Feliz v. City Of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-05261
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2019 at 3:40 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wellington Feliz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allyson Stein +1 718 450 7731 a.stein@fuchsberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Jacob D. Fuchsberg Law Firm, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan L. Fuchsberg +1 212 869 3500 +1 212 398 1532 a.fuchsberg@fuchsberg.com
v.
No Logo Bronx-lebanon Hospital Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE F. GILPATRICK +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 bgilpatrick@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP (WP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan James Alt +1 914 559 3129 +1 914 949 1160 balt@hpmb.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: granting 76 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The settlement conference scheduled for Tuesday, August 29, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED and RESCHEDULED to Friday, October 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties are directed to continue their settlement negotiations and shall submit ex parte settlement letters detailing outstanding areas of disagreement to the Court by are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Friday, September 29, 2017. Should the parties resolve the litigation before the conference date, they must notify the Court in writing immediately. Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2017) (ap) Modified on 8/17/2017 (ap). (Entered: 08/16/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Settlement Conference to October 2, 2017 or a later date) addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Carolyn Kruk dated August 15, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated August 4, 2017 re: Status of Settlement Discussions. Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER: There is currently a post-discovery status conference scheduled in this matter for July 21, 2017. Dkt. No. 46. On June 21, 2016, the Magistrate Judge stayed discovery in this matter to August 29, 2017, to facilitate settlement. Dkt. No. 70. The Court hereby adjourns the July 21, 2017 conference. The parties are ordered to file a discovery status update with this Court on or before September 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/19/2017) (ama) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 72 Letter filed by City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Jeffrey Loperfido's motion to withdraw as counsel for the City of New York is GRANTED. Attorney Jeffrey Loperfido terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/12/2017) (ap) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jeffrey Loperfido dated July 11, 2017 re: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record. Document filed by City Of New York.(Loperfido, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Jeffrey Loperfido to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by City Of New York.(Loperfido, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/11/2017 (db). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court finds that a stay would promote the parties good faith efforts to resolve this case and therefore GRANTS a stay of discovery through Tuesday, August 29, 2017. A settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, August 29, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth in this order. (Status Conference set for 8/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/21/2017) (ap) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to 65 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to 65 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center.(Gilpatrick, Bruce) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center.(Gilpatrick, Bruce) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated June 14, 2017 re: Joint Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in Anticipation of the June 21, 2017 Initial Conference. Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 61 Amended Complaint,, against Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, City Of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wellington Feliz, Suleika Feliz. Related document: 61 Amended Complaint,, filed by Suleika Feliz, Wellington Feliz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NYPD Language Access Plan, # 2 Exhibit NYPD Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit Order Granting Letter Motion for Leave to Re-file Second Amended Complaint)(Fuchsberg, Alan) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 62 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alan Fuchsberg dated June 5, 2017 filed by Wellington Feliz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/07/2017) (ama) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 62 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to refile their Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alan Fuchsberg dated June 5, 2017. Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Fuchsberg, Alan) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 29 Amended Complaint,,, 5 Complaint against Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, City Of New York, New York City Police Department with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wellington Feliz, Suleika Feliz. Related document: 29 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Wellington Feliz, 5 Complaint filed by Wellington Feliz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NYPD Language Access Plan, # 2 Exhibit NYPD Settlement Agreement)(Fuchsberg, Alan) Modified on 5/30/2017 (pc). (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: withdrawing 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss. Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 21, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close Dkt. Nos. 21, 24, and 34. The motions to dismiss at Dkt. Nos. 21 and 24 were rendered moot by the filing of an amended pleading on November 7, 2016 (Dkt. No. 29). The motion to dismiss at Dkt. No. 34 has been withdrawn pursuant to a May 22, 2017 letter (Dkt No. 57), and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/24/2017) (ap) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 57 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; with respect to 57 Letter Motion to Stay. The Court orders that the Plaintiff file the proposed Second Amended Complaint on or before May 26, 2017. The Defendants will then have three weeks from the date the complaint is filed to file their answers. Additionally, in a separate order, the Court has referred this case to the magistrate judge for general pre-trial and settlement. The parties may direct any motions for a stay of discovery to the magistrate in the first instance. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/23/2017) (ras) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/23/2017) (ras) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the proposed Second Amended Complaint (City and Bronx Lebanon) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk dated May 22, 2017., LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery (all Parties) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk dated May 22, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 3/17/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 3/17/2017 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: granting 53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to file Second Amended Complaint. (Accordingly, the parties request a fourth extension of time, from May 15, 2017 to May 22, 2017, to inform the Court whether Defendants will consent to Plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint). There will be no further extensions. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/12/2017) (ama) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    FOURTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Response re Defendants' Position re Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk dated May 12, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: granting 51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/24/2017) (ap) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to inform the Court as to whether Defendants consent to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated April 21, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 49 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to inform the Court as to whether Defendants consent to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk dated April 12, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/13/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to inform the Court as to whether Defendants consent to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk dated April 12, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: granting 47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Accordingly, Defendants respectfully request an extension of time, from March 31 to April 12, 2017, to inform the Court whether they consent to Plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/30/2017) (ama) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Inform the Court whether Defendants' Consent to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Carolyn Kruk and Bruce Gilpatrick dated March 30, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). All Fact Discovery due by 7/17/2017. All Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2017. Deposition due by 9/1/2017. This case is to be tried to a jury. Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/22/2017) (ama) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated March 20, 2017 re: Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce J. Gitlin on behalf of Wellington Feliz. (Gitlin, Bruce) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference previously set for Friday, March 10, 2017 at 3 :00 pm is hereby re-scheduled for Friday, March 17, 2017 at 2:45 pm in Courtroom 318 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2017 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 318 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/08/2017) (ama) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated March 3, 2017 re: in Anticipation of the March 10, 2017 Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/20/2017) (cla) Modified on 1/20/2017 (cla). (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City Of New York. (Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Allyson L. Stein, Esq. in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - NYPD Language Access Plan, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 1 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 3 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 4 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 5 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 6 - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript, # 8 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Allyson L. Stein, Esq. dated December 12, 2016 re: Plaintiff's Intention. Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City Of New York. (Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffrey Loperfido in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in part, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wellington Feliz on December 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m..Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center.(Gilpatrick, Bruce) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center.(Gilpatrick, Bruce) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/15/2016) (mro) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated 11/15/2016. Document filed by City Of New York.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 5 Complaint against Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, City Of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wellington Feliz. Related document: 5 Complaint filed by Wellington Feliz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Williams Opinion and Order - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Williams - Opinion and Order - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B - Williams Summary Judgment Transcript - Part 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit C - NYPD Settlement Agreement, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit D - NYPD Language Access Plan)(Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Allyson L. Stein, Esq. dated October 20, 2016 re: Advising of plaintiff's intention to amend the pleadings.. Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER. On October 6, 2016, Defendant Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center filed a motion to dismiss. On October 11, 2016, Defendants The City of New York and New York City Police Department filed a motion to dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 3.F of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, on or before October 21, 2016 Plaintiff must notify the Court and his adversaries in writing whether (1) he intends to file an amended pleading and when he will do so or (2) he will rely on the pleading being attacked. Plaintiff is on notice that declining to amend his pleadings to timely respond to a fully briefed argument in the Defendants' motions to dismiss may well constitute a waiver of the Plaintiffs right to use the amendment process to cure any defects that have been made apparent by the Defendants' briefing. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC., 797 F.3d 160 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"). If Plaintiff chooses to amend, Defendants may then (a) file an answer; (b) file a new motion to dismiss; or (c) submit a letter stating that they rely on the initially-filed motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/12/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (Loperfido, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DECLARATION in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6).. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Loperfido, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department.(Loperfido, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. (Alt, Brendan) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Brendan J. Alt, Esq. in Support re: 21 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Alt, Brendan) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. Responses due by 10/21/2016 Return Date set for 10/28/2016 at 09:00 AM.(Alt, Brendan) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Loperfido on behalf of City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (Loperfido, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Police Department served on 8/19/2016, answer due 10/10/2016. Service was accepted by Stephanie Stewart - Attorney. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Francis Gilpatrick on behalf of Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. (Gilpatrick, Bruce) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan James Alt on behalf of Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. (Alt, Brendan) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk on behalf of City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated 09/09/2016. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/9/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth C. DeGori dated 09/09/2016. Document filed by City Of New York, New York City Police Department.(Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Carolyn Degori on behalf of City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (Degori, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center served on 8/19/2016, answer due 10/10/2016. Service was accepted by Josie Perez, Risk Management Clerk. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. City Of New York served on 8/19/2016, answer due 9/9/2016. Service was accepted by B Mazyck, Clerk. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brendan J. Alt, Esq. dated August 31, 2016. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/1/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brendan J. Alt, Esq. dated August 31, 2016. Document filed by Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center.(Alt, Brendan) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, City Of New York, New York City Police Department. (laq) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, New York City Police Department and Bronx-Lebanon Hospital Center, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, New York City Police Department, Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, re: 3 Complaint, 1 Complaint, 5 Complaint. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Stein, Allyson) Modified on 8/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, City Of New York, New York City Police Department. Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stein, Allyson) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Stein, Allyson) Modified on 8/11/2016 (pc). (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, New York City Police Department, Bronx Lebanon Hospital Center, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Wellington Feliz. (Fuchsberg, Alan) Modified on 7/5/2016 (rch). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12493613)Document filed by Wellington Feliz.(Fuchsberg, Alan) Modified on 7/5/2016 (rch). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?