Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Izalco Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-03696

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 12, 2019 at 4:54 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Appendix
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Appendix
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Expert Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Designation of Expert Witness List
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Strike
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Other Notice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Advisory
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Substitute
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM - Miller
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?