James Jenkins v. Equifax Information Services
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2351

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2017 at 1:41 AM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406319046 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for James Jenkins.[999986212] [16-2351] Craig Marchiando
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00443-MHL.. [16-2351] (JHM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed [1000005455] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) Copies to all parties.. [16-2351] (JHM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Patrick S. Sweeney re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Patrick Sweeney. [16-2351] (JHM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Equifax Information Services, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999987206] [16-2351] Zachary McEntyre
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Zachary A. McEntyre for Equifax Information Services, LLC.[999987204] [16-2351] Zachary McEntyre
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Phyllis B. Sumner for Equifax Information Services, LLC.[999987203] [16-2351] Phyllis Sumner
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Docket correction requested from Craig Carley Marchinado for James Jenkins. Re: [6] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Patrick Sweeney. [16-2351] (TW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for James Jenkins.[999986265] [16-2351] Elizabeth Hanes
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee James Jenkins. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999985271] [16-2351] Leonard Bennett
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 71 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?