James Jenkins v. Equifax Information Services
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2350

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2017 at 12:27 AM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER filed [1000025670] granting Motion to file supplemental appendix [26] Copies to all parties.. [16-2350] (MR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE/ANSWER by Adam Bezer to notice requesting response [27], Motion to file supplemental appendix [26]. [16-2350] John Pentz
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE ISSUED to Donovan C. Bezer for Adam Bezer and Mr. John Jacob Pentz, III, Esq. for Adam Bezer requesting response to Motion to file supplemental appendix [26]. Response due: 02/27/2017.[1000025209]. [16-2350] (TW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by Appellee James Jenkins file supplemental appendix.. Date and method of service: 02/16/2017 ecf. [1000024897] [16-2350] Leonard Bennett
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Adam Bezer. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/21/2017. [1000007665] [16-2350] John Pentz
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            BRIEF by Appellant Adam Bezer in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/24/2016. [1000007664] [16-2350] John Pentz
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER filed [1000006504] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 01/20/17, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/20/2017. Response brief due 02/21/2017 Copies to all parties.. [16-2350] (JHM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Mr. John Jacob Pentz, III, Esq. for Adam Bezer re: failure to file brief and appendix Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days.. [16-2350] (JHM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 33 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?