USA v. Wedl
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-mj-71586

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 4:41 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Monte Michael Wedl, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Brian A Newman +1 310 316 6622 +1 310 316 5511 jjnewbee@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josh Alan Cohen +1 415 749 1800 +1 415 749 1694 jcohen@clarencedyer.com
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Warrant Returned Executed on 12/6/16. as to Monte Michael Wedl. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Josh Alan Cohen appearing for Monte Michael Wedl (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 12/13/2016) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document as to Monte Michael Wedl (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Appearance as to Monte Michael Wedl held on 12/6/2016, Added attorney Brian Allen Newman for Monte Michael Wedl. Arraignment set for 12/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Bond Hearing set for 12/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Preliminary Examination set for 12/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Government request to unseal entire case granted.FTR Time 10:43-10:55. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond Entered as to Monte Michael Wedl unsecured, $10,000.00. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/6/16. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Order to Seal Case as to Monte Michael Wedl. Copy of the complaint and arrest warrant shall be provided to FBI and employees of U.S. Attorney's Office, and complaint and arrest warrant may be disclosed to federal agents and other law enforcement officer in order to effectuate arrest of defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/5/16. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016) Modified on 12/6/2016 (tlhS, COURT STAFF). (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT as to Monte Michael Wedl (1). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016) (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1,652 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?