Wolfe v. Berryhill
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00395

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 3:01 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/09/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER affirming decision of the Commissioner, denying relief sought by Pltf; denying Pltf's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Deft's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing this action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/09/2017. (ejb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Summary Judgment - Social Security
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Summary Judgment - Social Security
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?