Kimbler v. Spear
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00047

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 11:17 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        OPINION and ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/11/17. (flc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on 7 Motion for Summary Judgment; plt's request for discovery under Rule 56(d)(2) is GRANTED only to the limited extent described in this opinion and order; discovery permitted must be completed within 30 da ys; plt. may file supplemental response to the motion for summary judgment within 14 days after completion of the permitted discovery; dft's may file a reply within 7 days thereafter; dft's are directed to file an answer to the complaint prior to the deposition of defendant Spears, and in no event later than 14 days from this date. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/11/17. (flc)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?