Eva Duncan v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 16-50887

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:24 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503694438 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK ORDER granting motion for partial dismissal of appeal as to Marilyn Paul filed by Appellee Ms. Eva Marisol Duncan and Appellant Ms. Marilyn Paul [8317529-2] Involvement terminated for Appellant Marilyn Paul in 16-50887. Statistical Number: 1650944 [16-50887] (MVM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503692447 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Ms. Eva Marisol Duncan for partial dismissal of appeal as to Marilyn Paul. Date of service: 09/26/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bandas, Clore, Cox; Attorney for Appellees: Bingham, Hervol, Hill, Levine, Riley; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Johnson, Jabrani [16-50887] (Benjamin R. Bingham )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503658439 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [16-50887] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503658436 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr. is complete and awaiting final payment. [16-50887] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503648037 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [16-50887] (MBC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503637651 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel. [16-50887] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503637455 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel. [16-50887] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503629217 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the noticeof filing that transcript is unnecessary received from Appellant Ms. Marilyn Paul [16-50887] (MBC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503629014 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8278489-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [16-50887] (MAS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503622236 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr.. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 04/27/2016. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 08/16/2016 for Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel, Court Reporter. [16-50887] (MBC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503621894 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [8274158-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr.. [8274158-1] [16-50887] (MAS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503619130 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8272524-2] Transcript order due on 08/17/2016 for Appellant Marilyn Paul [16-50887] (MVM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503612372 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani for the Court to process. Date of service: 07/27/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bandas, Clore, Cox, Johnson; Attorney for Appellees: Bingham, Hervol, Hill, Levine, Riley; US mail - Appellant Jabrani. [16-50887] (Robert William Clore )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503612303 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8268342-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/11/2016 for Appellant Thomas L. Cox Jr.. Transcript order due on 08/11/2016 for Appellant Thomas L. Cox Jr. [16-50887] (MVM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503609875 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [8266898-2] Parties added: Appellant Marilyn Paul. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Marilyn Paul. [8266898-1] [16-50887] (SDH)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503605516 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [8264125-2] Parties added: Appellant Thomas L. Cox Jr.. NOA filed on 7/18/16 by Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr.. [8264125-1] [16-50887] (MVM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503596515 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8258543-2] Fee due on 08/02/2016 for Appellant Amirali Jabrani. Transcript order due on 08/02/2016 for Appellant Amirali Jabrani. Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [16-50887] (LEF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503591402 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani [16-50887] (LEF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503757550 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CLERK ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani [8356040-2] [16-50887] (MVM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503757393 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [8356040-2]. Date of service: 11/11/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bandas, Clore; Attorney for Appellees: Bingham, Hervol, Hill, Levine, Riley, Riley; US mail - Appellant Jabrani [16-50887] (Christopher Andres Bandas )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503737227 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CLERK ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 as to Thomas L. Cox, Jr. ONLY, filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr. [8344306-2] Statistical Number: 1650979. Statistical Number: 1650934 [16-50887] (MVM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503736840 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Thomas L. Cox, Jr. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [8344306-2]. Date of service: 10/27/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bandas, Clore, Cox; Attorney for Appellees: Bingham, Hervol, Hill, Levine, Riley; US mail - Appellant Jabrani [16-50887] (Thomas L. Cox Jr.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503735850 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CLERK ORDER granting in part motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani [8342938-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 12/05/2016 for Appellant Amirali Jabrani [16-50887] (MBC)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503734712 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Amirali Jabrani to extend time to file brief as appellant until 12/14/2016 at 11:59 pm [8342938-2]. Date of service: 10/26/2016 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bandas, Clore, Cox; Attorney for Appellees: Bingham, Hervol, Hill, Levine, Riley; US mail - Appellant Jabrani [16-50887] (Robert William Clore )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503702584 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/14/2016 for Appellants Thomas L. Cox Jr. and Amirali Jabrani. [16-50887] (MRB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?