Uni-Splendor Corp. v. Remington Designs, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-09316

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 8:51 PM EST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Remington Designs, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Alan Cooper +1 310 273 6333 +1 310 859 2325 acooper@ecjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Douglas M Neistat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James Richard Felton +1 818 382 6200 +1 818 986 6534 jfelton@greenbass.com
No Logo Uni-splendor Corp, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer J Shih +1 650 517 9800 +1 650 517 9803 jshih@fishiplaw.com
Space JOHN D. VAN LOBEN SELS +1 650 517 9800 +1 650 517 9898 jvanlobensels@fishiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert Barer (Anch)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kathleen Carroll Bricken +1 503 228 3939 +1 503 226 0259 kbricken@gsblaw.com
Space Patrick J. Conti +1 503 228 3939 +1 503 226 0259 pconti@gsblaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Contract: Other
  Entries (217) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Vacate, 190 ; it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: 1. Judgment is entered again st defendants Remington Designs, LLC ("Remington") and Coffee Solutions, LLC ("Coffee Solutions") and in favor of plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. ("Uni-Splendor") in the amount of $20,744,484.23; and 2. Judgment is e ntered in favor of Uni-Splendor and against Remington and Coffee Solutions on Remington's Counterclaim; and 3. The addition of Coffee Solutions to this Judgment is retroactive to November 7, 2017, that date the Judgment was entered in this Court; and 4. Uni-Splendor is entitled to interest on the amount of the Judgment at the statutory rate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1961(a); and 5. Uni-Splendor shall have its costs of suit. (mrgo)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Joinder (Motion Related)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                DECLARATION of Henry L. Whitehead re APPLICATION to file document (documents re Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Debtors) under seal 159 filed by Miscellaneous Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc.. (Whitehead, Henry)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (documents re Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Debtors) under seal 159 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document, # 2 Unredacted Document, # 3 Unredacted Document, # 4 Unredacted Document, # 5 Unredacted Document, # 6 Unredacted Document, # 7 Unredacted Document, # 8 Unredacted Document, # 9 Unredacted Document, # 10 Unredacted Document, # 11 Unredacted Document, # 12 Unredacted Document, # 13 Unredacted Document, # 14 Unredacted Document, # 15 Unredacted Document)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    APPLICATION to file document (documents re Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Debtors) under seal filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document, # 3 Redacted Document, # 4 Redacted Document, # 5 Redacted Document, # 6 Redacted Document)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      BILL OF COSTS. Costs taxed in amount of $2,856.62 in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant re: 121 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (wr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: 155 MOTION. Before the Court is a Motion for Leave to File Over-Sized Brief filed by plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. ("Uni-Splendor") (Docket No. 155). Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for May 7, 2018, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (See document for details) Nevertheless, the Court will allow both Uni-Splendor and the opposing parties to file over-sized briefs in support of and in opposition to the Motion to Amend to Add Judgment Debtors not to exceed 40 pages. Uni-Splendors Reply may not exceed 20 pages. Uni-Splendor shall file the Motion to Amend to Add Judgment Debtors at least 49 days, but no more than 55 days prior to the date of the hearing. The opposing parties Opposition shall be filed at least 21 days prior to the hearing date, and Uni-Splendor's Reply shall be filed at least 14 days prior to the hearing. (mrgo)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Over-Length Brief 155 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Over-Length Brief filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order) (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 151 Non-Resident Attorney Jana Volante Walshak APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC and Remington, Inc., designating Henry L. Whitehead as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 150 Non-Resident Attorney Charles A. De Monaco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, and Aroma Fresh, LLC, designating Henry L. Whitehead as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES RE APRIL 4, 2018 INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Telephonic conference held on April 4, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. The parties agreed to the following schedule: 1) Defendants' supplemental written objections/responses to subpoenas and production of board minutes not previously produced, if any, due by April 9, 2018. 2) Defendants' revised privilege logs, if necessary, and production of relevant emails and Wells Fargo check records due by April 13, 2018. 3) Plaintiff's Local Rule 37 letter, if necessary, must be sent by April 19, 2018. The Parties shall strictly comply with the requirements of Central District Local Rule 37 governing discovery disputes, including the meet and confer requirements. Court Recorder: XTR 4/04/18. (mr) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jana Volante Walshak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21531409) filed by Third Parties Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Whitehead, Henry)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles A. De Monaco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21530115) filed by Third Parties Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Whitehead, Henry)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/07/18, 11:42 a.m. re Transcript 148 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/07/18, 11:42 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (ls) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/26/18, 11:00 a.m. re Transcript 146 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/26/18, 11:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (ls) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Wednesday, April 4, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (888) 273-3658 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Access Code: 9138830# (mr)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Non-Parties Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Bree Anderson at BAnderson@FoxRothschild.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Whitehead, Henry) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Emma Shippy at eshippy@gsblaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS)TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Telephonic conference held on March 7, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. The Court sets a further telephonic conference regarding discovery issues for April 4, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. If the parties agree that an additional conference becomes unnecessary, the parties shall notify the Courtroom Deputy. The parties agreed to the following schedule: 1) Defendants' further responses to Plaintiff's request for metadata and native documents relating to financial records due by March 8, 2018. 2) All revised privilege logs due by March 9, 2018 3) Mr. Burrows' text messages shall be produced by March 16, 2018. 4) Ms. Gallagher's text messages shall be produced by March 23, 2018. 5) Parties shall meet and confer to set dates for production of remaining text messages. Meet and confer shall take place as soon as possible. The parties shall use their best efforts to produce all remaining, responsive and available text messages no later than March 30, 2018. Court Recorder: XTR 3/07/18. (mr)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Wednesday, March 7, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (888) 273-3658 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Access Code: 9138830# (mr)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference Re Discovery held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Telephonic conference held on February 26, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. The Court sets a further telephonic conference regarding discovery issues for March 7, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will follow up with the parties to discuss: 1) Defendant's search and production of responsive emails by use of domain names and other potential email addresses; 2) Defendant's search and potential production of responsive text messages; 3) revisions to Defendant's privilege log; and 4) Defendant's further response to Plaintiff's request for metadata from previously produced financial documents or production of financial documents in native format. Court Recorder: XTR 2/26/18. (mr)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Monday, February 26, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (888) 273-3658 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Access Code: 9138830# (mr)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REFUND OF $325.00 made payable on 02/22/2018 to Fox Rothschild LLP for payment made on 01/18/2018 Re: REQUEST for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Gotaskie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, Aroma Fresh, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 126 . (rdj)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/30/18, 2:00 p.m. re Transcript 136 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/30/18, 2:00 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2018. (ls) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/23/18, 2:00 p.m. re Transcript 134 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/23/18, 2:00 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2018. (ls) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Telephonic conference held on January 30, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The Court sets a further hearing for February 26, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Court Recorder: XTR 1/30/18. (mr) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Non-Parties Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Bree Anderson at BAnderson@FoxRothschild.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Whitehead, Henry) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Emma Shippy at eshippy@gsblaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Non-Parties Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Bree Anderson at BAnderson@FoxRothschild.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Whitehead, Henry) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER Uni-Splendor Corp. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Emma Shippy at eshippy@gsblaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Tuesday, January 30, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (888) 273-3658 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Access Code: 9138830# (mr)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Telephone Conference RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Telephonic conference held on January 23, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Court Recorder: XTR 1/23/18. (mr) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Gotaskie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, Aroma Fresh, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21120141) 124 filed by Third Parties Aroma Fresh, LLC, Bruce Burrows, Fresh Water, LLC, Remington, Inc.. (Whitehead, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 124 Non-Resident Attorney John R. Gotaskie APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of third parties Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, and Aroma Fresh, LLC, designating Henry L. Whitehead as local counsel. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Gotaskie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Miscellaneous Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, Aroma Fresh, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21120141) filed by Thir d Parties Bruce Burrows, Remington, Inc., Fresh Water, LLC, Aroma Fresh, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party Bruce Burrows(pty:misc), Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party Remington, Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party Fresh Water, LLC(pty:misc), Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party Aroma Fresh, LLC(pty:misc)) (Whitehead, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING TIME FOR TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court reschedules the telephonic conference from 3:00 p.m. to 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, January 23, 2018. (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Tuesday, January 23, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (888) 273-3658 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Access Code: 9138830#. (mz)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Remington Designs, LLC filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order, 106 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/25/2017. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, phone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2018. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Based on the Declaration of Mr. Hagen, and his statements during the October 25, 2017 status conference, the Court concludes that Remington has abandoned both its defense and Counterclaim in this matter. As a result of this abandonment, the Court dismisses Remington's Counterclaim with prejudice and strikes Remington's Answer to the First Amended Complaint. Because the Court, on July 27, 2017, previously concluded that Uni-Splendor was entitled to partial summary judgment as to liability on its claims against Remington (Docket No. 61), the Court concludes that Uni-Splendor is now entitled to a Judgment in this action. The Court will therefore enter a Judgment consistent with this Minute Order, its Minute Order from the October 25, 2017 status conference, and the Court's July 27, 2017 Minute Order granting in part Uni-Splendors Motion for Summary Judgment. (See document for details) (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of Uni-Splendor Corp. against Remington Designs, LLC in the principal amount of $20,744,484.23, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $20,744,484.23. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT REPORT of Remington Designs, LLC's Members and Their Citizenship filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.to Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 112, Notice of Lodging 110 to Defendant's Objections to Proposed Judgment (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant/Counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Reece Holland at Rholland@greenbass.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Felton, James) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. By no later than November 6, 2017, the parties shall file a Joint Report that adequately identifies each of the members of Remington Designs, LLC and their citizenship. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Judgment 106 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE List of Remington Designs, LLC's Members And Their Citizenship filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Status Conference, 109 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson: David S. Hagen, the assignee of defendant Remington Designs, LLC, is also present. Mr. Hagen confirms his authority and direction to counsel that Remington will no longer defend or prosecute its counterclaim. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Judgment 106 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Judgment 106 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Judgment filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of James R. Felton re Declaration 102 Re: Interim Status Conference filed by Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION Remington Designs, LLC's Response to Unopposed Request by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. for Rule 16 Interim Status Conference filed by Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: Miscellaneous Document 101 . The Court sets a status conference for Wednesday, October 25, 2017, at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 9A. David S. Hagen is ordered to appear at the status conference. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken re Miscellaneous Document 101 relating to Request for Rule 16 Conference filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Request filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. for Rule 16 Interim Status Conference (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: 89 MOTION for Leave to File. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for October 16, 2017, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Because Uni-Splendor did not diligently seek to amend its allegations to add the promissory fraud claim and Burrows as a defendant, Uni-Splendor has not satisfied its burden to modify the Civil Trial Scheduling Order as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). As a result, the Court concludes that Uni-Splendor has not satisfied the "good cause" standard under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court therefore denies Uni-Splendor's Motion to Amend. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.1, documents filed electronically must be submitted in Portable Document Format ("PDF"), created using word-processing software, and published to PDF from the original word-processing file to permit the electronic version of the document to be searched. Other than signature pages, PDF IMAGES CREATED BY SCANNING PAPER DOCUMENTS ARE PROHIBITED. Violation of Local Rule 5-4.3.1 may result in the striking of the offending document and the imposition of monetary or other sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 37 (Dkt. Nos. 81, 88 ) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The Court, having considered Uni Splendor's Statement of Attorney Fees and Costs and the Supporting Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken, and pursuant to this Court's September 5, 2017 Order (Doc. No. 81 ), finds that $14,899.75 in attorney fees are reasonable and were necessitated by Remington's refusal to produce discovery, and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Remington Designs, LLC, pay $14,899.75 to Uni-Splendor in attorney's fees and costs within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order. (See document for further details). (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 89 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: On September 22, 2017, the Court held an informal discovery conference. Court Recorder: XTR 9/22/17. (mr) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition and Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Bruce Burrows in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 89 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Friday, September 22, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 1114# User Password: 2505# (mr) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Greenberg & Bass to Withdraw as Attorney 90 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Counsel failed to comply with Local Rule 7-3. (cr) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Greenberg & Bass to Withdraw as Attorney 90 . The following error(s) was/were found: Motion does not contain the statement required by Local Rule 7-3 that Plaintiff contacted opposing counsel to discuss the Motions at least seven days prior to the filing of the Motions. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (kss) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of David S. Hagen in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Greenberg & Bass to Withdraw as Attorney 90 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Felton, James) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF 09/18/2017** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Greenberg & Bass to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendant and counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Felton, James) Modified on 9/21/2017 (cr). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order filed by plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken In Support of Fees and Costs MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 66 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 82 The document is stricken. Please see L.R. 6-1 Notice and Service of Motion by Judge Percy Anderson. (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 82 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): hearing date is untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Patrick J. Conti in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 82 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 82 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order 82 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Modify Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 9/11/2017 (yl). (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING UNI-SPLENDOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR RULE 37 SANCTIONS [Dkt. No. 66 ] by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Uni-Splendor's Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Remington shall produce supplemental responses and documents as required by this Order within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Uni-Splendor's declaration in support of the request for sanctions is due by Monday, September 11, 2017. Remington's Opposition, if any, is due within seven days after service of the declaration. (See document for further details). (mr) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal re Stipulation for Protective Order 73 . See document for details. (mr) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/18/2017; 8/22/2017 re Transcript 77, 78 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/22/2017; 11:31 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (at) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/18/2017; 3:00 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (at) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Status conference regarding discovery issues held on August 22, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. Further status conference, along with motion to compel, is set for Tuesday, September 5, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 590 located at the Roybal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles 90012. Court Recorder: XTR 8/22/17. (mr) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 66 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Conti, Patrick) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Consideration of Stipulation to Remington Designs, LLC's Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Portions of its First and Second Counterclaims for Relief and its Affirmative Defenses; and the Entirety of Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh and Eighth Counterclaims for Relief filed by defendant and counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC.(Felton, James) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant and counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC.(Felton, James) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING MATTER FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Tuesday, August 22, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-8506 and using the access code listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Code (Please follow the prompts and enter the code below): Conference Password: 126058# (mr) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Status conference held on August 18, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. Further telephonic status conference is set for Tuesday, August 22, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. A separate Order will issue with dial-in instructions. Court Recorder: XTR 8/18/17. (mr) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Conference on Friday, August 18, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel will call into the conference by calling (213) 894-0800 and using the access codes listed below. Telephonic Conference Access Codes (Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below): Meeting ID: 7002# User Password: 5300# (mr) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 66 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 66 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories 66 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING UNI-SPLENDOR'S MOTION TO STRIKE REMINGTON DESIGNS' PATENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS [Dkt. No. 55 ] by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Uni-Splendor's Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Remington's Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is STRICKEN WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (See document for further details). (mr) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer J Shih counsel for Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. Adding Jennifer Shih as counsel of record for Uni-Splendor Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attorney Jennifer J Shih added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer J Shih added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:cd))(Shih, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER Counterclaim, 14 filed by counter-defendant Uni-Splendor Corp. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: 30 for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Uni-Splendors Motion for Leave to Amend. The Clerk is ordered to file the Amended Answer to Counterclaim attached as Exhibit A to Docket No. 39. The Court grants partial summary judgment in favor of Uni-Splendor on the issue of liability for breach of contract. The Court concludes, however, that material disputed facts exist concerning the amount of damages Uni-Splendor may be able to recover on its breach of contract and quantum meruit claims. Uni-Splendor's Motion for Summary Judgment on its First Amended Complaint is therefore granted in part and denied in part. The Court also denies Uni-Splendor's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Remington's Counterclaim. (See document for additional details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order 39 currently set for hearing on July 31, 2017 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Stipulated Motion to Strike re Joint MOTION to Strike Disclosure 29 Amended Infringement Contentions 55 filed by plaintiff and counterdefendant Uni-Splendor Corp. (Van Loben Sels, John) Modified on 8/1/2017 (mr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney John D Van Loben Sels counsel for Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. Changing firm name to Fish IP Law, LLP. Filed by plaintiff and counterdefendant Uni-Splendor Corp. (Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:cd))(Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 53 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James R. Felton substituted in place of attorney Allan Bruce Cooper for defendant and counter-claimant Remington Designs, LLC. Attorney Allan Bruce Cooper terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Initial DISCLOSURE of Invalidity Contentions filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Strike Disclosure 29 Amended Infringement Contentions filed by plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Motion, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A-D, # 4 Proposed Order)(Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document, 50 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Requests > Substitute Attorney (G-01). (mrgo) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY James R. Felton in place of attorney Allan Bruce Cooper filed by defendant and counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney) (Attorney James Richard Felton added to party Remington Designs, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney James Richard Felton added to party Remington Designs, LLC(pty:dft)) (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER 30 by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court are a Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 30) and a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Docket No. 34) filed by plaintiff and counter-defendant Uni-Splendor Corporation ("Uni-Splendor"). Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for July 17, 2017, is vacated, and the matters taken off calendar. The Court takes the Motions under submission. The Court will notify the parties once it has issued a ruling on the Motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, 50 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry.Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Requests > Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [DOCUMENT ORDER STRICKEN PER DOC.NO. 54] Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel and (Proposed) Order filed by Defendant Remington Designs, LLC re: Miscellaneous Document 38 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Felton, James) Modified on 7/7/2017 (mrgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document 38 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. A proposed order (Form G-01 Order) is missing. Per Local Rule 5-4.4, "the proposed order or other proposed document shall be in PDF format and included, as an attachment, to the main electronically filed document (e.g., stipulations, applications, motions)." Or "electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging." Counsel is instructed to submit a proposed order by no later than July 6, 2017. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Under Rule 12(c) 34 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, 35 re Remington Designs, LLC's Evidence Submitted in Opposition to Uni-Splendor's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp. to Statement (Motion related), 36, Statement (Motion related), 31 re Uncontroverted Facts and Response to Remington Designs, LLC's Statement of Genuine Disputes (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Win Yang in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 and in Support of Reply 44 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 38 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. The correct event is: Request > Substitute Attorney (G-01). proposed order (FormG-01 Order) is missing. Per Local Rule 5-4.4, "the proposed order or other proposed document shall be in PDF format and included, as an attachment, to the main electronically filed document (e.g., stipulations, applications, motions)." Or "electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging." In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cr) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Answer to Counterclaim 17, Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 20 39 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Bricken in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Answer to Counterclaim 17, Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 20 39 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Answer to Counterclaim 17, Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 20 39 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Answer to Counterclaim 17, Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 20 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant Remington Designs, LLC (Felton, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(c); DECLARATION OF ALLAN B. COOPER IN SUPPORT THEREOF OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Under Rule 12(c) 34 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Cooper, Allan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Cooper, Allan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Remington Designs, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declarations of Bruce Burrows, John Essig, Matthew Houston, Kevin Spence, and Allan B. Cooper In Support of Opposition to Uni-Splendor Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Cooper, Allan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Pleadings Under Rule 12(c) filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum For Partial Judgment On The Pleadings Under Rule 12 (c), # 2 Proposed Order) (Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:pla)) (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Patrick J. Conti in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Attorney Patrick J Conti added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Conti added to party Uni-Splendor Corp.(pty:cd))(Conti, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Win Yang in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims 30 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to in favor of Plaintiff's contract claim and against all counterclaims filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff) (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions re Disclosure 23 filed by Defendant Remington Designs, LLC (Cooper, Allan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING PRE-TRIAL DATES FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Continue, 27 : Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and good cause being shown thereby, it is hereby ORDERED that the pre-trial dates as to the patent infringement counterclaim are extended as follows: June 9, 2017: Disclosure of Amended Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions; July 7, 2017: Invalidity Contentions; July 24, 2017: Exchange expert reports on Claims Construction; August 3, 2017: Meet and confer on Joint Claims Construction Statement; August 21, 2017: Opening briefs Claims Construction; September 4, 2017: Responsive briefs; September 11, 2017: Reply brief by Remington; September 11, 2017: Amended Final Joint Claims Construction Statement (bm) Modified on 6/6/2017 (bm). (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Dates for Patent Infringement Counterclaim from 9 dates to 9 dates Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, 19 filed by Plaintiff Counterdefendant Uni-Splendor Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Pre-Trial Dates for Patent Infringement Counterclaim)(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Continue, 24 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Signature page of stipulation is not dated by either party. (shb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue, 24 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Signature page of stipulation is not dated by either party. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER G-112B E-FILED 6/2/2017 - Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Dates from 9 dates to 9 dates Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,Terminate Hearings, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 19 filed by Plaintiff Counter-defendant Uni-Splendor Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Pre-Trial Dates for Patent Infringement Counterclaim)(Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 6/2/2017 (shb). (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE of Asserted Claims and Contentions Remington Designs, LLC's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Counter Claimant Remington Designs, LLC, Defendant Remington Designs, LLC (Cooper, Allan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing 21 . Document 21 was incorrectly filed with this case with the wrong case number. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Discovery cut-off is 11/20/2017. Motions cut-off is 11/27/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. See order for further details. (jy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for April 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates: (Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2017. Discovery cut-off 11/20/2017. Exhibit List due by 12/22/2017. Witness List due by 12/22/2017. Motions due by 11/27/2017. Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/5/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2017. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/4/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Motions in limine set for hearing on 1/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp., Counter Defendant Uni-Splendor Corp... (Bricken, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, 14 filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp..(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant / Counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC, (Cooper, Allan) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 12, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant / Counterclaimant Remington Designs, LLC.(Attorney Allan Bruce Cooper added to party Remington Designs, LLC(pty:dft))(Cooper, Allan) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.. upon Remington Designs, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/22/2016, answer due 2/21/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Allan Cooper. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1, filed by Plaintiff Uni-Splendor Corp.(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than January 4, 2017. The failure to file a First Amended Complaint by that date or to adequately allege the Court's jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 5, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 3, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 4, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 2 . The following error(s) was found: docket items 2 through 5 were all filed under the incorrect event category. The Clerk has modified these docket items to reflect the correct title of the documents. The Civil Cover Sheet Event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Request for Summons is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. Certificate of Interested parties is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. Corporate Disclosure Statement is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Remington Designs, LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/16/2016, receipt number 19070783), filed by Plaintiff Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company.(Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 12/19/2016 (car). (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/16/2016, receipt number 19070783), filed by Plaintiff Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company.(Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 12/19/2016 (car). (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR SUMMONS FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/16/2016, receipt number 19070783), filed by Plaintiff Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company.(Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 12/19/2016 (car). (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/16/2016, receipt number 19070783), filed by Plaintiff Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company.(Bricken, Kathleen) Modified on 12/19/2016 (car). (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19070783 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Kathleen Carroll Bricken added to party Uni-Spelndor Corp., a Taiwanese company(pty:pla))(Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 838 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?