Smego v. Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-04261

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 5:16 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard Michael Smego, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Michael Smego +1 217 322 3204
v.
No Logo Angela Hoyt, Defendant
No Logo Chad Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Harmony Goorley, Defendant
No Logo James Dimas, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Block, Defendant
No Logo Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lindsey Wagner, Defendant
No Logo R Hyman, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 560 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Certificate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Certificate
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Disqualify Judge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None HIPAA Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Merit Review Opinion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Letter from CDIL Clerk to Rushville Detention Facility - Trust Fund Dept. requesting trust fund ledgers as to Pro Se Plf Smego. (RK, ilcd)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard Michael Smego. Responses due by 12/27/2016 (RK, ilcd)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 1/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(RK, ilcd)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Michael Smego. (Attachments: # 1 Cont'd, # 2 Cont'd, # 3 Cont'd to end)(RK, ilcd)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?