Jacobs v. U.S. Bank and Trust N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-02950

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 4:02 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Memorandum Opinion: Defendant U.S. Bank's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 27) is granted. The remaining motions (Doc. Nos. 7, 15, 16, 17 and 19) are denied as moot. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/20/2017. (S,AL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Strike
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Strike
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?