United States v. Antoine
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-10383

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 16, 2021 at 9:18 PM DT (6.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lutherson Bonheur, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Joshua Robert Hanye +1 617 223 8061 joshua_hanye@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Procedural Order re sentencing hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference as to Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont held on December 12, 2016, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. (17-1569 Obinna Obiora). Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Transcript of Motion for Continuance as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont held on December 6, 2016, before Judge William G. Young. COA Case No. (17-1569 Obinna Obiora). Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 7/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Michelle Collins. Time excluded from 1/9/2017 until 9/18/2017. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Michelle Collins Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 335 Motion to set a trial date as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Michelle Collins (4). Time excluded. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Assented to MOTION set a trial date as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Michelle Collins by USA. (Foley, Leah) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING HEARING OR OTHER DEADLINE as to Lutherson Bonheur. Hearing or Deadline canceled: Final Pretrial/Jury Trial deadlines are terminated. The Court allowed 247 Joint Motion to Continue Trial. Date to be set at a later time. The defendant will now proceed to trial with defendants Antoine and Collins. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Final Pretrial Conference as to Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont held on 12/12/2016. The Court enters an Order granting 247 Motion to Continue as to Lutherson Bonheur (2). Defendant Bonheur will proceed to trial with defendants Antoine and Collins. The Court sets pretrial deadlines, pretrial order to issue. The trial is expected to last two weeks if all defendants proceed to trial. The Court reviews the sessions trial procedures and answers questions of counsel. Defendants Colleen Marhefka and Anthony Holzworth request a change of plea hearing. The clerk sets Rule 11 hearings for Thursday, January 5, 2017 at 2 PM. (Attorneys present: Ausa Foley and Rosen for the government, Hanye for Bonheur, Masferrer for Phanord, Krasnoo for Obinna Obiora, Kistner for Potts, Liston for Holzworth, Cronin for Marhefka, Cloherty for Grant, Cunha for Chukwuma Obiora, Sultan on behalf of Rankin for defendant Fleurimont.. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Joint MOTION to Continue to tbd to trial as to Lutherson Bonheur by USA. (Foley, Leah) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge William G. Young. LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont held on 12/6/2016 re 235 Joint MOTION to Continue trial to a date. After conferring with counsel, the Court grants the motion for the reasons stated on the record as to defendant Marvin Antoine (1) and Michelle Collins (4); denies motion as to all other defendants, trial to commence on January 9, 2017. A new trial date to be set for defendants Antoine and Collins - time shall be excluded. A pretrial conference is set for 12/12/2016 at 2:00 PM. Defendants Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts and Michelle Collins present and remanded to custody at conclusion of the hearing. (Attorneys present: Ausa Rosen for the government, Hanye for defendant Bonheur, Masferrer for Phanord, Tennen for Collins, Krasnoo for Obinna Obiora, Braceras for Potts, Liston for Holzworth, Cunha for Chukwuma Obiora and on hehalf of Attorney Sheketoff for defendant Antoine and attorney Cronin for defendant Marhefka, Cloherty for defendant Grant and Rankin for Fleurimont. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Michelle Collins, Colleen Marhefka, Chukwuma Obiora 235 Joint MOTION to Continue trial to a date to be determined by the court to avoid conflicting trials and allow proper preparation : Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge William G. Young. COUNSEL SHALL NOTIFY THE CLERK IF THEY WISH THEIR CLIENT BE BROUGHT IN FOR THIS HEARING.(Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 12/1/2016 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eric Rosen appearing for USA. (Rosen, Eric) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint MOTION to Continue trial to a date to be determined by the court to avoid conflicting trials and allow proper preparation as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Michelle Collins, Colleen Marhefka, Chukwuma Obiora by Chukwuma Obiora. (Cunha, John) Modified on 11/29/2016 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Modified on 11/29/2016 to Correct Docket Text and Party Filers of the Motion) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 11/28/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua Robert Hanye appearing for Lutherson Bonheur. Type of Appearance: Federal Defender Office. (Hanye, Joshua) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Transcript of Arraignment (Second Superseding Indictment) as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Marshawn Potts, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant held on July 12, 2016, before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at bond.court.reporting@comcast.net, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Transcript of Arraignment (Superseding Indictment) as to Lutherson Bonheur, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts held on January 21, 2016, before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at bond.court.reporting@comcast.net, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Transcript of Arraignment as to Lutherson Bonheur held on December 17, 2015, before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at bond.court.reporting@comcast.net, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Transcript of Initial Appearance as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur held on November 23, 2015, before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond at bond.court.reporting@comcast.net, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Transcript of Initial Status Conference as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth held on February 11, 2016, before Judge William G. Young. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Case as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Marshawn Potts, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Arraignment held on 7/12/2016 as to Marvin Antoine (1) Count 1ss,3ss,4ss,5ss,6ss-7ss,9ss,10ss: Defendant pleads Not Guilty to all counts. Lutherson Bonheur (2) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss,4ss,6ss,9ss: Defendant pleads Not Guilty to all counts. Fredly Phanord (3) Count 1ss,4ss,6ss,9ss: Defendant pleads Not Guilty to all counts. Marshawn Potts (6) Count 1ss: Defendant pleads Not Guilty to counts 1ss. Donovan Grant (9) Count 1s,10s: Defendant pleads Not Guilty to all counts. Defendant Colleen Marhefka did not appear. Arraignment as to Colleen Marhefka continued to 7/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Attorneys present: Foley, Sheketoff, McNamara, Kistner, Cronin. Attorney Masferer and Cloherty did not appear. Attorney Sheketoff stands in for both attorneys with their client's consent.) (USPO: Miller, Broquist.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 141 Joint Motion to Continue as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Fredly Phanord (3), Obinna Obiora (5), Marshawn Potts (6), Colleen Marhefka (8), Donovan Grant (9); Arraignment set for 7/12/2016 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Arraignment to 07212016 as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant by USA. (Foley, Leah) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, William Fleurimont; Arraignment set for 6/23/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Reason for referral: Bail and Arraignment as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant, Chukwuma Obiora, William Fleurimont (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Marvin Antoine (1) count(s) 1ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss-7ss, 9ss, 10ss, Lutherson Bonheur (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 4ss, 6ss, 9ss, Fredly Phanord (3) count(s) 1ss, 4ss, 6ss, 9ss, Michelle Collins (4) count(s) 1ss, 8ss, 10ss, Obinna Obiora (5) count(s) 1ss, Marshawn Potts (6) count(s) 1ss, Anthony Holzworth (7) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, Colleen Marhefka (8) count(s) 1ss, Donovan Grant (9) count(s) 1s, 10s, Chukwuma Obiora (10) count(s) 1, 11, 12, William Fleurimont (11) count(s) 1, 13, 14. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/15/2016) (Danieli, Chris). (Main Document 133 replaced on 6/17/2016) (Danieli, Chris). (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant. Time excluded from 1/6/2016 until 1/9/2017. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Initial Status Conference as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant held on 2/11/2016. The Court sets a tentative trial date of January 9, 2017 at 9:00 AM. A final pretrial conference is set for 12/12/2016. The Court informs counsel that the trial will not last longer than 20 trial days and that the government shall be prepared to prove any enhancements. Time is excluded for the reasons stated on the record. The government informs the Court that they intend to have a superseding indictment filed which adds an additional up to three defendants. Scheduling Order to issue. (Attorneys present: Ausa Foley for the government, McNamara for Bonheur, Glazer standing in for Masferrer for Phanord, Wheeler for Collins, Falvery standing in for Braceras as to Potts, for Liston as to Holzworth and O'Hara as to Obiora, Cronin for Marhefka and standing in for Sheketoff as to Antoine. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant. Initial Status Conference reset for 2/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. PLEASE NOTE: Time change only. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                Case as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Arraignment as to Marvin Antoine (1) Count 1s,3s,4s,5s,6s-7s,9s,10s and Lutherson Bonheur (2) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s,6s,9s and Fredly Phanord (3) Count 1s,4s,6s,9s and Obinna Obiora (5) Count 1s and Marshawn Potts (6) Count 1s held on 1/21/2016. Defendants advised of charges; defendants advised of constitutional and legal rights; defendants waive reading of the Superseding Indictment; defendants advised of maximum penalties. Plea entered by Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts: Not Guilty on all counts. Case to be returned to William G. Young, USDJ for further proceedings, Initial Status Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 2:00 PM. Defendants remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal (Attorneys present: For the Government: Susan G. Winkler; For the Defendants: Robert L. Skeketoff, Eduardo A. Masferrer, Cara McNamara, Raymond A. O'Hara, and Roberto M. Braceras. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Reset Hearings as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora. Arraignment set for 1/21/2016 02:00 PM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 89 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing as to Marshawn Potts, Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, and Obinna Obiora. Arraignment re-set for 1/21/2016 02:00 PM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka; Arraignment set for 1/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Reason for referral: Bail and Arraignment as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka, Donovan Grant (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Marvin Antoine (1) count(s) 1s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s-7s, 9s, 10s, Lutherson Bonheur (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 6s, 9s, Fredly Phanord (3) count(s) 1s, 4s, 6s, 9s, Michelle Collins (4) count(s) 1s, 8s, 10s, Obinna Obiora (5) count(s) 1s, Marshawn Potts (6) count(s) 1s, Anthony Holzworth (7) count(s) 1s, 2s, Colleen Marhefka (8) count(s) 1s, Donovan Grant (9) count(s) 1, 10. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka. Initial Status Conference set for 2/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Case as to Lutherson Bonheur no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Arraignment as to Lutherson Bonheur (2) re Counts 1,2,3,4,6,9 held on 12/17/2015 in Courtroom 16, USDC, Boston, MA; deft advised of charges; deft advised of constitutional and legal rights; deft waived reading of the Indictment; deft advised of maximum penalties; Plea entered by by Lutherson Bonheur, Not Guilty on Counts 1,2,3,4,6,9; case to be returned to William G. Young, USDJ, for further proceedings; deft remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal. (Attorneys present: AUSA Foley for the Gov't; McNamara for the deft. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Marshawn Potts; Arraignment set for 12/17/2015 01:45 PM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 40 Motion to Unseal Case as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Fredly Phanord (3), Michelle Collins (4), Obinna Obiora (5), Marshawn Potts (6), Anthony Holzworth (7), Colleen Marhefka (8) (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION to Unseal Case as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Reason for referral: Bail and Arraignment as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka; Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 31 Motion to Seal Case as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Fredly Phanord (3), Michelle Collins (4), Obinna Obiora (5), Marshawn Potts (6), Anthony Holzworth (7), Colleen Marhefka (8) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Case as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins, Obinna Obiora, Marshawn Potts, Anthony Holzworth, Colleen Marhefka by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to Marvin Antoine (1) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 5, 6-7, 9, 10, Lutherson Bonheur (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 9, Fredly Phanord (3) count(s) 1, 4, 6, 9, Michelle Collins (4) count(s) 1, 8, 10, Obinna Obiora (5) count(s) 1, Marshawn Potts (6) count(s) 1, Anthony Holzworth (7) count(s) 1, 2, Colleen Marhefka (8) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION as to Lutherson Bonheur (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Lutherson Bonheur (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Preliminary /Detention Hearing as to Lutherson Bonheur held on 12/4/2015. Case called, Counsel, PO Miller & Defendant appear, Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing, and, files waiver, Defendant assents to an order of detention, but, reserves his right to a detention hearing in the future, Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals, Order to issue.(Attorneys present: Foley, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording - 1:00 For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Lutherson Bonheur Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 12/4/2015 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Initial Appearance as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur held on 11/23/2015. Case called, Counsel, PO Roberts and Defendants appear, Defendants notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Attorney O'Hara is standing in for today's purposes only for retained counsel who is unavailable, Financial Affidavit filed by Defendant Bonheur, The Court Orders FPD Cara McNamara appointed, Government moves for detention, Defendant Antoine is continued to Novemeber 30 @ 2:45 for preliminary/detention hearing, Defendant Bonheur is continued for December 4 @ 12:00 for preliminary/detention hearing, Both Defendants remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (Attorneys present: Foley, O'Hara, McNamara. )Court Reporter: Digital Recording - 5:15 For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REDACTED Complaint as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Affidavit of Scott F. Dunn)(Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SEALED COMPLAINT as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Donovan Grant (3), Fredly Phanord (4), Michelle Collins (5). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott F. Dunn, # 2 JS45, # 3 Redacted Complaint, # 4 Redacted Affidavit)(Belpedio, Lisa) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/3/2015) (Belpedio, Lisa). [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Marvin Antoine (1), Lutherson Bonheur (2), Donovan Grant (3), Fredly Phanord (4), Michelle Collins (5) (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Case as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Donovan Grant, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Marvin Antoine, Lutherson Bonheur, Donovan Grant, Fredly Phanord, Michelle Collins; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) [1:15-mj-04432-DHH] (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?