Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-611

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 12, 2016 at 11:58 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 11/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1898009] [16-611] [Entered: 11/02/2016 10:44 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Allyson Smith, FILED. Service date 10/31/2016 by CM/ECF. [1895924] [16-611] [Entered: 10/31/2016 11:24 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1892592] [16-611] [Entered: 10/26/2016 09:58 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 58 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Allyson Smith, FILED. Service date 07/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1820872] [16-611] [Entered: 07/20/2016 03:31 PM]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David Michael Bizar, Esq. for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1820404] [16-611] [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:44 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Randall Scott Newman, Esq. for Appellant Allyson Smith, FILED. Service date 07/19/2016 by CM/ECF. [1819354] [16-611] [Entered: 07/19/2016 01:03 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time; Appellee's brief is deemed filed [45][47], filed by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., by RKW, FILED. [1810289][52] [16-611] [Entered: 07/07/2016 03:45 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 36 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?