/17.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically)(Chilleen, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 69 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 60 MOTION to Dismiss and COMPEL Arbitration ) filed byTicketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Han iso Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Han, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Han, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Han, # 5 Declaration of Chilleen iso Reply, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chilleen, # 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chilleen)(Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Guy Wallace in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Guy Wallace - Redacted Version of Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Guy Wallace - Unredacted Version of Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Plaintiff Abdul Nevarez, # 11 Exhibit C to Declaration of Guy Wallace - Redacted Version of Declaration of Plaintiff Priscilla Nevarez, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Plaintiff Priscilla Nevarez, # 13 Exhibit D to Declaration of Guy Wallace - Unredacted Version of Declaration of Plaintiff Priscilla Nevarez, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Plaintiff Priscilla Nevarez, # 15 Exhibit E to Declaration of Guy Wallace)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to ( 60 MOTION to Dismiss and COMPEL Arbitration ) filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Lee in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ticketmaster L.L.C.'s and Live Nation Entertainment Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration)(Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2017) Modified text on 6/19/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 58 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCity of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 63 Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [proposed] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS TICKETMASTER L.L.C.S AND LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF GUY B. WALLACE IN SUPPORT THEREOF re 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 61 Stipulation regarding briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to dismiss.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 60 filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 5/19/2017) Modified on 5/22/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss and COMPEL Arbitration filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/31/2017. Replies due by 6/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Han in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew P. Lee)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/15/2017. Replies due by 5/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: 4/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint 50 Amended Complaint, byLive Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Brett Wolf (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/13/2017) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/13/2017) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT > for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC, Santa Clara Stadium Authority, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Filed byPriscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, Sebastian DeFrancesco. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/13/2017) Modified text on 4/14/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Alexander Wendell (Wendell, Raymond) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Mary Dardarian (Dardarian, Linda) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 46 Stipulation to file Second Amended Complaint. Finding as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss; 42 Motion for Joinder; 28 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Permit Plaintiffs to File the Second Amended Complaint filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 42 MOTION for Joinder ) filed byAbdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Paul Lee (Lee, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss , 32 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAbdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Guy B. Wallace, # 2 Exhibit A to Wallace Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Wallace Decl.)(Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joinder filed by Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Ticketmaster's Joinder)(Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Stipulation regarding briefing schedule on Defendants' motions to dismiss. No further extensions will be granted.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; Declaration of Guy B. Wallace in Support Thereof filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Uhrowczik (Uhrowczik, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah S Colby (Colby, Sarah) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 35 Stipulation.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 30 MOTION to Dismiss , 28 MOTION to Dismiss , 32 MOTION to Dismiss Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Guy Burton Wallace for Plaintiffs Abdul Nevarez and Priscilla Nevarez (Wallace, Guy) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 32 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Santa Clara, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Santa Clara, Santa Clara Stadium Authority. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/21/2017. Replies due by 2/28/2017. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 30 MOTION to Dismiss by National Football League. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Football League. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/21/2017. Replies due by 2/28/2017. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 28 MOTION to Dismiss by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss filed by Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/21/2017. Replies due by 2/28/2017. (Lampasona, Maria) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. Service waived by Santa Clara Stadium Authority waiver sent on 2/6/2017, answer due 4/7/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. Forty Niners Football Company, LLC served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. National Football League served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. City of Santa Clara served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Amended Complaint 9 Amended Complaint byTicketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. Service waived by Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC waiver sent on 1/26/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint, Summons, and Scheduling Order served on Forty Niners Football Company, LLC on 1/5/17, filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint, Summons, and Scheduling Order served on Forty Niners SC Stadium, LLC on 1/5/17, filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint, Summons, and Scheduling Order served on Ticketmaster on 1/5/17, filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint, Summons, and Scheduling Order served on City of Santa Clara on 1/5/17, filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint, Summons, and Scheduling Order served on National Football League on 1/5/2017, filed by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 2/2/2017) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Forty Niners Stadium Management Company. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/20/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTicketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (Hurley, Gregory) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byPriscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 12/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abdul Nevarez, Priscilla Nevarez.. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to City of Santa Clara, Forty Niners Football Company, LLC, Forty Niners SC Stadium Company, LLC, National Football League, Santa Clara Stadium Authority, Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing fee of $400.00 paid; Receipt #0971-10988953) Filed by PRISCILLA NEVAREZ, ABDUL NEVAREZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Cabalo, Catherine) (Filed on 12/7/2016) Modified on 12/7/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 169 Declaration in Support, filed by Prisci lla Nevarez, Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to Private Mediation with a deadline of May 23, 2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. 87 . Further Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Class Certification Hearing set for 6/14/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for 2/7/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial (8 day estimate) set for 4/22/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 66 Proposed Summons filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Sebastian DeFrancesco, Abdul Nevarez. Summons already issued as to the original complaint, first amended complaint and the second amended complaint. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***Setting hearing as to 42 MOTION for Joinder: Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 and 32 Responses due by 3/30/2017. Replies due by 4/13/2017. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event Summons Returned Executed. Re: 16 Affidavit of Service, filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, 18 Affidavit of Service, filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, 19 Affidavit of Service, filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, 15 Affidavit of Service, filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez, 17 Affidavit of Service, filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic filing error re 1 proposed summons attached to complaint filed by Priscilla Nevarez, Abdul Nevarez. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the proposed summons as a separate docket entry from the complaint. Proposed summons should list the names of each defendant being served. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 434 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?