Stile et al v. Tesla Motors, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06810-ARR-PK
Magistrate Judge Allyne R. Ross, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 18, 2018 at 12:00 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Catherine Stile, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ccpclaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Cassisi +1 516 294 5050 fcassisi@ccpclaw.net
No Logo Stile, Paul, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Paul Stile"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Cassisi +1 516 294 5050 fcassisi@ccpclaw.net
v.
Tesla Motors New York LLC Tesla Motors New York LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schenker, Krause, Crogan & Lopez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Bersak +1 212 225 7700 +1 212 225 7745 michael.1.bersak@zurichna.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Bersak +1 212 225 7700 +1 212 225 7745 michael.1.bersak@zurichna.com
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tesla Motors New York LLC, Tesla Motors, Inc. (Bersak, Michael)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 letter
    Letter to Request Pre Motion Conference by Tesla Motors New York LLC, Tesla Motors, Inc. (Bersak, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Notice - other
      NOTICE re [5] Letter. Defendants have submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, plaintiffs are required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven business days from service of defendants' letter. (Matsumura, Rebecca)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
        This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Clerks Notice of Rule 73
          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bersak on behalf of Tesla Motors New York LLC, Tesla Motors, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Bersak, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 notice of removal
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tesla Motors New York LLC, Tesla Motors, Inc. from New York State Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 516728/2016. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9127212) (Attachments: # (1) Removal Action Complaint, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet) (Bersak, Michael)
              LREF
              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
              Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?