ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-07721
District Judge Jose L. Linares, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2021 at 10:14 AM ST (3.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adapt Pharma Operations Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. BATON +1 973 286 6700 wbaton@saul.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA +1 973 286 6700 clizza@saul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH ANN SULLIVAN +1 973 286 6700 ssullivan@saul.com
No Logo ADAPT PHARMA, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. BATON +1 973 286 6700 wbaton@saul.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA +1 973 286 6700 clizza@saul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH ANN SULLIVAN +1 973 286 6700 ssullivan@saul.com
No Logo Opiant Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. BATON +1 973 286 6700 wbaton@saul.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA +1 973 286 6700 clizza@saul.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH ANN SULLIVAN +1 973 286 6700 ssullivan@saul.com
v.
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD."
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (151) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Taxation of Costs
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit Washington DC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Opinion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Opinion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Bench Trial - Completed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order to Refund Fees
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Markman Opening Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Markman Opening Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Discovery Confidentiality Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm ) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ADAMPT PHARMA, INC., ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED, OPIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ADAMPT PHARMA, INC., ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED, OPIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (Miller, S) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAPT PHARMA, INC., ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED, OPIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Miller, S) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7434816) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADAPT PHARMA OPERATIONS LIMITED, OPIANT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ADAPT PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, S) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 430 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?