United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Platinum Management (NY) LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06848-BMC
District Judge Brian M. Cogan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 8, 2021 at 2:20 PM ST (2.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grace Adam +1 212 336 0083 +1 212 336 1351 gracea@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Matthew Calamari +1 212 336 0042 +1 212 336 1323 calamaria@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Ralph Jacobson +1 212 336 0095 +1 212 336 1317 jacobsonn@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Patrick McGrath +1 212 336 1100 +1 212 336 1322 mcgrathk@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Sallah +1 212 336 0130 +1 212 336 1322 sallahd@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jess Anthony Velona +1 646 428 2145 +1 646 428 1973 velonaj@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanjay Wadhwa +1 212 336 0181 +1 212 336 1948 wadhwas@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Daniel Small, Defendant
No Logo David Levy, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Shulse, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Mann, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Sanfilippo, Defendant
No Logo Mark Nordlicht, Defendant
No Logo Platinum Credit Management, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Platinum Management (NY) LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Landesman Uri
Unknown Role, Nordlicht, Mark
No Logo Uri Landesman, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit Securities/Commodities
  Entries (662) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice - other
NOTICE by Daniel Small of Withdrawal of Deborah Jane Cooper (Papapetrou, Christos)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice - other
    NOTICE by Daniel Small of Withdrawal of Dylan A. Stern (Papapetrou, Christos)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
      ORDER re: [559][560] Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Attorneys Deborah Jane Cooper and Dylan Alexander Stern terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/4/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [556] Motion for Attorney Fees re: ORDER APPROVING THIRTEENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JULY 1, 2020 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/19/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [555] Motion for Attorney Fees; ORDER APPROVING THIRTEENTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JULY 1, 2020 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/19/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion for attorney fees
            MOTION for Attorney Fees /Thirteenth Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2020 Through September 30, 2020 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Proposed Order) (Silverstein, Adam)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020, Terminated: 12/21/2020 Motion for attorney fees
              MOTION for Attorney Fees /Thirteenth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2020 Through and Including September 30, 2020 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Silverstein, Adam)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                ORDER re: [548] Motion to Compel re: Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/1/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Reply in Support
                  REPLY in Support re [548] Notice of MOTION to Compel / Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures .Certificate of No Objection Regarding Notice of Motion of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures filed by Receiver. (Weinick, Erik)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                    ORDER granting [552] Motion for Leave to File Document. Richard and Marisa Stadtmauer may file a proof of claim against Mark A. Nordlicht in his individual bankruptcy proceeding. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/30/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020, Terminated: 11/30/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
                      MOTION for Leave to File Document Letter Motion for Permission to File Proof of Claim in Individual Bankruptcy Proceeding by Marisa Stadtmauer, Richard Stadtmauer. (Kritzer, Nathaniel)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Order on motion to intervene
                        ORDER granting [547]. Richard and Marisa Stadtmauer are added as interested parties. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/23/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 551 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Response to motion
                          RESPONSE to Motion re [547] MOTION to Intervene /Letter in Response to Letter Motion dated November 6, 2020 filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Memorandum In Support
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [548] Notice of MOTION to Compel / Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures, [549] Declaration, filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Declaration
                              DECLARATION re [548] Notice of MOTION to Compel / Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020, Terminated: 12/1/2020 Motion to compel
                                Notice of MOTION to Compel / Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order to Establish Claims and Interests Reconciliation and Verification Procedures by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                  ORDER re: [543] Motion for Attorney Fees/ Twelfth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2020 through and including June 30, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re: [542] MOTION for Attorney Fees / Twelfth Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2020 Through and Including June 30, 2020 by Goldin Associates, LLC. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to intervene
                                      MOTION on behalf of Richard and Marisa Stadtmauer, who are creditors Master Fund, L.P. re: the Stadtmauers seeking permission to be added as an interested parties in this matter. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Status report
                                        STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Thirteenth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees /CORRECTED Twelfth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2020 through and including June 30, 2020 (related Dkt. No. 541, re-filed to correct Exhibit E) by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees / Twelfth Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2020 Through and Including June 30, 2020 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees /Twelfth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2020 Through and Including June 30, 2020 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Declaration
                                                DECLARATION /Supplemental Declaration of Marc S. Kirschner in Support of the Application of the Receiver for an Order Approving the Retention of Goldin Associates, LLC, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Appointment Date [220] by Court-Appointed Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Status report
                                                  STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Twelfth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 order on motion for settlementCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [535] Motion for Approving Settlement Agreements with (1) CNO Financial Group, Inc. and Related Parties, and (2) Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Analytics, Inc., and (B) Approving Use of Funds by Receiver. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/17/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Memorandum In Support
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [535] Notice of MOTION for Settlement /The Receivers Notice of Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving Settlement Agreements with (1) CNO Financial Group, Inc. and Related Parties, and (2) Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Anal, [536] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, /Memorandum of Law in Support of the Receivers Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving Settlement Agreements with (1) CNO Financial Group, Inc. and Related Parties, and (2) Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Analytics, Inc., and (B) Approving Use of Funds filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [535] Notice of MOTION for Settlement /The Receivers Notice of Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving Settlement Agreements with (1) CNO Financial Group, Inc. and Related Parties, and (2) Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Anal ytics, Inc. and (B) Approving Use of Funds filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 535 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020, Terminated: 7/20/2020 motion for settlement
                                                          Notice of MOTION for Settlement /The Receivers Notice of Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving Settlement Agreements with (1) CNO Financial Group, Inc. and Related Parties, and (2) Senior Health Insurance Company of Pennsylvania and Fuzion Analytics, Inc., and (B) Approving Use of Funds by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [531] Motion for Attorney Fees; APPROVING ELEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JANUARY 1, 2020 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/4/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [530] Motion for Attorney Fees; APPROVING ELEVENTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JANUARY 1, 2020 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/4/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: 5/12/2020 USCA Mandate
                                                                MANDATE of USCA as to [409] Notice of Appeal filed by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Issued as Mandate: 5/12/20, USCA #18-3293. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees /Eleventh Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2020 Through and Including March 31, 2020 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020, Terminated: 6/4/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2020 Through and Including March 31, 2020 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Status report
                                                                      STATUS REPORT /The Receivers Eleventh Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER approving [523] Tenth Interim Application of the Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2019 Through and Including December 31, 2019. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER approving [522] Tenth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2019 Through and Including December 31, 2019. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 letter
                                                                            Letter dated February 28, 2020 Re: settlement of litigation that the Receiver has reached by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 order on motion for settlementCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Approving Receiver's Motion for Order Approving her Settlement with Schafer and Weiner, PLLC re: [520] Motion for Settlement. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/24/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER APPROVING PAYMENTS TO CERTAIN PROFESSIONALS re: [521] Motion to Approve Payments to Certain Professionals. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/23/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 3/9/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                  Tenth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of the Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2019 Through and Including December 31, 2019 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020, Terminated: 3/9/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                    Tenth MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2019 Through and Including December 31, 2019 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020, Terminated: 2/24/2020 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees /Motion to Approve Payments to Certain Professionals by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020, Terminated: 2/24/2020 motion for settlement
                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for Settlement of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver for Entry of an Order Approving Her Settlement with Schafer and Weiner, PLLC by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support, # (2) Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement, # (3) Proposed Order, # (4) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion to compel
                                                                                          ORDER. Hearing previously scheduled for 1/27/2020 is hereby cancelled. The Court is persuaded that compelling the Receiver to file a bankruptcy petition at this point would not be in the best interest of all parties. ORDER denying [490, 494]. Although SanFilippo's and Levy's acquittals undoubtedly entitle them to payment by the Platinum Partners entities, the Court will still not permit them to jump the line in front of other deserving creditors. Among other purposes, the receivership was instated in order to "conduct an orderly wind down including a responsible liquidation of assets and orderly and fair distribution of those assets to investors." The Receiver thus has broad authority to reasonably distribute funds by order of claim priority. The Court maintains that both SanFilippo and Levy are entitled to indemnification (see [417] 11/25/2018 Order Denying Motions to Compel Payment or Advancement of Legal Fees); however, these are just two unsecured claims among many and they must wait for any payment alongside the other unsecured creditors. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Status report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Tenth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 1/19/2020, Entered: 1/19/2020 letter
                                                                                              Letter submitted in response to Court's Order dated December 12, 2019 by Ira A. Sturm (Sturm, Ira)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                DECLARATION /Statement of The Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage, L.P. (In Official Liquidation) In Opposition To Dismissal of Receivership, by Martin Trott and Christopher Smith, in their capacities as the duly appointed Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund, L.P. (Parlin, Barbra)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver in Response to the Minute Order Entered December 12, 2019 by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver in Response to the Minute Order Entered December 12, 2019) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 letter
                                                                                                    Letter submitted respectfully in response to the Court's Order, dated December 12, 2019 by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 letter
                                                                                                      Letter in Response to the Court's Order, dated December 12, 2019 by Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,, Memorandum in Response to Court's December 12, 2019 Order filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020, Terminated: 1/9/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Nordlicht. (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [512] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lisabeth Fryer terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER dated 12/26/19 APPROVING NINTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATIONOF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCEOF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURREDDURING THE PERIOD JULY 1, 2019 THROUGHAND INCLUDING SEPTEMBER 30, 2019 re: [506] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER dated 12/26/19 Approving Ninth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2019 Through and Including September 30, 2019 by Goldin Associates, LLC. re: [507] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: 12/26/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD APRIL 1, 2019 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2019 [502] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/23/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: 12/26/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD APRIL 1, 2019 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2019 Re: [503] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/23/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                      Ninth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2019 Through and Including September 30, 2019 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019, Terminated: 12/30/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                        Ninth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2019 Through and Including September 30, 2019 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Notice of Email Change Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 letter
                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting a two-week adjournment in connection with the Court's Order dated December 12, 2019, deferring the ruling and setting a schedule with respect to the pending applications for indemnification by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [504]. The hearing on [490, 494] is adjourned to 1/27/2020 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. Any party to this case or creditor/investor with an interest in this case may submit a memorandum regarding the Court's 12/12/2019 Order by 1/17/2020, with any responses due 1/23/2020.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) Modified on 12/17/2019 (Weisberg, Peggy).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                ORDER deferring ruling on [490] [494]. A hearing will be held on these motions on 1/9/2020 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 8D South. The sole issue to be argued is whether it would be appropriate for this Court to dismiss the case without prejudice to the right of the Receiver or creditors to file a bankruptcy petition against the company in light of the fact that this Court has been called upon to apply Bankruptcy Code concepts to substantial claims and procedures in this matter. See Eberhard v. Marcu, 530 F.3d 122, 132 (2d Cir. 2008); Esbitt v. Dutch-Am. Mercantile Corp., 335 F.2d 141, 143 (2d Cir. 1964). Any party in interest may address this issue by memorandum no later than 1/2/2020, with any responses due 1/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/12/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019, Terminated: 12/26/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                  Eighth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2019 Through and Including June 30, 2019 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019, Terminated: 12/26/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                    Eighth MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2019 Through and Including June 30, 2019 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [494] MOTION to Compel Indemnification filed by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Opposition re [497] Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Joseph Sanfilippo. (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order re: [498] Motion for Protective Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/4/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/5/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Protective Order dated November 4, 2019 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [494] MOTION to Compel Indemnification, [490] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to Indemnify Joseph SanFilippp for his Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Defense Costs .Receivers Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to: (I) Defendant Joseph Sanfilippos Motion for the SEC Receiver to Indemnify him Promptly for his Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Defense Costs; and (II) Defendant David Leveys Motion to Compel Indemnification filed by Receiver. (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re [494] MOTION to Compel Indemnification, [490] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to Indemnify Joseph SanFilippp for his Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Defense Costs Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver in Opposition to: (I) Defendant Joseph Sanfilippos Motion for the SEC Receiver to Indemnify him Promptly for his Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Defense Costs; and (II) Defendant David Leveys Motion to Compel Indemnification filed by Receiver. (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Ninth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019, Terminated: 1/22/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Indemnification by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant David Levy's Motion to Compel Indemnification, # (2) Declaration of Michael S. Sommer in Support of Defendant David Levy's Motion to Compel Indemnification, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 493 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 10/6/19 granting [492] proposed briefing schedule. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/6/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Omnibus Opposition to Motions by Receiver. (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 10/2/2019 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re leave to make a motion for Receiver to honor Platinum's indemnification and payment obligations by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [491] as moot. The premotion conference is waived. Defendant may file his motion. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/2/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019, Terminated: 1/22/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to Indemnify Joseph SanFilippp for his Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Defense Costs by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order, # (5) Memorandum in Support) (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPROVING THE SALE OF THE ASSETS OFLC ENERGY HOLDINGS LLC AND LC ENERGY OPERATIONS LLC FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS, ENCUMBRANCES AND OTHER INTERESTS. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/12/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Certificate of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [487] Notice(Other) CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING THE SALE OF THE ASSETS OF LC ENERGY HOLDINGS LLC AND LC ENERGY OPERATIONS LLC FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS, ENCUMBRANCES AND OTHER INTERESTS by Erik Bradley Weinick on behalf of Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Response of Western Pocahantas Properties Limited Partnership, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Sale Order) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Receiver of Successful Bidder for the Assets of LC Energy Holdings LLC, and LC Energy Operations LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Cyganowski Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Sale Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Order on Motion to Set AsideCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING LIFTING OF STAY re [485] Motion. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/21/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019, Terminated: 8/22/2019 Motion to Set Aside
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Set Aside /Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Lifting of Stay by Receiver. (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm Mailing Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Potts, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT TO MASLON LLP re: [475] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/2/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Related Case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT /The Receivers Eighth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Samuel Salfati, a non-party [465] Motion to Compel Melanie L. Cyganowski, the receiver for various Platinum Partners entities, to pay Salfati in connection with his prior employment with Platinum Partners. Salfati's [465] motion to compel is DENIED. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/16/2019 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING SEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATIONOF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATIONAND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIODJANUARY 1, 2019 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2019 re: [469] Motion for Attorney Fees ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING SEVENTH JOINT INTERIMAPPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JANUARY 1, 2019 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2019 re: [467] Motion for Attorney Fees ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD OCTOBER 1, 2018 THROUGH DECEMBER 31, 2018 re: [468] Motion for Attorney Fees ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING FIFTH INTERIM AND FINAL APPLICATION OF CONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD OCTOBER 1, 2018 THROUGH DECEMBER 31, 2018 re: [470] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019, Terminated: 8/5/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees to Approve Payment to Maslon LLP by Maslon LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Melanie Cyganowski, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Memorandum in Support) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER dated 7/15/19 Approving Sixth Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period of October 1, 2018 Through and Including December 31, 2018 re: [466] ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Samuel Salfati in further Support re [465] MOTION Request of Samuel Salfati for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses Claim filed by Samuel Salfati. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [465] MOTION to Compel Request of Samuel Salfati for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses Claim filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in Opposition to Request of Samuel Salfati for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim, # (2) Certificate of Service Erik B. Weinick) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC re [470] Fifth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Fifth Interim and Final Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2018 Through December 31, 2018 Proposed Order (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fifth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Fifth Interim and Final Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2018 Through December 31, 2018 by Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Seventh MOTION for Attorney Fees / Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2019 Through March 31, 2019 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sixth MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1,2018 Through December 31, 2018 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Seventh MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2019 Through and Including March 31, 2019 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019, Terminated: 7/15/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sixth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period of October 1, 2018 Through and Inculding December 31, 2018 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Request of Samuel Salfati for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses Claim by Samuel Salfati. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER dated 5/29/19 re: [462] approving procedures for the retention of experts and payment of expert fees and other expenses in connection with ongoing litigation. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/29/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [463]. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet to substitute Dean Grayson, as representative of the estate of Uri Landesman, in place and in stead of Uri Landesman. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/15/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 463 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Identifying Representative of Estate of Uri Landesman by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [458] Motion to Dismiss. The SEC's interpretation of the stay order was not unreasonable even assuming arguendo that it was wrong. The Estate of Uri Landesman having appeared as a party in this action, the Court sua sponte substitutes that party, which is directed to notify the Court within 7 days of the name of the estate representative so that the caption can be amended. See Mohammadi v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 947 F. Supp. 2d 48, 54 n.2 (D. D.C. 2013), aff'd, 782 F.3d 9 (D.C. Cir. 2015). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/11/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/30/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to Compel /Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Proposed Procedures for the Retention of Experts and Payment of Expert Fees and Other Expenses in Connection with Ongoing Litigation by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order Exhibit A, # (3) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT /The Receivers Seventh Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support re [458] Notice of MOTION to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) filed by Uri Landesman. (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/7/2019, Entered: 4/7/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [458] Notice of MOTION to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Unpublished Order) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019, Terminated: 5/11/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) by Uri Landesman. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support) (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Order on Motion for Order of SaleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 3/22/19 granting [455] Motion for Order of Sale re: (I) APPROVING THE SALE OF CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY LOCATED IN MONTEZUMA COUNTY, COLORADO FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS, ENCUMBRANCES AND OTHER INTERESTS AND (II) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/22/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support /Certificate of No Objection Regarding Notice of Motion of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Sale of Certain Real Property Located in Montezuma County, Colorado Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and other Interests and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019, Terminated: 3/25/2019 Motion for Order of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale by Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Sale of Certain Real Property Located in Montezuma County, Colorado Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other interests and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Melanie L. Cyganowski, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Exhibit B., # (4) Declaration Rick Lorenz, # (5) Memorandum in Support, # (6) Exhibit A.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019, Terminated: 2/22/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund International Limited in Official Liquidation, and Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Intermediate Fund Ltd. in Official Liquid. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Supplement) (Boey, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [454] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel is directed to advise his client that unless successor counsel appears, the Joint Official Liquidators will not receive further notices of proceedings in this Court. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/22/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER dated 2/10/19 re [424] Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Claims Bar dates and (II) Approving (A) a Proof of Claim Form, (B) the Form and Manner of Notice to the Claims Bar Dates and (C) Procedures For Submitting Proofs of Claim filed by Receiver. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/10/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 2/10/19 granting The Receiver's [424] Motion. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/10/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 1, 2017, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Parisi, Telephone number 718-613-2605. Email address: deniseparisi72@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (Parisi, Denise)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT /Refiled Sixth Status Report to Court to Include Exhibits A & B by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING FOURTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF CONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JULY 1, 2018 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2018 re: [440] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/18/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING THIRD INTERIM APPLICATION OFCONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD APRIL 1, 2018 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2018 [439] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/18/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING SECOND INTERIM APPLICATION OF CONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD JANUARY 1, 2018 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2018 [438] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/18/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING FIRST INTERIM APPLICATION OFCONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD OCTOBER 12, 2017 THROUGH DECEMBER 31, 2017 re: [437] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/18/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Sixth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Order on Motion for Order of SaleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 1/15/19 (A) AUTHORIZING THE RECEIVER TO SELL THE RECEIVERSHIP'S RIGHTS IN AND TO LC ENERGY OPERATIONS LLC FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS, ENCUMBRANCES AND OTHER INTERESTS; (B) APPROVING PROCEDURES FOR THE FILING OF CLAIMS AGAINST LC ENERGY AND/ OR ITS ASSETS AND THE RESOLUTION THEREOF AND (C) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF re: [422] Motion for Order of Sale. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for hearing on motions for fees [437, 438, 439, 440] held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/15/2019. The SEC and Receiver present. The Court addressed the motions for fees. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Georgette K. Betts). (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Notice of settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Settlement of Objections to Receiver's Motion [422] for entry of an order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; (B) approving procedures for the filing of claims against LC Energy and/or its assets and the resolution thereof; and (C) granting certain related relief and (II) approving the sale of LC Energy free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019, Terminated: 1/11/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph Mann. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration) (Burns, Ashley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [442] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley Christine Burns terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Motions for Attorneys' Fees [437] [438] [439] [440] on 1/15/2019 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/6/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [422] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale /Receivers Motion for entry of an order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; ( /Declaration in Further Support of Receivers Motion for Entry of an Order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; (B) approving procedures for the filing of claims against LC Energy and/or its assets and the resolution thereof; and (C) granting certain related relief and (II) approving the sale of LC Energy free and clear of all liens, claims and encumbrances and other filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fourth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Fourth Interim Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2018 Through September 30, 2018 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third MOTION for Attorney Fees /Third Interim Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2018 Through June 30, 2018 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Attorney Fees /Second Interim Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2018 Through March 31, 2018 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019, Terminated: 1/18/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Attorney Fees /First Interim Application of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC for the Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period of October 12, 2017 Through December 31, 2017 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support re [422] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale /Receivers Motion for entry of an order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; ( /Receivers Reply Brief in Further Support of Her Motion for an order (I)(A) Authorizing the Receiver to Sell the Receiverships Rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests; (B) Approving Procedures for the Filing of Claims Against LC Energy and/or its Assets and the Resolution Thereof and (C) Granting Certain Related Relief and (II) Approving the Sale of LC Energy Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Other Interests. filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Neal Jacobson Concerning Schafer & Weiner, PLLC by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER terminating [423] Motion for Attorney Fees as already granted by [434]. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/23/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part [376] Motion to Appoint Expert as per Minute Entry 10/1/18. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/22/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPROVING PAYMENTS TO CERTAIN PROFESSIONALS dated 12/21/18. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/21/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [422] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale /Receivers Motion for entry of an order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; ( Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in Connection with her Motion for Entry of an Order (I) (A) Authorizing the Receiver to Sell the Receiverships Rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interest; (B) Approving Procedures for the Filing ofClaims Against LC Energy and/or its' Assets and the Resolution Thereof and (C) Granting Certain Related Relief and (II) Approving the Sale of LC Energy Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims Encumbrances, and Other Interests by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support re [424] Notice of MOTION to Compel /Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Claims Bar dates and (II) Approving (A) a Proof of Claim Form, (B) the Form and Manner of Notice to the Claims Bar Dates and (C) Procedures For Submitting Proofs of Claim filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [424] Notice of MOTION to Compel /Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Claims Bar dates and (II) Approving (A) a Proof of Claim Form, (B) the Form and Manner of Notice to the Claims Bar Dates and (C) Procedures For Submitting Proofs of Claim filed by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING FIFTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD July 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018 re: [421] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING FOURTH JOINT INTERIM APPLICATION OF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING the period April 1, 2018 through June 30, 2018 re: [420] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING FIFTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD July 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018 re: [419] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING FOURTH INTERIM APPLICATIONOF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATIONAND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIOD April 1, 2018 through June 30, 2018 re: [418] Motion for Attorney Fees. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 1, 2018, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette Montalvo, Telephone number 718-804-2711. Email address: annette.montalvo@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2019. (Montalvo, Annette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [424] Notice of MOTION to Compel /Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Claims Bar dates and (II) Approving (A) a Proof of Claim Form, (B) the Form and Manner of Notice to the Claims Bar Dates and (C) Procedures For Submitting Proofs of Claim Limited Objection filed by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018, Terminated: 2/11/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to Compel /Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Claims Bar dates and (II) Approving (A) a Proof of Claim Form, (B) the Form and Manner of Notice to the Claims Bar Dates and (C) Procedures For Submitting Proofs of Claim by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Exhibit B., # (4) Exhibit C., # (5) Exhibit D., # (6) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018, Terminated: 12/23/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees / Pay Certain Professionals by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018, Terminated: 1/17/2019 Motion for Order of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale /Receivers Motion for entry of an order: (I) (A) authorizing the Receiver to sell the Receiverships rights in and to LC Energy Operations LLC free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests; (B) approving procedures for the filing of claims against LC Energy and/or its assets and the resolution thereof; and (C) granting certain related relief and (II) approving the sale of LC Energy free and clear of all liens, claims, encumbrances and other interests by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Memorandum in Support, # (4) Exhibit to Memorandum of Law) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2018 Through and Including September 30, 2018. by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2018 Through and Including JUNE 30, 2018. by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fifth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Interim Application for Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 1, 2018 Through and Including September 30, 2018 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fourth MOTION for Attorney Fees /Interim Application for Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period April 1, 2018 Through and Including June 30, 2018 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 417 Filed: 11/25/2018, Entered: 11/25/2018 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [392] [402] [405] [406] Motions to Compel payment or advancement of legal fees. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/25/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. [409] Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Mejia, Salomon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support re [406] Letter MOTION to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees filed by Joseph Mann. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joe Mann) (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support re [405] Letter MOTION to Compel - Joining in Co-Defendants' Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees filed by Daniel Small. (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support re [392] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs filed by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES // REPLY DECLARATION OF ELI B. RICHLIN filed by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 11) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES filed by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES, [405] Letter MOTION to Compel - Joining in Co-Defendants' Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees, [392] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs, [406] Letter MOTION to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1., # (2) Exhibit 2., # (3) Exhibit 3., # (4) Exhibit 4.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES, [406] Letter MOTION to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees, [405] Letter MOTION to Compel - Joining in Co-Defendants' Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees, [404] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [403] Memorandum in Support, [392] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018, Terminated: 5/12/2020 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-10878074. (Klein, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/25/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 407 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT /The Receiver's Fifth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 11/25/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees by Joseph Mann. (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 11/25/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION to Compel - Joining in Co-Defendants' Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees by Daniel Small. (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES DECLARATION OF ELI B. RICHLIN filed by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [402] MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES filed by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 11/25/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel ADVANCEMENT OF LEGAL FEES by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re: [400] Motion for Protective Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/19/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018, Terminated: 10/19/2018 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION for Protective Order dated October 18, 2018 Requesting that the Court "So Order" the Protective Orders by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement & Protective Order, # (2) Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement & Protective Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [174] Memorandum in Support,, Supplemental Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018, Terminated: 10/12/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File with respect to Docket Nos. 391 to 394 and 396. Receiver's Letter Setting Forth Agreed Briefing Schedule as to Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: [398]. The Court sets a briefing schedule for motions [391][394][396] as follows: 1) defendants to file and serve their motions by 10/19/2018; 2) Receiver to file and serve opposition by 10/30/2018; 3) defendants to file and serve their reply briefs by 11/6/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/12/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018, Terminated: 10/11/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with respect to Docket Nos. 391 to 394 and 396. Receivers Letter Requesting Deadlines and Briefing Schedule as to Motions to Compel Advancement of Legal Fees by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018, Terminated: 10/11/2018 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re motion to compel the receiver to advance reasonable attorneys fees and defense costs to be incurred in the upcoming criminal trial by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Eli B. Richlin on behalf of David Levy (aty to be noticed) (Richlin, Eli)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [392] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs Corrected Document- Exhibit E by Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part [397]. The parties are directed to confer and agree upon a briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/11/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: [396]. The promotion conference is waived. Defendant David Levy may file his motion to compel the receiver to advance reasonable attorneys' fees and defense costs. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/11/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [392] MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs Corrected Document by Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018, Terminated: 11/25/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel the SEC Receiver to continue advancing reasonable attorney fees and defense costs by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 6.27.16 Signed Engagement Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 2018.07.26 letter to Receiver re JSF continued advancement of defense costs, # (4) Exhibit Platinum - Defendants - August 9, 2018 Response to SanFillipo Request for Advancement, # (5) Exhibit PPCO PPM Oct 2015, # (6) Exhibit Pay stubs, # (7) Exhibit Proposed Order, # (8) Memorandum in Support) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018, Terminated: 10/5/2018 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Joseph Sanfilippo. (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [391] as moot. The premotion conference is waived. Sanfilippo may file his motion. However, he needs to note that there is a stay against commencement of litigation against this receivership. The receivership owes a lot of people a lot of money, and even assuming Sanfilippo has a contractual right (which the receiver may not concede), he is going to have to justify getting a priority over other claimants. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/5/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uri Landesman of the death of Defendant Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Christine Burns on behalf of Joseph Mann (aty to be noticed) (Burns, Ashley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Jane Cooper on behalf of Daniel Small (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christos Gus Papapetrou on behalf of Daniel Small (aty to be noticed) (Papapetrou, Christos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Yasir Latifi on behalf of Jeffrey Shulse (aty to be noticed) (Latifi, Syed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER terminating as moot [328] in light of [383] Memorandum Decision and Order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: [385]. The deadline for submitting supplemental briefs on S&W's motion for attorneys' fees and expenses is moot in light of the Court's [383] order. The deadline for submitting supplemental briefs on the receiver's motion for disgorgement of fees is stayed until such time as the receiver files for a declaratory judgment action concerning the participation agreement. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [348] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys William Anthony Burck and Daniel Rickert Koffmann terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated September 26, 2018 Re: deadline for submitting supplemental briefs on September 28, 2018, see Dkt. Entry on August 9, 2018, is now moot. by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re Proposed Joint Agenda for 10.1.18 Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 383 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 9/25/18 denying S&W's [326] Motion for fees and expenses is DENIED. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/25/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot [369] in light of [379]. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/26/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [381] Ronald S. Sulllivan, Jr.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for defendant Mark Nordlicht. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/13/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018, Terminated: 9/13/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lead Counsel Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10722423. by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Certificate of Good Standing) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order on Motion for Order of SaleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, The Receiver's [357] Motion for Order of Sale is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/11/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding Withdrawal of Objections by Piping Brook LLC, Zanhav Holding LLC (Kingsbery, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lisabeth Fryer on behalf of Mark Nordlicht (notification declined or already on case) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018, Terminated: 12/22/2018 Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER In light of the SEC's letter at [375], the Status Conference previously scheduled for 8/27/2018 is adjourned to 10/1/2018 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/22/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re Proposed Joint Agenda for 8/27/18 Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [374] Lisabeth J. Fryer's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for defendant Mark Nordlicht. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018, Terminated: 8/20/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10665875. by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (3) Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mark Nordlicht Certificate of Good Standing (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [369] Letter MOTION for pre motion conference and Objection to the Abdala Sale Motion filed by Court-Appointed Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph K. Grekin on behalf of Schafer and Weiner, PLLC (aty to be noticed) (Grekin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Zanhav Holding LLC, Piping Brook LLC. (Kingsbery, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [367] Declaration,, /Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of the Receivership's Rights in and to a Gold Tailings Pond known as "Abdala" and Authorizing her to Pay the Fees and Expenses of Platinum's Brazilian Counsel filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [357] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of the Receiverships Rights in and to a Gold Tailings Pond Known as Abdala and Authorizing Her to Pay the Fees and Expenses of Platinu /Reply Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in further support of Motion to Approve Sale of Abdala and to Pay Brazailian Counsel from the Sale Proceeds by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Marcus on behalf of Schafer and Weiner, PLLC (aty to be noticed) (Marcus, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018, Terminated: 8/9/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Zaretsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [365] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Receiver may proceed to take the depositions of Judge Rhodes and Mr. Baum by 8/31/2018 in New York; the deadline for submitting supplemental briefs is extended to 9/28/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/9/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [357] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of the Receiverships Rights in and to a Gold Tailings Pond Known as Abdala and Authorizing Her to Pay the Fees and Expenses of Platinu /Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, Filing Objections from Parties-In-Interest to Sale Motion by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1., # (2) Exhibit 2., # (3) Exhibit 3.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [361] [362] Motion for Discovery. S&W's position is frivolous. Both deposition notices are quashed. As to the SEC attorney, the topics about which S&W seeks to inquire are irrelevant to the resolution of the core disputes between the parties: whether the Participation Agreement required prior court approval and whether S&W put its own interests ahead of those of its client. When the SEC became aware of the alleged conflict between S&W and its client, the basis for its allegations, and the basis for its objections are either irrelevant or already within the knowledge of S&W. As for the other deposition, the Receiver does not have any factual knowledge that bears on the instant dispute. Should S&W's fee application ultimately be granted in any part, it will be reduced by $500 to make up for wasting everyone's time with this motion. All parties should be assured that any further quibbling between attorneys over the scope of discovery will be subject to a similar evaluation of their good faith, and the Court is fully prepared to increase sanctions exponentially if necessary to ensure that discovery is conducted in a reasonable manner. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/4/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Dated August 3, 2018 Re: Letter to Court Regarding Payment to Arbitrator. by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [360] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to renewal upon compliance with Local Rule 1.3(c), which requires that in order to be admitted pro hac vice, the applicant must file a certificate of good standing from the state in which the applicant is a member of the bar which has been issued within thirty (30) days of the application. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/3/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [359] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to renewal upon compliance with Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), which requires that in order to be admitted pro hac vice, the applicant must file a certificate of good standing from the state in which the applicant is a member of the bar which has been issued within thirty (30) days of the application. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/3/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [355] [356] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for creditor Schafer and Weiner PLLC. The attorneys, Joseph K. Grekin and Nicholas Robert Marcus shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorneys shall file a notice of appearance and ensure they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, each attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/3/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018, Terminated: 8/4/2018 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery Joint Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute and Receiver's Request for Leave to File Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition Issued to Receiver by Fee Applicant by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018, Terminated: 8/4/2018 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Discovery Joint Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute and SEC's Request for Leave to File Motion to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Deposition) (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018, Terminated: 8/3/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald S. Sullivan, Jr. as Lead Counsel Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10629222. by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018, Terminated: 8/3/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lisabeth Fryer as Co-Counsel Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10629142. by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [357] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of the Receiverships Rights in and to a Gold Tailings Pond Known as Abdala and Authorizing Her to Pay the Fees and Expenses of Platinu filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018, Terminated: 9/12/2018 Motion for Order of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of the Receiverships Rights in and to a Gold Tailings Pond Known as Abdala and Authorizing Her to Pay the Fees and Expenses of Platinums Brazilian Counsel by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver in Support of Motion, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Declaration of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc in Support of Receivers Motion, # (4) Memorandum in Support of Motion of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018, Terminated: 8/3/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Marcus Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10606866. by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Grekin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018, Terminated: 8/3/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Grekin Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10606783. by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Grekin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT /Receivers Fourth Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER deferring ruling on [348] Motion to Withdraw. Nordlicht has retained new counsel who have entered notices of appearance in his related criminal case. They have not done so here. It is not clear if Nordlicht intends to proceed pro se in this action; if that is not the case, his newly retained counsel should file their notices of appearance on this docket. If he intends to proceed pro se, he should file a letter informing the Court. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/20/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 7/16/18 denying Non-Party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. [342] Motion Non-party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. seeks an order lifting the litigation stay in this receivership case so that it may implead one of the companies in receivership in an action pending outside the receivership. Because the costs to the Receivership and resulting prejudice to other parties-in-interest outweigh the prejudice that Navidea might suffer from deferring its litigation, the motion is denied. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/16/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 352 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support re [342] MOTION to Vacate [276] Order,,,, Litigation Stay as to Navideas Third Party Complaint Against PPCO filed by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. In light of the SEC's letter at [351], the Status Conference previously scheduled for 7/16/2018 is adjourned to 8/27/2018 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/12/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 351 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re Proposed Agenda for July 16, 2018 Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [342] MOTION to Vacate [276] Order,,,, Litigation Stay as to Navideas Third Party Complaint Against PPCO filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018, Terminated: 7/2/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Vacate Litigation Stay as to Navidea's Third Party Complaint Against PPCO by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [349] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is extended until July 19, 2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/2/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration) (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [342] MOTION to Vacate [276] Order,,,, Litigation Stay as to Navideas Third Party Complaint Against PPCO /Memorandum of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in Opposition to Non-Party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.s Motion for an Order Lifting the Litigation Stay for Navideas Third Party Complaint Against Platinum Partners Credit Opportunities Master Fund LP filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [346] Motion for Discovery. Final date as per schedule is 9/7/18. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/25/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018, Terminated: 6/25/2018 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Discovery and Briefing Schedule by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Opposition re [335] Reply in Support, [332] Memorandum in Opposition,, Corrected Receiver's Sur-Reply in Further Response to the Filings of Schafer & Weiner on June 11, and June 13, 2018 filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [343] Reply in Opposition Declaration of Neal Jacobson in Support of Receiver's Sur-Reply in Further Response to the Filings of Schafer & Weiner PLLC by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Opposition re [335] Reply in Support, [332] Memorandum in Opposition,, / Receiver's Sur-Reply in Further Response to the Filings of Schafer & Weiner on June 11, and June 13, 2018 filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Vacate [276] Order,,,, Litigation Stay as to Navideas Third Party Complaint Against PPCO by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A Verified Complaint Platinum-Montaur v Navidea, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B Third Party Complaint Navidea v Platinum Partners Credit, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C April 10 2018 letter from Folland to Silverstein, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D April 27 2018 Letter from Weinick to Folland) (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 6/17/18 approving [325] Third interim application of Goldin Associates, LLC for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses incurred during the period January 1, 2018 through March 31, 2018. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated 6/17/18 approving [324] Third joint interim application of the receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses incurred during the period January 1, 2018 through March 31, 2018. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/17/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Dirisamer on behalf of Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Dirisamer, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Folland on behalf of Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [337] Discovery Dispute Letter. S&W is entitled to issue the subpoena. The parties are to submit a joint proposed discovery and supplemental briefing schedule by 6/22/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/18/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated June 15, 2018 Re: The Parties are unable to resolve a discovery dispute. by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018, Terminated: 6/15/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [335] Reply in Support, [332] Memorandum in Opposition,, Letter dated June 15, 2018 requesting permission to jointly respond to the two recent filings. by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: [336]. The Receiver and the SEC's joint brief in response to Schafer and Weiner, PLLC's filings at [332][335] is due by 6/22/2018. Counsel may file a 10-page joint memorandum, exclusive of any declaration from the SEC staff. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/15/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Reply in SupportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support supplemental submission filed by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Transcript of June 7 decision of Judge Nelms) (Klein, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10507618. by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Dirisamer Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (3) Supplement Certificates of Good Standing) (Dirisamer, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10507581. by Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Folland Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (3) Supplement Certificates of Good Standing) (Folland, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [334] David Joseph Dirisamer's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Interested Party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals Inc. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/13/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [333] Robert C. Folland's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for interested party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals Inc. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/13/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Receiver's Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Schefer and weiner Final Fee Application filed by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A-, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit U) (Zaretsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018, Terminated: 6/11/2018 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene submitted by Robert C. Follan, requesting to be added as a non-interested party. Seeking leave to lift the stay of litigation against the Receivership Estate and permit Navidea to proceed with its Third Party Complaint against PPCO. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [331] Motion to Intervene. The motion to intervene (as an interested party, not as a "non-interested party," as the movant requests), is granted for the limited purpose of moving for pro hac vice admission of the movant's attorneys and, simultaneously, moving to modify the receivership stay to permit impleader of PPCO in the referenced Southern District of New York action. The requirement for a premotion conference in connection with those motions is waived. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/11/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [326] Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursemet of expenses Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Joinder to Receiver's: (I) Opposition to Application of Schafer & Weiner, PLLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred From December 19, 2016 Through June 13, 2017; and (II) Cross-Motion for Disgorgement of Previously Paid Legal Fees (Dkt.##328&329), RESPONSE to Motion re [326] Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursemet of expenses filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [326] Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursemet of expenses Memorandum of Law of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in: (I) Opposition to Application of Schafer and Weiner, PLLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred from December 19, 2016 Through June 13, 2017; and (II) Support of Cross-Motion for Disgorgement of Previously Paid Legal Fees filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cross MOTION to Compel Notice by Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, of: (I) Opposition to Application of Schafer and Weiner, PLLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred from December 19, 2016 Through June 13, 2017; and (II) Cross-Motion for Disgorgement of Previously Paid Legal Fees by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re [326] Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursemet of expenses Proof of Service by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC (Klein, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Final MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursemet of expenses by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-SFAR, # (2) Exhibit B-Summary of Fees Billed, # (3) Exhibit C- S&W Times Records ^ Expenses, # (4) Exhibit D-Expert Report, Judge Rhodes, # (5) Exhibit E-A.1 Certification, # (6) Exhibit F-M. Baum Declaration in support, # (7) Notice of Motion returnable June 12, 2018, # (8) Declaration,Supplemental of M. Baum, # (9) Proposed Order) (Klein, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION for Attorney Fees /Interim Application for Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2018 Through and Including March 31, 2018 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 6/18/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period January 1, 2018 Through and Including March 31, 2018 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G., # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. In light of the Status Report at [323], the Status Conference previously scheduled for 5/24/2018 is adjourned to 7/16/2018 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/21/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT re Proposed Agenda for 5.24.18 Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018, Terminated: 5/17/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Tracy L. Dayton) by Daniel Small. (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [322] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tracy L. Dayton terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/17/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part S&W's [320] Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The promotion conference is waived. S&W may file its fee application. However, all parties are advised that if this Court finds that any party has filed papers in bad faith, the Court will not hesitate to impose sanctions, including but not limited to attorneys' fees, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. Moreover, the parties are advised this it is extremely unlikely that this Court is going to accept any consensual resolution of S&W's fee application, since allegations of bad faith have been raised and it is in the public interest to determine whether those allegations are valid or not.The Receiver is further advised that any letter filed in this action must include in the ECF entry line a brief description of the subject matter of the letter, e.g., "Letter response to S&W's proposed fee application", not just "Letter dated May 14, 2018 by Receiver", so that the docket remains intelligible. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/15/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated May 14, 2018 by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Receiver and any other interested parties shall file a response to Schafer and Weiner PLLC's [320] letter by 5/14/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/6/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion for Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for pre motion conference by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Klein, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION /Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth T. Latz {279} by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Order on Motion for Order of SaleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 4/23/18 APPROVING RECEIVERS MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING THE SALE OF CERTAIN LIFE INSURANCE POLICIES re: [311 ] that the Sale Motion is granted; that the Receiver may proceed to close on the sales contemplated by the PSAs once all conditions to closing have been satisfied; that the objections to the sale are overruled, except to the extent that any priority held by an objector shall attach to the proceeds of this sale. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/23/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT / Receiver's Third Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support re [311] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, As Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies /Reply Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, in Further Support of Motion to Approve Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [311] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, As Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1.) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [311] Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, As Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies by Court-Appointed Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Weinick, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. In light of the Status Report at [313], the Status Conference previously scheduled for 4/9/2018 is adjourned to 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re Notice of Motion of Melanie L. Cyganowski, as Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies [Dkt. No. 311] by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018, Terminated: 4/23/2018 Motion for Order of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for Order of Sale of Melanie L. Cyganowski, As Receiver, for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale of Certain Life Insurance Policies by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Melanie L. Gyganowski, # (2) Declaration of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., # (3) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: [306] Second MOTION for Attorney Fees /Interim Application for Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2017 Through and Including December 31, 2017. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/2/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: [305] Second MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2017 Through and Including December 31, 2017.( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/2/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [307] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sonia Marquez terminated. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/26/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 2/27/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Sonia Marquez) by Jeffrey Shulse. (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018, Terminated: 3/5/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Attorney Fees /Interim Application for Goldin Associates, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2017 Through and Including December 31, 2017 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018, Terminated: 3/5/2018 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Attorney Fees Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period October 1, 2017 Through and Including December 31, 2017 by Otterbourg P.C., Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H., # (9) Exhibit I., # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Receiver re [302] Status Report /Notice of filing of Corrected Second Status Report of Receiver to the Court (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Letter re Proposed Joint Agenda by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. In light of the Status Report at [303], the Status Conference previously scheduled for 2/1/2018 is adjourned to 4/9/2018 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/29/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The parties are reminded that a Proposed Joint Agenda must be filed 48 hours prior to the conference scheduled for 2/1/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/29/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT /Second Status Report To The Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [298] Motion for authorizing the receiver's application to retain and pay Leite, Tosto E Barros Advogados Associados. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/18/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 1, 2017, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Parisi, Telephone number 718-613-2605. Email address: deniseparisi72@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (Parisi, Denise)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018, Terminated: 1/23/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION for Hearing re [298] Notice of MOTION for Hearing to Approve Procedures for the Retention and Payment of Additional Limited Scope Professionals /for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Payment of Leite, Tosto E Barros Advogados Associados by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018, Terminated: 1/22/2018 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION for Hearing to Approve Procedures for the Retention and Payment of Additional Limited Scope Professionals by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING EXPANSION OF RECEIVERSHIP re [291] Notice of MOTION for Hearing to Expand Receivership Estate filed by Receiver. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/28/17 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Authorizing approving proposed procedures for the retention and payment of additional limited scope professionals.( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/28/17 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Approving First Application of Cooley LLP for Allowance of Compensation And Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred From December 19, 2016 through March 31, 2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/27/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Authorizing the Receiver's Application to retain and pay limited scope legal professionals. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/17 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Receiver re [144] Letter, /Notice of Proposed Order Approving First Interim Application of Cooley LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred From December 19, 2016 Through March 31, 2017 (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: [284]. The Receiver is to submit a proposed order regarding Cooley's Fee Application. Any party objecting to the Application will then have five days to submit opposition. The Court will then rule promptly. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/20/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 12/26/2017 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION for Hearing to Approve Procedures for the Retention and Payment of Additional Limited Scope Professionals by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Memorandum in Support) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 12/26/2017 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION for Hearing to Expand Receivership Estate by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re: [283] ORDER APPROVING FIRST INTERIM APPLICATIONOF GOLDIN ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATIONAND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING THE PERIODJULY 6, 2017 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2017. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/4/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re: [282] ORDER APPROVING FIRST JOINT INTERIM APPLICATIONOF THE RECEIVER AND OTTERBOURG P.C. FOR ALLOWANCE OFCOMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURINGTHE PERIOD JULY 6, 2017 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2017. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/4/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 12/1/2017 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All counsel present. Parties have until 12/22/2017 to file any motions. Any opposition to those motions shall be filed by 1/5/2018. The next Status Conference is set for 2/1/2018 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT / First Status Report To The Court by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B.) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 287 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Order on Motion to Appoint ExpertCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Approving the Receiver's fees and the retention of Conway Mackenzie Capital Advisors, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc to October 12, 2017 [279] Motion to Appoint Expert. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/30/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 286 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re parties' Proposed Joint Agenda by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION dated 11/20/17 re: that by Order dated November 11, 2017, I granted the Receivers application to approve the retention of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. (Houlihan), nunc pro tunc to September 11, 2017(the Application), overruling the opposition to the Application filed by a large group of non-insider Platinum Partners Credit Opportunities (PPCO) investors (the Objecting Investors). This Memorandum Opinion sets forth the basis for that Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Receiver re [144] Letter, Regarding First Application Of Cooley LLP For Allowance Of Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred From December 19, 2016 Through March 31, 2017 (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017, Terminated: 12/5/2017 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees /Financial Advisor First Interim Application of Goldin Associates, LLC For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 6, 2017 Through September 30, 2017 by Goldin Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Exhibit C., # (4) Exhibit D., # (5) Exhibit E., # (6) Exhibit F., # (7) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017, Terminated: 12/5/2017 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint First Interim Application of the Receiver and Otterbourg P.C. For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period July 6, 2017 Through September 30, 2017 by Receiver, Otterbourg P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-SFAR, # (2) Exhibit B-Summary of Hours, # (3) Exhibit C-Project Code Summary, # (4) Exhibit D-Receiver Time, # (5) Exhibit E-Otterbourg Time, # (6) Exhibit F-Summary of Expense, # (7) Exhibit G-Receiver Expenses, # (8) Exhibit H-Otterbourg Expenses, # (9) Exhibit I-Certification, # (10) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [183] Letter,,,,,, /Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski, Adopting, in Part, Application of Bart M. Schwartz to Retain and Pay Certain Limited Scope Legal Professionals by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/11/2017, Entered: 11/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING THE RECEIVERS FEESAND THE RETENTION OF CONWAY MACKENZIE CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLCNUNC PRO TUNC TO OCTOBER 12, 2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2017. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. This Court's Individual Practice Rule requiring a premotion conference prior to the filing of any motion shall not apply to administrative motions (e.g., scheduling requests, motions for extensions of time, and retention applications). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2017. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [275] Motion to Appoint Expert. Opinion to follow. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2017. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017, Terminated: 11/30/2017 Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Expert /Conway MacKenzie Capital Advisors, LLC. by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kenneth L. Latz, # (2) Exhibit A. to Declaration, # (3) Brief in Support of Motion, # (4) Proposed Order) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case No Longer Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support re [275] MOTION to Appoint Expert /Application for Order Approving the Retention of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. Nunc Pro Tunc to September 11, 2017 filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Melanie L. Cyganowski / Opposition Brief by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing: Status Conference previously set for 10/26/2017 is reset to 12/1/2017 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [254] Notice(Other) filed by Receiver - No parties to this action oppose or have any other comment regarding the Receiver's Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver [254]. The Court has duly considered the lone commentary for clarification of certain language in the third sentence of paragraph 30 by a purported "large group of non-insider Platinum Partners Credit Opportunities Fund investors" ("PPCO"). [267] The Court also has considered the Receiver's response and concurs with the Receiver that PPCO's concerns are not well founded. However, as the Receiver has no objection to adding the following language: "(e.g., pay out on a life insurance policy or realization of a litigation outcome purchase)" after the phrase "settlement of a transaction" in the third sentence of paragraph 30, that paragraph has been amended accordingly, and the proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver is approved in the form attached to this Electronic Order. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/16/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 11/11/2017 Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Expert /Application for Order Approving the Retention of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. Nunc Pro Tunc to September 11, 2017 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion, # (2) Proposed Order Ex. A, # (3) Declaration Ex. B) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference will be held on 10/26/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are required to file a Proposed Joint Agenda 48 hours prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/16/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/16/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Alexander Stern on behalf of Daniel Small (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re [238] Notice(Other) filed by Receiver, [110] Letter,, filed by Bart Schwartz --- The Attached Order Authorizes the Receiver to Retain and Pay Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/11/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [239] Notice(Other) filed by Receiver, [206] Letter filed by Bart Schwartz -- The Attached Order Authorizes the Receiver to retain and pay Deloitte Tax LLP. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/11/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [255] Motion for Leave to File -- The Attached Order Creating Protocols for Interested Parties to be Heard is SO ORDERED. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/11/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [212] Motion for Leave to File -- There being no opposition to the SEC's request to substitute an exhibit to Docket No. 211-1, the request is granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/6/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [205] Motion for Leave to File -- This request was denied, along with other similar requests, by this Court via a standing order issued on June 30, 2017 denying the filing on the docket of motions by "interested parties," who were not named parties in the action. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/6/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER terminating [139] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal ; terminating [140] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal -- These motions were made by the original receiver and are terminated in light of the appointment of a new receiver who has been tasked by the Court to review this entire matter de novo. The termination is without prejudice to renew if Receiver Cyganowski believes such applications are appropriate for the Court to consider. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/6/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Daniel Small of Withdrawal of David J. Lizmi (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [255] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Order Adopting Protocol, Objections due 8/31/2017, [254] Notice(Other) Reply Declaration in Further Support of Protocols and Amendments to Receiver Order by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter regarding the Receiver's Proposed Orders (Dkt. Nos. 254 & 255) by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [255] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Order Adopting Protocol, Objections due 8/31/2017, [254] Notice(Other) by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re Receiver's Applications, Dkt. Nos. [254], [255] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re: Receiver's Motion for an Order Approving the Proposed Protocols by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re: the Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge Irizarry dtd: 8-31-2017 re: Receivers Proposed Second Amended Order and Proposed Order Adopting Protocols by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 order on motion for settlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Settlement Between Receiver And Heartland Bank. The Court notes that none of the parties named in this case have objected to this proposed Order after having been provided time to do so. (See attached Order for details). Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/30/2017. Returned to chambers. (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding the Receiver's Proposed Orders (Dkt. Nos. 254 & 255) by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Regarding Receiver Applications by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Regarding the Receiver's Proposed Orders (Dkt. Nos. 254 & 255) by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re the Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver by Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re Receiver's application for an order approving the proposed protocols by Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [242] MOTION for Settlement Approving Stipulation and Proposed Order Settlement Between the Receiver and Hartland Bank by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017, Terminated: 10/11/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Order Adopting Protocol, Objections due 8/31/2017 by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Receiver of Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver, Objections Due 8/31/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Receiver Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [242] MOTION for Settlement Approving Stipulation and Proposed Order Settlement Between the Receiver and Hartland Bank by Receiver (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re: Receiver's Application For Court Approval of Heartland Bank Settlement [Dkt. Nos. 242-244] by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re Receiver's Application, Dkt. Nos. 242-244 by Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re Receiver's Application, Dkt. Nos. 242-244 by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Judge Irizarry dtd: 08-23-2017 re: Receiver's application by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Regarding The Receiver's Application For Court Approval Of Heartland Bank Settlement by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re Receiver's Application, Dkt. No. [242] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding The Receivers Application For Court Approval Of Heartland Bank Settlement by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Authorizing Receiver To Retain And Pay Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc., ORDERED that the relief sought by the [236] Application and Notice are granted, and pursuant to the Application and the Notice, the Receiver is authorized to retain Houlihan, effective nunc pro tunc to December 19, 2016 in accordance with the terms of the Agreement and the Addendum; and further ORDERED that the Receiver may make the payments to Houlihan set forth in her Declaration and in the Notice, and may make such other future payments as provided for in the Agreement and the Addendum without further Order of this Court. (SEE attached for details). Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/18/2017. (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [242] MOTION for Settlement Approving Stipulation and Proposed Order Settlement Between the Receiver and Hartland Bank filed by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [242] MOTION for Settlement Approving Stipulation and Proposed Order Settlement Between the Receiver and Hartland Bank filed by Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017, Terminated: 8/31/2017 motion for settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Approving Stipulation and Proposed Order Settlement Between the Receiver and Hartland Bank by Receiver. (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Receiver re [172] Stipulation Withdrawal of Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Information Sharing Between Platinum Entities (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Receiver re [112] Letter, Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Expand Scope of Receivership (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Receiver of Adoption of Prior Receiver's Application to Retain and Pay Deloitte Tax LLP (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Ex. A) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Receiver of Adoption of Prior Receiver's Application to Retain and Pay Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Ex. A) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT /The Receivers Initial Status Report to the Court by Receiver (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Receiver of Adoption of, and Addendum to, Application to Retain Houlihan Lokey Financial Advisors, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1., # (2) Exhibit A., # (3) Proposed Order Exhibit 2) (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Chief Judge Irizarry from Michael T. Scott, on behalf of Reed Smith LLP, requesting that the application dated June 30, 2017 made by former receiver Bart M. Schwartz be withdrawn by the newly appointed receiver--if not withdrawn, requesting that it be denied it its entirety. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Receiver re [208] Letter /Receiver's Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Retain and Pay Reed Smith LLP (Cyganowski, Melanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order on Motion to Appoint ExpertCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER approving retention of Goldin Associates LLC as financial advisor to the Receiver. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/21/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order on motion to appoint counselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving retention of Ottenbourg, P.C. as counsel for the Receiver. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/21/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re: Receiver's Applications, Dkt. Nos. 219 & 220 by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re Receiver's Applications, Dkt. Nos [219] & [220] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re Receiver's applications Dkt. Nos. 219 & 220 by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re Receiver's applications Dkt. No. 219 & Dkt. No. 220 by Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re: Receiver's Applications, Dkt. Nos. 219 & 220 by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 07-07-17, before Judge Irizarry. Court Reporter/Transcriber N. Canales, Telephone number 718-613-2509. Email address: cnlsnic@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 8/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017. (Canales, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re Receiver's applications Dkt. No. 219 & Dkt. No. 220 by David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge Irizarry dtd: 7-12-2017 re: Receiver's applications by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Adam Caleb Ford (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appoint Expert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Expert Goldin Associates LLC as Financial Advisor to the Receiver by Court-Appointed Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Ex. A, # (2) Declaration of Marc S. Kirschner) (Cyganowski, Melaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Application for Order Approving the Retention of Otterbourg P.C. Nunc Pro Tunc to the Appointment date by Court-Appointed Receiver. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Ex. A, # (2) Declaration of Richard G. Haddad) (Cyganowski, Melaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Order of SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AUTHORIZING ARABELLA SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: the Receiver's application is granted, and pursuant to the application, the Receiver's entry into the Arabella Settlement Agreement, attached as Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael E. Baum is approved. SO Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/7/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [166] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal -- Counsel is directed to electronically file the original document on the public docket. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/10/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry:Status Conference held on 7/7/2017. (Court Reporter Nicole Canales.) (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [42] Motion to Intervene; granting [42] Motion to Stay -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Government's (represented by the Office of the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New York) motion to intervene and to stay civil proceedings is granted. The SEC action is stayed pending the resolution of the criminal proceeding against the Individual Defendants. Nothing contained in this Electronic Order or the Attached Memorandum and Order is to be construed as affecting the responsibilities and actions of the Receiver in disposing of the receivership assets. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/7/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Order on Motion to Appoint Appoint Receiver/RefereeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [173] Motion to Appoint Receiver. ; ORDER re [170] Letter filed by Bart Schwartz -- The SEC's motion for the appointment of a new receiver in this matter is granted; however, the Court reserves decision as to whether to approve the SEC's proposed changes to the original order appointing a receiver. The Court accepts the resignation of the original receiver, Mr. Schartz, effective immediately. Ms. Melanie L. Cyganowksi is hereby appointed as Receiver effective immediately. Mr. Schwartz is directed to assist in a swift and smooth transition of the Receivership. Because the Court had some concerns regarding the new restrictions in the "Proposed Second Order Appointing Receiver" [174-1], the Court forwarded the red-line version of the document to Ms. Cyganowski and requested she briefly note any concerns she might have concerning the proposed changes, their impact on the Receiver's authority, and any undue delay they may cause and fax it to chambers. The fax received by the Court in response to that request is attached hereto. The Court will discuss concerns with the terms of the proposed new Receiver Order at the status conference scheduled for tomorrow. Until this Court rules on these proposed revisions, Ms. Cyganowski is to assume all authority previously held by Mr. Schwartz as Receiver under the existing Receiver Order [6]. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/6/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne P. Pope on behalf of Joseph Sanfilippo (aty to be noticed) (Pope, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy L Dayton on behalf of Daniel Small (aty to be noticed) (Dayton, Tracy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Piggins on behalf of Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Piggins, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017, Terminated: 10/6/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File a Substitute Exhibit to Docket Number 211-1 by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017, Terminated: 7/5/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9651236. by Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit w/certificate of good standing) (Piggins, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [210] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF (registration is available online at the EDNY homepage). Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Counsel may appear by telephone at the conference scheduled for July 7, 2017. If they wish to do so, the Court must advised via e-filed letter and counsel shall contact my courtroom deputy for call-in information. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/5/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [209] Letter filed by Uri Landesman -- The request is granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/5/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter requesting Landesman be excused from July 7 court appearance by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter seeking an Order Authorizing the Receiver to Retain and Pay Reed Smith by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Exhibit 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Burnstein, # (2) Proposed Order Exhibit 2 Proposed Order) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Entry of Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointing Substitute Receiver by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter seeking retention of Deloitte Tax LLP by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Exhibit 1 Declaration of Michael D. Klett, # (2) Proposed Order Exhibit 2 Proposed Order) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 10/6/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Position Concerning the SEC's Application to Appoint a New Receiver by Beechwood Re Limited, Beechwood Bermuda International Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Position by Non-Parties Beechwood Re Limited and Beechwood Bermuda International Ltd. Concerning the SEC's Application for Appointment of New Receiver) (Fier, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to the The Honorable Dora L. Irizarry regarding the Receiver's Proposed Order, Dkt. No. [172] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to the The Honorable Dora L. Irizarry respectfully responding to the Receiver's June 23, 2017 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Information Sharing Between Platinum Entities, Dkt. No. 172 by David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re: Receiver Resignation by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver filed by Bruce Bullen, Patricia Faris, Elizabeth Garatoni, Michael Garatoni, Garatoni Family Foundation, Allen Kaplan, Mary G. DeSimone Irrevocable Trust, Faris Philip, Robb Charitable Lead Trust, John Smith, Lori Smith, Courtney Solcher, Felicia Solcher, Gerry Solcher, Sally Solcher, Whitney Solcher, Steven Singer 2006 Revocable Trust, Teresa L. Perlstein Revocable Trust, The Garatoni Holdings Investment Partnership, The Perry and Ruby Stevens Charitable Foundation, The World Traveler Revocable Trust, William J. Perlstein Revocable Trust, Anthony Wright. (Nystrom, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William Nystrom on behalf of Faris Philip, Patricia Faris, John Smith, Lori Smith, Michael Garatoni, Elizabeth Garatoni, Steven Singer 2006 Revocable Trust, Garatoni Family Foundation, The Garatoni Holdings Investment Partnership, The World Traveler Revocable Trust, Anthony Wright, Courtney Solcher, Felicia Solcher, Gerry Solcher, Sally Solcher, Whitney Solcher, The Perry and Ruby Stevens Charitable Foundation, Mary G. DeSimone Irrevocable Trust, Bruce Bullen, Robb Charitable Lead Trust (aty to be noticed) (Nystrom, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Chief Judge Irizarry from Michael T. Scott, on behalf of Reed Smith LLP, requesting that the application dated June 30, 2017 made by former receiver Bart M. Schwartz be withdrawn by the newly appointed receiver--if not withdrawn, requesting that it be denied it its entirety. (Carosella, Christy) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Honorable Dora L. Irizarry by Morris D. Weiss (Taylor, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Dora L. Irizarry respectfully responding to the SEC's motion in accordance with the Court's Order dated June 27, 2017 by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in response to the Letter for Approval of Resignation of Receiver by Bart M. Schwarz, the Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver and the Letter by United States Securities and Exchange Commission by Arabella Exploration, LLC, Arabella Operating, LLC (Trivigno, Leonardo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Honorable Dora L. Irizarry in accordance with the Court's June 27, 2017 Order by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC (Grekin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Honorable Dora L. Irizarry in accordance with the Court's June 27, 2017 Order by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE AND STANDING ORDER --- A number of "interested parties," consisting of purported creditors or victims of the defendants as a result of the securities and wire fraud alleged in this case, through their attorneys, have added themselves to the docket of this case, without seeking leave of the Court to do so. In some cases, the attorneys are admitted to practice in this Court, in others, the attorneys have sought leave to appear pro hac vice and those applications have been denied by order entered today. ANY PERSON, PERSONS, OR ENTITIES WHO ALLEGE TO BE CREDITORS OR VICTIMS ARE HEREBY PROHIBITED FROM ADDING THEMSELVES TO THE DOCKET OF THIS CASE. SUCH PERSONS SHOULD COMMUNICATE EITHER WITH THE SEC OR THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF THIS DISTRICT AS THEY REPRESENT THE AGGRIEVED IN THIS CASE. None of these parties have been given leave by the Court to intervene in this action. Indeed, some never sought leave to do so. Moreover, by inappropriately adding themselves to the docket, they have created problems with the ECF system in this case. Finally, other individuals have faxed letters to chambers without first seeking permission to do so. FAXING TO CHAMBERS IS BY PERMISSION OF THE COURT ONLY. While the Court is mindful that there are victims in this case, the Court will not tolerate any violations of Court rules or procedures. NO FILINGS OR APPEARANCES WILL BE PERMITTED, UNLESS THEY ARE PERSONS WHO ARE NAMED IN THE COMPLAINT AND WHO HAVE BEEN GIVEN EXPLICIT PERMISSION OF THE COURT TO APPEAR. THE COURT WILL NOT ENTERTAIN ANY MOTION TO INTERVENE BASED SOLELY ON THE FACT THAT THE PROPOSED INTERVENOR IS A VICTIM OR CREDITOR. AGGRIEVED PERSONS SHALL CONTACT THE SEC AND THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NY AND THOSE ENTITIES ARE DIRECTED TO PRESENT THOSE POSITIONS TO THE COURT AND DEFENDANTS. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/30/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [181] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; denying [188] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; denying [189] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice are DENIED. First, the affidavits are deficient. In one case, DE #188, the movant did not provide the requested information. As to all, the affiants purport to have been duly sworn and deposed in the State of New York, County of Kings, but the affidavit is notarized in another state by a notary of that state. This is not a proper affidavit and violates New York State law. Most importantly, none of these parties purport to represent persons named in the complaint and they have not been given permission to intervene in this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/30/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [190] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice --- Ms. Suzanne P. Pope's motion for admission pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Sanfilippo is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the NYED's Website homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/30/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER VACATING ORDER granting [181] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. On further review of Mr. Nystrom's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice and in consultation with the District Court, the 6/29/2017 Order granting Mr. Nystrom's motion is sua sponte vacated. Mr. Nystrom's application is deficient in that his supporting affidavit is captioned in the State of New York but was notarized in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. The District Court will decide the outstanding pro hac vice motions submitted by Mr. Nystrom and by other counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/30/2017. (Stackhouse, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting SEC's [207] Motion for Leave to File --- The SEC is granted leave to file a reply to defendants' papers NO LATER THAN 5:00 PM, WEDNESDAY, JULY 5, 2017. TWO HARD COURTESY COPIES MUST BE PROVIDED TO CHAMBERS NO LATER THAN 9:00 AM THURSDAY, JULY 6, 2017. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/30/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Boey on behalf of Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund (International) Limited (in Official Liquidation), and Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Intermediate Fund Ltd. (in Official Liquidation) (aty to be noticed) (Boey, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C.R. Ziegler on behalf of Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund (International) Limited (in Official Liquidation), and Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Intermediate Fund Ltd. (in Official Liquidation) (aty to be noticed) (Ziegler, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Joint Official Liquidators of Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund (International) Limited (in Official Liquidation), and Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Intermediate Fund Ltd. (in Official Liquidation) (aty to be noticed) (Dorchak, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Honorable Dora L. Irizarry in accordance with the Court's Order dated June 27, 2017 by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Suzanne Pope Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9645557. by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9645046. by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing) (Grekin, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9644971. by Schafer and Weiner, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing) (Baum, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Dora L. Irizarry respectfully responding to the SEC's motion in accordance with the Court's order dated June 27, 2017 by Uri Landesman, David Levy, Joseph Mann, Mark Nordlicht, Joseph Sanfilippo, Jeffrey Shulse, Daniel Small (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver filed by Heartland Bank. (Jenkins, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by William Nystrom on behalf of Allen Kaplan, Teresa L. Perlstein Revocable Trust, William J. Perlstein Revocable Trust (notification declined or already on case) (Nystrom, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Dora L. Irizarry respectfully responding to the SEC's motion in accordance with the Court's Order dated June 27, 2017 by David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [181] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William C. Nystrom is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By 7/7/2017, counsel shall register for ECF and provide his address to the Clerk's Office. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, counsel shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, counsel shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/29/2017. (Stackhouse, Noreen). VACATED pursuant to 6/30/2017 Order of Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. This entry has been modified on 6/30/2017 to indicate order has been vacated. (Stackhouse, Noreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Payment of Limited Scope Legal Professionals by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Ex. 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Burstein, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 Fee Application of Hoover Slovacek, LLP, # (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 Fee Application of Cooper & Scully, P.C., # (4) Exhibit Ex. 4 Fee Application of Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C., # (5) Exhibit Ex. 5 Fee Application of Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC, # (6) Exhibit Ex. 6 Fee Application of Benesch, Friedland, Coplan & Aronoff LLP, # (7) Exhibit Ex. 7 Fee Application of Ganfer & Shore LLP, # (8) Exhibit Ex. 8 Fee Application of Bryan Cave LLP, # (9) Exhibit Ex. 9 Fee Application of Maslon LLP, # (10) Exhibit Ex. 10 Fee Application of Morrison Cohen, LLP, # (11) Exhibit Ex. 11 Certification of Paneth & O'Mahony, PLLC, # (12) Exhibit Ex. 12 Fee Application of Virtus Law LLP, # (13) Exhibit Ex. 13 Certification of Stikeman Elliot LLP, # (14) Exhibit Ex. 14 Fee Application of Walkers, # (15) Exhibit Ex. 15 Fee Application of Chediak Advogados, # (16) Exhibit Ex. 16 Fee Application of Leite, Tosto E Barros Advogados Associados, # (17) Exhibit Ex. 17 Certification of Allen & Overy LLP, # (18) Exhibit Ex. 18 Certification of Demarest Advogados, # (19) Exhibit Ex. 19 Fee Application of Kessler Collins, P.C., # (20) Exhibit Ex. 20 Fee Application of O'Connell Law, PLLC, # (21) Proposed Order Ex. 21 Proposed Order) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Chief Judge Dora L. Irizarry by Allen Kaplan, Teresa L. Perlstein Revocable Trust, William J. Perlstein Revocable Trust (Nystrom, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William C. Nystrom Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9640551. by Allen Kaplan, William J. Perlstein Revocable Trust, Teresa L. Perlstein Revocable Trust. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit) (Nystrom, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter in response to the SEC's letter dated 6/21/17 by Bart Schwartz (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [178] Response to Motion,, filed by Heartland Bank, [177] Letter filed by David Levy, Joseph Mann, Uri Landesman, Jeffrey Shulse, Daniel Small, Joseph Sanfilippo, Mark Nordlicht --- The Individual Defendants' and Heartland Bank's request to be heard in connection with the application by the SEC for the appointment of a new receiver is granted. The Court already has entered a scheduling order and will hear the parties further on July 7, 2017. Said parties are to file their written responses to the SEC's motion NO LATER THAN JUNE 30, 2017 BY 3:00 PM AND PROVIDE HARD COPIES TO CHAMBERS BY THEN AS WELL. The Individual Defendants in their letter [DE # 177] seem to make a number of arguments in opposition to the SEC's request; any additional arguments shall be presented to the Court in the filing due on June 30, 2017. The parties should also indicate whether they would approve of Melanie Cyganowski as the new receiver should the Court grant the SEC's application. NO EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. With respect to the conference to be held on July 7, 2017, the parties should be prepared to address whether decision on any pending motions made by the Receiver for various authorizations should be stayed pending the Court's decision on the motion to appoint a new receiver. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/27/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [148] Motion for Hearing -- As an initial matter, the letter requesting a hearing concerning the payment of compensation for past employment to two employees was addressed to the Hon. Kiyo A. Matsumoto, U.S.D.J., who is not assigned to this case. It should have been addressed to the undersigned. For the reasons set forth in the letter filed by the current Receiver [DE 151] opposing the disbursement, which is joined in by the SEC [DE 159], the request to lift the stay imposed in December 2016 Order appointing the Receiver, and amended in January 2017, is denied. The employees stand in the same position as other creditors and victims in this case. Moreover, given that a new receiver likely will be appointed, it is inappropriate to grant any such request at this time. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/27/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [168] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal ; denying [171] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal --- The SEC's request to file under seal its letter regarding the termination of the Receivership of Mr. Bart M. Schwartz ("Receiver") is denied. The SEC set forth no factual basis warranting the filing under seal other than representing that it contained certain "sensitive matters bearing on the Receivership." [See DE #168, p. 1]. Particularly disturbing is that counsel for Defendants Nordlicht and Platinum Management (NY), LLC (PMNY), in opposing the sealing, notes that, in effect the motion was made ex parte, as the SEC refused to provide the document it seeks to seal [DE #168-1], but advised counsel that, if the court granted the motion to seal, the SEC would not oppose any motion to unseal it. The Court agrees with counsel that, by its conduct, the SEC improperly filed a document ex parte without leave of the Court and without proper notice to the parties. Moreover, the SEC's representation clearly indicates that sealing is not necessary, but rather a sheer waste of the Court's time and resources and perhaps gamesmanship, which this Court previously advised the parties it would not tolerate. The Receiver's request to file its document under seal also is rejected, because his request is made solely on the basis that the SEC filed its papers under seal. ALL PARTIES ARE HEREBY ADMONISHED THAT UNDER NO CIRCUMSTANCES IS ANY PARTY TO MAKE AN APPLICATION FOR THE SEALING OF ANY DOCUMENT VIA ECF ON ITS OWN. NOR IS ANY PARTY TO FILE ANY DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. IF A PARTY WISHES TO FILE A DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL, A PDF OF THE DOCUMENT SHALL BE EMAILED TO MY CASE MANAGER, CHRISTY CAROSELLA, AND TWO HARD COURTESY COPIES ARE TO BE FORWARDED TO HER ATTENTION FORTHWITH. IF THE SEALING IS GRANTED, THEN THE COURT WILL HAVE THE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL. ANY PARTY VIOLATING THIS PROCEDURE WILL BE SANCTIONED AND ANY DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CONTRAVENTION OF THIS ORDER SHALL BE STRICKEN SUMMARILY. Finally, despite previous admonitions to the parties to provide 2 hard courtesy copies of all filings to chambers immediately upon filing, the Court is not receiving hard courtesy copies of filings by all parties. The parties are reminded again to provide 2 hard courtesy copies to chambers IMMEDIATELY upon filing, such that they are received NO LATER THAN THE NEXT BUSINESS DAY BY 4:00 PM. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/27/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER re [176] Unsigned Order to Show Cause filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission -- A Show Cause Hearing will be held on July 7, 2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 A South. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/27/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver, [168] MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal , [171] MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal , [166] MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Application for Permission to File Portions of the Receivers Wind-Down Plan and Limited Scope Professional Applications Under Seal Requesting Documents be Unsealed and that Heartland Bank be Heard filed by Heartland Bank. (Jenkins, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re proposed resignation of Receiver by Uri Landesman, David Levy, Joseph Mann, Mark Nordlicht, Joseph Sanfilippo, Jeffrey Shulse, Daniel Small (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Unsigned Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unsigned Order to Show Cause by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver Declaration of Neal Jacobson Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [173] MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver, # (2) Exhibit Blacklined Proposed Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Melanie L. Cyganowski) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017, Terminated: 7/6/2017 Motion to Appoint Appoint Receiver/Referee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Receiver Application for an Order to Show Cause for Entry of a Second Amended Order Appointing Receiver and Appointment of a Substitute Receiver by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed OSC) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding information sharing between Platinum Entities by Bart Schwartz (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017, Terminated: 6/27/2017 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Bart Schwartz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Receiver's Letter in response to the letter submitted by the SEC on 6/21/17) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter for approval of resignation of Receiver by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Bart M. Schwartz, # (2) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [168] MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal filed by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017, Terminated: 6/27/2017 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter advising the Court of filing status by Bart Schwartz (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017, Terminated: 7/10/2017 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Application for Permission to File Portions of the Receivers Wind-Down Plan and Limited Scope Professional Applications Under Seal by Bart Schwartz. (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter regarding First Joint Interim Application of Receiver and Guidepost Solutions, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Fee Applications by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William Russell Jenkins on behalf of Heartland Bank (notification declined or already on case) (Jenkins, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter regarding the First Application of Cooley LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses by Bart Schwartz (Levine, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [160] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William R. Jenkins is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By 6/12/2017, counsel shall register for ECF and provide his address to the Clerk's Office. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, counsel shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, counsel shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/8/2017. (Stackhouse, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Chief Judge Dora L. Irizarry by Heartland Bank (Jenkins, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017, Terminated: 6/8/2017 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William R. Jenkins Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9582135. by Heartland Bank. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jenkins, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [148] First MOTION for Hearing to lift stay so employees can sue to obtain payment for past services filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter in Response to Fee Applications (Dkt. Nos. 143 -144) by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter in Response to Fee Applications by the Receiver and the Receiver's Counsel (Dkt. Nos. 143, 144) by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Dora L. Irizarry in Response to Receiver and Guidepost Solutions, LLC's First Fee Application (Dkt. No. 143) and Cooley LLP's First Fee Application (Dkt. No. 144) by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re Fee Applications by Receiver and Receiver's Counsel, Dkt. Nos. [143], [144] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter in Response to Receiver and Guidepost Solutions, LLC's First Fee Application (Dkt. No. 143) and Cooley LLP's First Fee Application (Dkt. No. 144) by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter in Response to the SEC and Receiver's Joint Request for a Status Conference (Dkt. No. 142) by Jeffrey Shulse (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Status Letter re Fee Applications by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [148] First MOTION for Hearing to lift stay so employees can sue to obtain payment for past services filed by Bart Schwartz. (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Hon. Dora L. Irizarry re: May 19, 2017 joint letter from the SEC and Receiver (Dkt. No. 142) by Joseph Mann (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Responding to May 19, 2017 Joint Letter from the SEC and the Receiver by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017, Terminated: 6/27/2017 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Hearing to lift stay so employees can sue to obtain payment for past services by Alexander Novak. (Novak, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Hon. Dora L. Irizarry re: May 19, 2017 joint letter from the SEC and Receiver (Dkt. No. 142) by David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: 5/29/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re Receiver application for a status conference by Uri Landesman (Breslin, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Responding to Plaintiff's May 19, 2017 Letter, Dkt. No. [142] by Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Management (NY) LLC (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter submitting Cooley's First Fee Application by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 First Quarterly Fee Application, # (2) Exhibit A SFAR, # (3) Exhibit B Total Fees, Hours, and Rates, # (4) Exhibit C Invoices, # (5) Exhibit D Certification of Alan Levine) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter submitting Receiver and Guidepost's First Fee Application by Bart Schwartz (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 First Quarterly Fee Application, # (2) Exhibit A SFAR, # (3) Exhibit B Total Fees, Hours, and Rates, # (4) Exhibit C Total Hours Worked, # (5) Exhibit D Time Records, # (6) Exhibit E Expenses) (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Joint Letter of the Securities and Exchange Commission and the Receiver Updating the Court on the Receivership and Requesting a Status Conference by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Jacobson, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter regarding the first quarterly fee applications to this Court to be submitted by the Receiver, Guidepost Solutions LLC, and Cooley LLP for allowance of compensation by Bart Schwartz (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 10/6/2017 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Application for Permission to File Certain Portions of the First Application of Cooley LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Under Seal by Bart Schwartz. (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 10/6/2017 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Receiver's Application for Permission to File Certain Portions of the First Joint Interim Application of the Receiver and Guidepost Solutions, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred Under Seal by Bart Schwartz. (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon in regard to the May 1, 2017 order directing that the Receiver file his First Quarterly Status Report under seal by Bart Schwartz (Barenholtz, Celia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 379 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?