USA v. Nordlicht et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cr-00640-BMC

Tags
Last Updated January 9, 2021 at 11:35 PM ST (3.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Nordlicht, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shriram Harid +1 212 698 3867 shriramharid@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Levander +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3500 andrew.levander@dechert.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (1048) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021, Terminated: 1/7/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Daniel Small. (Papapetrou, Christos)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
    ORDER granting [847] release of passport for renewal as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/7/2021. (Clarke, Melonie)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 letter
      Letter by the government, on consent of the defendant, dated January 5, 2021, requesting adjournment of status conference as to Daniel Small (Elbert, Lauren)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Order
        ORDER as to Daniel Small re [846]. Status Conference control date reset for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act through 3/24/2021 for appeal decision and previous complex case designation. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/5/2021. (Clarke, Melonie)
          LREF
          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
          Attorney update in case as to Daniel Small re [844,845]. Attorney Deborah Jane Cooper and Dylan Alexander Stern terminated. (Clarke, Melonie)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice - other
            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Deborah Jane Cooper as to Daniel Small (Papapetrou, Christos)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice - other
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Dylan A. Stern as to Daniel Small (Papapetrou, Christos)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [842] Motion to Dismiss as to Joseph Mann (5). The Indictment is dismissed with prejudice as to the defendant JOSEPH MANN. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/23/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020, Terminated: 11/23/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                  Letter MOTION to Dismiss Indictment as to Joseph Mann, upon completion of deferral period by USA as to Joseph Mann. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Elbert, Lauren)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                    ORDER granting [841] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mark Nordlicht. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020, Terminated: 9/23/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                      Consent MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Mark Nordlicht. (Koffmann, Daniel)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 letter
                        Letter Requesting Adjournment of September 15, 2020 Status Conference as to Daniel Small (Hein, Patrick)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                          RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Daniel Small re [840]. Status Conference control date reset for 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act through 1/7/2021 for appeal and previous complex case designation. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/14/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on May 31, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgette K. Betts, Telephone number 718.804.2777. Email address: Georgette_Betts@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2020. (Betts, Georgette)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on May 30, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgette K. Betts, Telephone number 718.804.2777. Email address: Georgette_Betts@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2020. (Betts, Georgette)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on May 29, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgette K. Betts, Telephone number 718.804.2777. Email address: Georgette_Betts@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2020. (Betts, Georgette)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on May 28, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgette K. Betts, Telephone number 718.804.2777. Email address: Georgette_Betts@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2020. (Betts, Georgette)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on May 2, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgette K. Betts, Telephone number 718.804.2777. Email address: Georgette_Betts@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2020. (Betts, Georgette)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                      ORDER granting [834] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Joseph Mann. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/4/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020, Terminated: 2/5/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                        Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Joseph Mann. (Fischer, Benjamin)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020, Terminated: 2/4/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                          Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit travel by Mark Nordlicht. (Koffmann, Daniel)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                            ORDER granting [833] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mark Nordlicht. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/4/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                              ORDER dated 1/28/20 granting [831] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jeffrey Shulse (7). Time in the case against defendant Shulse under the Speedy Trial Act shall be excluded pursuant to the parties' joint request until 1/24/22. The Court finds that the ends of justice outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial and that should defendant remain compliant with his terms of release, the case will be dismissed and substantial private and public resources will be saved. In addition, the terms of defendant's Order of Release [62] as previously modified are further modified so as to consist of those set forth above in subparagraph numbers 1) through 6). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/28/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020, Terminated: 1/28/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release and to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Jeffrey Shulse. (Pitluck, David)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                  CONSENT ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL dated 1/10/20 re:granting [829] Motion to Substitute Attorney. William Anthony Burck,Daniel Rickert Koffmann for Mark Nordlicht replacing Ronald S. Sullivan; Jose A. Baez and Duncan Patrick Levin. as to Mark Nordlicht (1). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2020 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020, Terminated: 1/10/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                      Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit travel by Mark Nordlicht. (Koffmann, Daniel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                        ORDER granting [828] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for travel as to Mark Nordlicht. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jeffrey Shulse. Status Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/8/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference as to Daniel Small held on 1/8/2020 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. The trial scheduled for 2/18/2020 is adjourned without a date in light of the Government's appeal. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act through 9/15/2020 for complex case designation. A Status Conference control date is set for 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Stacy Mace.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on June 27, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on June 26, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on June 25, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on June 24, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on April 30, 2019, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Parisi, Telephone number 718-613-2605. Email address: deniseparisi72@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2020. (Parisi, Denise)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020, Terminated: 1/2/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                        Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit travel by Mark Nordlicht. (Koffmann, Daniel)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Rickert Koffmann appearing for Mark Nordlicht (Koffmann, Daniel)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Anthony Burck appearing for Mark Nordlicht (Burck, William)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                              ORDER granting [822] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mark Nordlicht for travel to CA from January 7 to January 10, 2020 to attend business meetings. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/2/2020. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Daniel Small re [819] Letter. Status Conference reset to 1/8/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act from 12/5/2019 through 1/8/2020 for complex case designation. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/4/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 letter
                                                                                  Letter Requesting Adjournment of Dec. 5, 2019 Status Conference as to Daniel Small (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 letter
                                                                                    Letter Travel Request as to Mark Nordlicht (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                      ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht re [818]. Request to permit travel to California between October 28, 2019 and October 30, 2019. Application Granted. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/23/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                        ORDER denying [817] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mark Nordlicht. As long as a future trial is contemplated, Pretrial Services, the Government, and the Court need to be kept informed of defendant's travel and the reasons therefor. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/22/2019. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: When filing motions in a multi-defendant case, the parties are directed to only select the defendants the motion pertains to. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Mark Nordlicht as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                            ORDER granting [816] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release to allow travel within the continental United States without prior Court approval as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/17/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 10/17/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                              Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to allow travel within the continental United States without prior Court approval by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                Letter requesting conditions of release be modified to allow travel within the continental United States without prior Court approval as to Jeffrey Shulse (Reynal, Federico)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order Modifying Conditions or Term of Supervision
                                                                                                  ORDER as to Jeffrey Shulse re [815]. The Conditions or Term of Supervision are modified to allow travel within the continental United States without prior Court approval. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/10/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Daniel Small re [814]. Jury Selection is rescheduled for 2/18/2020 before a Magistrate Judge with trial to follow before Judge Cogan in Courtroom 8D South. A Pretrial Conference is set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act through 12/5/2019 based on complex case. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 letter
                                                                                                      Letter submitted by the government, with the consent of Defendant Daniel Small, requesting that trial be adjourned as to Daniel Small (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on May 9, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number 7186132609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on May 8, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number 7186132609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on May 7, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number 7186132609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht held on May 6, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number 7186132609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on May 6, 2019, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number 7186132609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Roy, David)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully responding to the government's letter of October 7, 2019 (Dkt. No. 807), opposing Mr. Levy's request that his bail be exonerated in light of his acquittal as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                      Letter in Opposition to David Levy's Request to Exonerate his Bond as to David Levy (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by USA as to Mark Nordlicht re [799] Order on Motion to Inspect,, Order on Motion for Acquittal,, Order on Motion for New Trial,. Appeal Record due by 10/18/2019. (James, David)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to David Levy re [800] Order on Motion for Acquittal,, Order on Motion for New Trial, [801] Judgment Appeal Record due by 10/18/2019. (James, David)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse re [800] Order on Motion for Acquittal,, Order on Motion for New Trial,. Appeal Record due by 10/18/2019. (James, David)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse re [800] Order on Motion for Acquittal,, Order on Motion for New Trial, [801] Judgment Appeal Record due by 10/18/2019. (James, David)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                NOTICE REGARDING APPEALS of 10/4/19 - as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. Attorney AUSA David James contacted and advised to re-file [803} Notice of Appeal and [804] Interlocutory Notice of Appeal as it pertains to a particular Defendant. Also contacted USCA and requested that these entries be disregarded as new filings are forthcoming. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 10/04/2019) (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Mark Nordlicht sent to US Court of Appeals [806] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                    Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to David Levy sent to US Court of Appeals [805] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to David Levy re [802] Letter. The Government is direct to respond by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/2/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re exoneration of Mr. Levy's bond/bail and release of passport as to David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT as to David Levy (2), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/1/2019. (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Order on Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Levys [785] motion for acquittal is granted and his motion for a new trial is conditionally granted. The [782] motion to inspect grand jury minutes is denied as moot.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2019. (Marziliano, August) Modified on 9/30/2019 (Marziliano, August).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Order on Motion to InspectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER : ; denying [782] Motion to Inspect as to Mark Nordlicht (1); denying [786] Motion for Acquittal as to Mark Nordlicht (1); granting [786] Motion for New Trial as to Mark Nordlicht (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2019. (Marziliano, August) Modified on 9/30/2019 (Marziliano, August).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER. By 9/25/2019, the Government shall deliver to Chambers electronic versions of the following Government exhibits: GX 266, 271, 476, 536, 552, 582, 608, 615, 625, 635, 649, 659, 682, 689, 692, 693, 695, 699, 720, 727, 728, 730, 731, 752, 754, 760, 761, 764, 773, 774, 830, 879, 1796, 1797, 1895, 1897, 1904, 2203, 4742, 8406, 8526, 9507, and 9510. Also by 9/25/2019, defendants Nordlicht or Levy shall deliver to Chambers an electronic version of DX 2102-B. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/23/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-22-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-17-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-16-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-15-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-14-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5-1-19, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 10/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Nardone, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan regarding oral argument on motion for acquittal (Dkt. No. 785) as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [785] MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial DEFENDANT DAVID LEVY'S POST TRIAL MOTIONS (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019, Terminated: 9/12/2019 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MARK NORDLICHT'S MOTION FOR A JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL OR A NEW TRIAL by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Terminate Motions (filed in error)
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion [790] terminated as to Mark Nordlicht. This is a reply brief, not a motion. Do not re-file. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo held on April 29, 2019, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Parisi, Telephone number 718-613-2605. Email address: deniseparisi72@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2019. (Parisi, Denise)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [788] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to David Levy. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/22/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019, Terminated: 8/22/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File defendants' memoranda in reply to the government's opposition brief, Dkt. 787 by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [785] MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial DEFENDANT DAVID LEVY'S POST TRIAL MOTIONS, [786] MOTION for Acquittal MOTION for New Trial (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019, Terminated: 9/27/2019 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Acquittal , MOTION for New Trial by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support) (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019, Terminated: 9/27/2019 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Acquittal , MOTION for New Trial DEFENDANT DAVID LEVY'S POST TRIAL MOTIONS by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter in Opposition to David Levy and Mark Nordlicht's Request to Review Grand Jury Minutes as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter submitted jointly by the parties, requesting rescheduling of trial as to Daniel Small (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Daniel Small re [783]. Jury Selection before a Magistrate Judge is reset for 11/12/2019 at 9:30 AM with trial to commence on 11/14/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Cogan in Courtroom 8D South. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/26/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019, Terminated: 9/27/2019 Motion to Inspect
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Inspect Letter motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan, joining Mr. Levy's application (Docket No. 780) seeking access to the grand jury minutes regarding the alleged Black Elk Bond scheme by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [781] Motion to Travel as to Mark Nordlicht (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/25/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019, Terminated: 7/25/2019 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Travel Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan seeking permission to modify the conditions of bail to permit Mr. Nordlicht to travel August 1-August 8, 2019 by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting access to the grand jury minutes regarding the alleged Black Elk bond scheme as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to David Levy re [780]. The Government is directed to respond by 7/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/24/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jeffrey Shulse. Jury Selection before a Magistrate Judge is set for 2/3/2020 at 9:30 AM with trial to follow before Judge Brian M. Cogan in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/24/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER as to Daniel Small. Jury Selection before a Magistrate Judge is set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM with trial to commence on 12/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Brian M. Cogan in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/24/2019. (Clarke, Melonie) Modified to reflect trial start date.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter stating the parties' positions on trial scheduling as to Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting the Court's clarification regarding the upcoming trial as to Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Daniel Small and Jeffrey Shulse re [778]. The Court had previously severed these cases and so has assumed two trials. If the Government believes that the Nordlicht trial has sufficiently alleviated the concerns that led to the severance, it may move for consolidation based on changed circumstances. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/19/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [777] Motion to Travel as to Mark Nordlicht. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/12/2019. (Kutoroff, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019, Terminated: 7/12/2019 Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Travel Letter motion to Judge Cogan respectfully requesting a modification to Mr. Nordlicht's bail conditions to allow him to travel to Honesdale, Pennsylvania for his sons camp visit this Sunday, July 14, 2019 by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL as to Joseph Sanfilippo (4). Acquitted on Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. The defendant was found not guilty by a jury of all counts on 7/9/2019. It is ordered that the defendant is acquitted, discharged, and any bond exonerated. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/10/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY VERDICT as to Joseph Sanfilippo (4) Not Guilty on Counts 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT as to David Levy (2) Not Guilty on Counts 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. Guilty on Counts 6, 7 and 8. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JURY VERDICT as to Mark Nordlicht (1) Not Guilty on Counts 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. Guilty on Counts 6, 7 and 8. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Daniel Small and Jeffrey Shulse. The Government and defendants Schulse and Small are directed to confer and advise the Court by 7/23/2019 of their positions regarding the scheduling of their trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order of Sustenance/Lodging/Transportation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order of Sustenance as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo. It is hereby ordered that the Marshal supply proper sustenance to the Sixteen (16) jurors empaneled in the above entitled action from 7/8/2019 through 7/9/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 7/9/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations concluded. Defendant Nordlicht and Defendant Levy found not guilty on counts 1 through 5 and found guilty on counts 6 through 8. Defendant Sanfilippo found not guilty on counts 1 through 5. Jurors polled and excused. Post trial briefing schedule: Defense renewed Rule 29 motion and Rule 33 motion are due by 7/30/2019; the Government's opposition is due by 8/20/2019; the reply is due by 8/30/2019. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Jeffrey Shulse. (Rody, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [772] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for travel as to Jeffrey Shulse. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 7/8/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations will continue to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [771] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order of Sustenance/Lodging/Transportation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order of Sustenance as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo. It is hereby ordered that the Marshal supply proper sustenance to the Sixteen (16) jurors empaneled in the above entitled action from 7/1/2019 through 7/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/3/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 7/3/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations will continue on 7/8/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 7/2/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations will continue to 7/3/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 Response In OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [769] MOTION in Limine Letter Motion to Judge Cogan Requesting Additional Curative Instructions Based on Factual Errors in the Government's Rebuttal Argument (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 7/1/2019. Jury charged; deliberations began and will continue 7/2/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The Government's [765] request for a jury instruction that the Government is not on trial is denied as the jury instructions already instruct the jury on what it may and may not consider in reaching a verdict. Defendant Nordlicht's [769] motion in limine requesting additional instructions is denied as unnecessary in light of counsel's role in eliciting factual discrepancies and the jury's role as the adjudicator of factual determinations. Defendant Levy's [767] motion for a mistrial is denied because the instructions tell the jury that they must consider the evidence as to each defendant individually, and Levy's request for additional revisions to the instructions is denied because the Government's "conduct" as it is used in the identified charge means the lawyers' personal conduct and not their presentation of the evidence, and the jury instructions inform the jury that they must hold the Government to its burden of proof as to every charge and every defendant. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/1/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 6/30/2019, Entered: 6/30/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Letter Motion to Judge Cogan Requesting Additional Curative Instructions Based on Factual Errors in the Government's Rebuttal Argument by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 6/30/2019, Entered: 6/30/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re opposition to Government's letter Dkt. 765 as to Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 6/30/2019, Entered: 6/30/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re opposition to Government's letter Dkt. 765 as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 6/30/2019, Entered: 6/30/2019, Terminated: 7/2/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Letter to Judge Cogan in Opposition to the Government's Request for a Jury Charge That the Government is Not on Trial by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Requesting Jury Instruction Re: Government Is Not On Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: [765] letter. Any opposition to this letter is due at 5 PM on 6/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/28/2019. (Kutoroff, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/28/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Closing Arguments by Defense for (Levy) and (Sanfilippo). Government's rebuttal. Jury Trial continued to 7/1/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/27/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Closing Arguments by Defense for (Nordlicht) and (Levy). Jury Trial continued to 6/28/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/26/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Closing Arguments by Government and Defense for (Nordlicht). Jury Trial continued to 6/27/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 6/25/19 that this order resolves certain motions re: [751] Motion for Hearing as to Mark Nordlicht (1); [757] Motion for Hearing as to Mark Nordlicht (1) DENIED. [718] Motion in Limine as to Mark Nordlicht (1) DENIED. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/25/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/25/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Charging conference held. The Court denied Defendants' renewed motion for an acquittal under Rule 29 for reasons stated on the record. Closing arguments held by the Government. Jury Trial continued to 6/26/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Submitting Proposed Limiting Instruction Regarding Auditor Workpapers as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/24/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Defense for (Nordlicht and Sanfilippo) rests. Charging conference set for 6/25/2019 at 9:30 AM with Jury Trial to continue at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 6/23/2019, Entered: 6/23/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re reply in further support of Dkt. 749 & in opposition to Government's 6/21/2019 letter Dkt. 759 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/23/2019, Entered: 6/23/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter responding to Defendants' request to strike exhibits and testimony (ECF Docket No. 758) as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter responding to defendants' motions regarding venue and attorney-client privilege, pursuant to Court's 6/17/19 Order (ECF Docket No. 752) as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E) (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re Court's 6/17/2019 Order, Dkt. 752 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Proposed transcript strikes - Salfati, # (2) Proposed transcript strikes - Weiner) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019, Terminated: 6/25/2019 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing Mark Nordlicht's Reply Brief in Further Support of His Motion for a Franks Hearing by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan in response to Government's 6/19/2019 letter, Dkt. 754 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [751] MOTION for Hearing Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan in Support of Defendant Mark Nordlicht's Request for a Franks Hearing (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Respectfully Moving Final Government Exhibits Into Evidence as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: 6/18/2019 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form by David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Requests to Charge) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 6/15/19 re: various motions. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019, Terminated: 6/25/2019 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan in Support of Defendant Mark Nordlicht's Request for a Franks Hearing by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht re [751]. The Government is directed to respond by 6/19/2019; defense to reply by 6/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/14/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [750] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/14/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019, Terminated: 6/14/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [736] Motion to Quash as unopposed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/13/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re: reply to Dkt 741 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/11/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Defense for (Nordlicht) rests. Jury Trial continued to 6/24/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019, Terminated: 6/17/2019 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Acquittal by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibit 1-1: Selected Exhibits, # (2) Appendix Exhibit 1-2: Selected Exhibits, # (3) Appendix Exhibit 1-3: Selected Exhibits, # (4) Appendix Exhibit 1-4: Selected Exhibits, # (5) Appendix Exhibit 1-5: Selected Exhibits, # (6) Appendix Exhibit 1-6: Selected Exhibits, # (7) Appendix Exhibit 1-7: Selected Exhibits, # (8) Appendix Exhibit 1-8: Selected Exhibits, # (9) Appendix Exhibit 1-9: Selected Exhibits, # (10) Appendix Exhibit 1-10: Selected Exhibits, # (11) Appendix Exhibit 1-11: Selected Exhibits) (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in reply to docket number 742 as to Mark Nordlicht (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter in response to ECF Docket No. 743 regarding Government's Final Exhibits as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter in reply to docket number 741 as to Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [742] MOTION for Disclosure of defense witness order and for scheduling the testimony of the case agent (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Disclosure of defense witness order and for scheduling the testimony of the case agent by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by the government in further opposition to the defendants' Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29 Motion as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [742] Motion for Disclosure of defense witness order and for scheduling the testimony of the case agent. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/10/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 6/8/2019, Entered: 6/8/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [718] MOTION in Limine requesting that the Court strike any testimony from Thursday related to Attorney-Client Privilege headings and any emails relating to Echo Therapeutics trades (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Motion to Admit Certain Government Exhibits Agreed Upon By the Parties as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Regarding 3500 Material as to Govt Witness as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [735] Motion in Limine as to Joseph Sanfilippo. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/7/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/7/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. The Government rests, subject to additional documents to be entered. Rule 29 motion hearing held. Decision reserved. Jury Trial continued to 6/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [739] Motion to Admit Certain Government Exhibits Agreed Upon By the Parties. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/7/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019, Terminated: 6/13/2019 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash Non-Party Trial Subpoena by Oliver Jimenez as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Nohavicka, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019, Terminated: 6/7/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION in Limine to admit certain documents under the doctrine of completeness under FRE 106 by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DX-4397, # (2) Exhibit DX-4398, # (3) Exhibit DX-4399, # (4) Exhibit DX-4400) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter opposing exclusion of Agera evidence as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/6/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 6/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/5/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 6/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Regarding Summary Exhibits as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/4/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 6/5/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Defendant Nordlicht's [700] motion to strike a portion of Amir Shaked's testimony is denied and The Government's [709] motion to strike Government Exhibits 889 and 890, and related testimony by witness Naftali Manela, is granted as unopposed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/2/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 6/3/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 6/4/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [726] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for travel to San Diego from June 20-23, 2019 as to Jeffrey Shulse. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/3/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019, Terminated: 6/3/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Jeffrey Shulse. (Mann, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/31/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 6/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [700] MOTION in Limine to strike a portion of Mr. Shaked's testimony (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019, Terminated: 5/30/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration respectfully requesting that the Court reconsider its previous ruling on the admissibility of certain email related to Mr. Mandelbaum's alcohol use by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibit 1) (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/30/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Motion [724] denied for reasons stated on the record. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/31/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019, Terminated: 5/29/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re potential instructions on bankruptcy law as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/29/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/30/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [723] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release to travel on enclosed dates as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/29/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by the government, dated May 28, 2019, enclosing Rule 16 discovery (emails) as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan pursuant to the Court's Order, Dkt. Nos. 704 & 719 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding certain motions; Defendant Levy has moved to preclude testimony from Daniel Mandelbaum about a margin call from Goldman Sachs to Platinum. For the reasons below, this [713] motion is granted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/28/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019, Terminated: 6/25/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine requesting that the Court strike any testimony from Thursday related to Attorney-Client Privilege headings and any emails relating to Echo Therapeutics trades by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/28/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 5/27/2019, Entered: 5/27/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [713] Letter MOTION in Limine requesting that the government be precluded from offering evidence related to Platinums actions surrounding a margin call from Goldman Sachs (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 5/27/2019, Entered: 5/27/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [713] Letter MOTION in Limine requesting that the government be precluded from offering evidence related to Platinums actions surrounding a margin call from Goldman Sachs (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5, # (2) Exhibit 6, # (3) Exhibit 7, # (4) Exhibit 8) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: 5/25/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [713] Letter MOTION in Limine requesting that the government be precluded from offering evidence related to Platinums actions surrounding a margin call from Goldman Sachs (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: 5/25/2019, Terminated: 5/28/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION in Limine requesting that the government be precluded from offering evidence related to Platinums actions surrounding a margin call from Goldman Sachs by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/23/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Stacy Mace.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/22/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/23/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter enclosing declaration of Inspector Amber R. Jordan as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Attachments: # (1) Declaration) (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/21/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/20/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/17/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019, Terminated: 6/3/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Government Exhibits 889 and 890 and related testimony by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by the government, dated May 16, 2019, enclosing supplemental Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter regarding curative instruction and striking relevant portions of trial transcript as to Mark Nordlicht (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan pursuant to the Court's Order, Dkt. No. 704 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/16/2019. All parties present. Jury Trial continued to 5/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/15/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. The Court denied [698] Letter requesting release of the courthouse surveillance video for reasons stated on the record. Jury Trial continued to 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting motion in Limine [699] and [703]. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/13/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/14/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Motion [701] denied as moot on the record. Jury Trial continued to 5/15/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine respectfully asking the Court to preclude the government from offering evidence related to alleged market manipulation in Black Elk bonds by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 5/12/2019, Entered: 5/12/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [699] Letter MOTION in Limine re margin calls (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION in Limine to preclude the Government from eliciting improper testimony from Stephen Flatley by Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [680] letter motion to quash subpoena served on Jon Lindsey as unopposed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 5/9/19 from Jonathan Dienst, WNBC Chief Investigative Reporter re: requesting to join a media request for access to all video(s) reviewed by the Court in connection with a recent bail decision as to Mark Nordlicht. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 6/3/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to strike a portion of Mr. Shaked's testimony by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION in Limine re margin calls by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/8/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 5/6/2019 from members of the press requesting release of the courthouse surveillance video the government submitted as Exhibit A in their motion seeking to revoke bail as to Mark Nordlicht. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of Release as to Mark Nordlicht. The previous order setting conditions of release and bond is reinstated. I hereby order the defendant released from custody of the United States Marshal Service. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/7/2019. PTS notified. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [694] Letter MOTION to Strike re J. Bruno (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019, Terminated: 5/7/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION to Strike re J. Bruno by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht re [698] Letter from the press. The parties are directed to respond by 5/13/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/7/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/7/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Motion [694] granted as stated on the record. Jury Trial continued to 5/8/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019, Terminated: 5/6/2019 Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Bond Letter Motion to Judge Cogan regarding permitting Mark Nordlicht to wear formal business attire for trial by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION as to Mark Nordlicht. Bail revoked for violation of terms of release. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/6/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by the government, dated May 6, 2019, relating to Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019, Terminated: 5/6/2019 Motion to remand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand by USA as to Mark Nordlicht. (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [693] Motion as to Mark Nordlicht to be permitted to change into formal business attire for the remainder of trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/6/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion to remand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Bond Revocation Hearing as to Mark Nordlicht held on 5/6/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan granting [690] Motion to Remand. (Court Reporter Annette Montalvo.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/6/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Motion [688] granted. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter David Roy.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [670] Motion to Strike. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/3/2019. (Kutoroff, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019, Terminated: 5/6/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION to Strike by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on 04/17/2019, before Judge BULSARA. Court Reporter/Transcriber rivka teich, Telephone number 7186132268. Email address: rivkateich@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019. (Teich, Rivka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on 04/16/2019, before Judge BULSARA. Court Reporter/Transcriber rivka teich, Telephone number 7186132268. Email address: rivkateich@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019. (Teich, Rivka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on 04/15/2019, before Judge BULSARA. Court Reporter/Transcriber rivka teich, Telephone number 7186132268. Email address: rivkateich@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2019. (Teich, Rivka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter respectfully apologizing to the Court and Government on Behalf of Mr. Nordlicht as to Mark Nordlicht (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht. The time of the Bond Revocation Hearing previously set for 5/6/2019 at 9:00 AM is reset to 4:30 PM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/3/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [670] Letter MOTION to Strike re GX 4212 (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht. Bond Revocation Hearing set for 5/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/2/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/2/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Motion [681] granted as stated on the record. Jury Trial continued to 5/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Georgette Betts.) (Clarke, Melonie) M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [670] Letter MOTION to Strike re GX 4212 (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019, Terminated: 5/2/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION in Limine to preclude the government from eliciting improper lay opinion testimony from Lily Cheung by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on Jon Lindsey as to Mark Nordlicht (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Weber, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of A. Michael Weber on behalf of Movant Jon Lindsey as to Mark Nordlicht (Weber, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 5/1/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Motion [675] granted as unopposed. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/2/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter re Curative Instruction re the Testimony for the Jury as per Order Dkt. 672 as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/30/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 5/1/2019 at 9:20 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019, Terminated: 5/1/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Limit Cross-Examination by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Joseph D. Nohavicka on Behalf of Oliver Jimenez as to Mark Nordlicht (Nohavicka, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/29/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Motion [673] denied for reasons stated on the record. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 4/30/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Denise Parisi.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Email Test
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 4/28/2019, Entered: 4/28/2019, Terminated: 4/29/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Strike the testimony of Arthur Garza re Dkt 672 by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 4/28/2019, Entered: 4/28/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [660] [667]. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/28/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 4/28/2019, Entered: 4/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [667] Letter MOTION in Limine to preclude the government from eliciting improper lay opinion testimony from Arthur Garza (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 4/28/2019, Entered: 4/28/2019, Terminated: 5/3/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Strike re GX 4212 by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 4/28/2019, Entered: 4/28/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [660] Letter MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 4/27/2019, Entered: 4/27/2019, Terminated: 4/28/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION in Limine to preclude the government from eliciting improper lay opinion testimony from Arthur Garza by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [660] Letter MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [663] Motion to Quash as to Mark Nordlicht (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/26/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter by the government dated April 25, 2019, enclosing supplemental Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019, Terminated: 4/26/2019 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan responding to the letter dated April 24, 2019 of third-party subpoena recipients Mark P. Goodman and Michael B. Mukasey, attorneys at the law firm of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP, as well as this Court's Order for a proffer of proposed testimony and documents by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial continued to 4/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Annette Montalvo.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: [662] letter. By 5/1/2019, defendant Nordlicht shall file a proffer of the proposed testimony of the subpoena recipients and the documents he requests from them. The proffer should specifically explain how this subpoena, which appears to have been issued under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 17(a), seeks testimony that is admissible, based on the personal knowledge of the subpoena recipients, and not entirely collateral to the trial. If Nordlicht does not submit such a proffer, the Court will assume Nordlicht no longer seeks the testimony at issue and quash the underlying subpoenas. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/25/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter in Support of [642] Letter Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served upon Mark P. Goodman and Michael B. Mukasey as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA MANDATE - as to Mark Nordlicht. Petitioner seeks a writ of mandamus. It is ORDERED that the petition is DENIED because Petitioner has not demonstrated that he lacks an adequate, alternative means of obtaining relief. Issued as Mandate: 4/24/19. USCA #18-3663. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019, Terminated: 4/29/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION in Limine by Joseph Sanfilippo as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019, Terminated: 4/24/2019 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Exclude argument about source of alleged "leaks" by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/24/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Opening statements continued. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Motions [657] and [658] are denied for reasons stated on the record. Motion [659] is granted for reasons stated on the record. Jury Trial continued to 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019, Terminated: 4/24/2019 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Document Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re opening statements by Mark Nordlicht. (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019, Terminated: 4/24/2019 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document Letter Motion to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan re opening statements by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Oliver Jimenez as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Nohavicka, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/23/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The parties exercise their peremptory challenges. The Jurors areSelected but not sworn. The trial will commence before Judge Cogan on 4/23/2019 immediately following jury selection. (Court Reporter Annette Montalvo.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry and Order for Jury Trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/23/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Opening statements. Jury Trial continued to 4/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South. The parties are directed to reported to the Courtroom at 9:30 AM (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Clarke, Melonie) M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/22/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The Jury Selection will continue at 9:30 A.M. on 4/23/2019 in Courtroom 8Dbefore Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [632] Motion to Exclude as to Mark Nordlicht and letter [618] as to all defendants. Although the Government is required to produce certain material under the Jencks Act, it is not required to do so before trial. The Governments production of eight sets of notes was a very small production in the context of this case and occurred 17 days before the start of jury selection, which is consistent with the Governments obligations and sufficient time for defendants to review and use these materials effectively. The request in [618] is denied because the Court expects the parties to resolve any dispute about the accuracy of these transcripts without judicial intervention. To the extent the parties cannot resolve this dispute despite a good faith attempt to do so, defendants may introduce their competing versions of the transcripts (if they establish a proper foundation) or request a limiting instruction regarding their objections to the transcripts. In such a circumstance, the jury, not the Court, will decide which version of the transcript is more reliable. Defendants will not, however, be permitted to surprise the Government at trial with alleged transcript inaccuracies that could have been called to the Government's attention weeks or months before trial. In the future, any letter that requests relief from the Court should be filed under the "motion" template in ECF, not the "letter" template. Signed by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/20/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/18/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The Jury Selection will continue at 9:30 A.M. on 4/22/2019 in Courtroom 8D South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara.(Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019, Terminated: 4/18/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [632] MOTION to Exclude Transcriptions of Investor Calls Response to doc 642 (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [632] MOTION to Exclude Transcriptions of Investor Calls (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan in response to 4/18/2019 Order re opening statements as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan in opposition to the Governments letter motion [Dkt. 644] as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter motion by the government regarding opening statements as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [649] Motion for Reconsideration is denied for the reasons stated in this Court's prior Order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [646] request to extend openings. The Court has carefully reviewed the issues in this case and has concluded that 45 minutes per party should be more than adequate for opening statements. There is also sufficient time for the parties to modify their openings if they are longer. However, in an abundance of caution, the Court will increase the allotment to one hour per party. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [644]. Consistent with the Court's order during the 2/22/2019 status conference, following the Government's opening statement, defense counsel will show the Government any exhibits or demonstratives they intend to use in their openings statements for the Government's review and good faith, bona fide evidentiary objection. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2019. (Kutoroff, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/17/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The Jury Selection will continue at 9:30 A.M. on 4/18/2019 in Courtroom 8D South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter response in opposition to the defendant Mark Nordlicht's motion to preclude transcripts as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served upon Mark P. Goodman and Michael B. Mukasey as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of John Gleeson on behalf of Movants Mark P. Goodman and Michael B. Mukasey as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order. The Government's [610] motion is denied without prejudice to renewal as a motion or objection at trial, and Nordlichts [619, 628] motion is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/17/2019. (See order for detail) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/16/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The Jury Selection will continue at 9:30 A.M. on 4/17/2019 in Courtroom 8D South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter response in opposition to the defendant Mark Nordlicht's motion and supplemental motion in limine to preclude certain evidence at trial [619] [628] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter in Opposition to Defense Motion to Preclude Witness Testimony (ECF Docket No. 618) as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Elbert, Lauren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Jury Selection held on 4/15/2019. Appearances: AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government., Ronald Sullivan Esq., Duncan Levin Esq., and Jose Baez Esq., with the Defendant Mark Nordlicht., Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., with the Defendant David Levy., Kevin O' Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., with Defendant Joseph Sanfilippo. Case Called. Jurors' voir dire. The Jury Selection will continue at 11:00 A.M. on April 16, 2019 in 2D North Ceremonial Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter motion for additional order precluding argument or reference to purported government misconduct at trial as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [637] letter motion as unnecessary. The Court has already granted the relief the Government seeks in prior orders. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/15/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 4/14/2019, Entered: 4/14/2019 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [633] Motion to Exclude as to Mark Nordlicht (1); denying [634] Motion in Limine as to Mark Nordlicht (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/14/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: 4/13/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan in reply to the Governments letter of April 12, 2019, Dkt. No. 631 as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: 4/13/2019, Terminated: 4/14/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: 4/13/2019, Terminated: 4/14/2019 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Exclude Late Produced Discovery by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: 4/13/2019, Terminated: 4/20/2019 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Transcriptions of Investor Calls by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Government's opposition to the [632] letter is due 4/17/2019; defendants' reply is due 4/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/13/2019. (O'Brien, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter response in opposition to the defendants' motion to preclude government exhibits as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to join Dkts 626 & 627 as to Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [603] Motion to Exclude as to Mark Nordlicht (1); denying [604] Motion for Reconsideration as to Mark Nordlicht (1); denying [605] Motion to Inspect as to Mark Nordlicht (1); granting in part and denying in part [609] Motion to Quash as to Mark Nordlicht (1). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/12/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION to Amend/Correct [619] MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Nordlicht by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Join Levy Doc 626 as to Mark Nordlicht (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan regarding the government's most recent conduct relating to exhibits in this case as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [626] Letter re Government's additional exhibits. The Government is directed to respond to defendants' letter no later than midnight tonight (4/12/2019). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/12/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Government's response to the [619] motion in limine is due 4/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/12/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [610] MOTION in Limine regarding the defendants' provision of information about an advice-of-counsel defense (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: As discussed on the record Jury Selection as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, and Joseph Sanfilippo will commence on April 15, 2019 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 2D North before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/11/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: Pretrial Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, and Joseph Sanfilippo held on 4/11/2019. Defense Counsel Ronald Sullivan Esq., and Duncan Levin, Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendant Nordlicht. Defendant Nordlicht present. Defense Counsel Michael Sommer Esq., and Morris Fodeman Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendant Levy. Defendant Levy present. Defense Counsel Kevin O'Brien Esq., Adam Ford Esq., and Anjula Prasad Esq., appeared on behalf of Defendant Sanfilippo. Defendant Sanfilippo present. AUSA Alicyn Cooley, David Pitluck, Lauren Elbert and Patrick Hein appeared on behalf of the Government. (See separate docket entry for orders issuing from this proceeding.) (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Government's response to the [618] letter is due 4/16/2019; defendants' reply is due 4/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/11/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [617] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Small.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by the government, dated April 10, 2019, enclosing supplemental Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan to address the governments recent submission relating to any potential advice of counsel defense as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter regarding voir dire and jury selection as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sanket J. Bulsara on behalf of David Levy, Mark Nordlicht and Joseph SanFilippo ("Trial Defendants"), in accordance with Your Honor's March 15, 2019 Order as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change: Counsel please note the Pre-Trial Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, and Joseph Sanfilippo, scheduled for April 11, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. will now take place in Courtroom 8D South. (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Mark Nordlicht as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan on behalf of the defendants regarding witnesses as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019, Terminated: 4/11/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Duncan Patrick Levin appearing for Mark Nordlicht (Levin, Duncan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The parties should be prepared to begin opening arguments next week if the jury selection process permits, although witness testimony will commence no earlier than 4/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/9/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [605] MOTION to Inspect (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [604] MOTION for Reconsideration (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan on behalf of the defendants respectfully responding to the government's April 6, 2019 letter requesting that opening statements commence on April 23, 2019 [Dkt. 608] as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [603] MOTION to Exclude expert testimony (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [609] MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas on behalf of David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019, Terminated: 4/17/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine regarding the defendants' provision of information about an advice-of-counsel defense by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: [611]. By 4/10/2019, defendant Levy shall provide the Court with a supplemental submission that explains, for each subpoena listed in Exhibit A of the Government's [609] motion, whether the subpoena has been complied with or is outstanding. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Defendants' opposition to the Government's [610] motions is due by 4/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy and Joseph Sanfilippo. Any response to the Government's [608] letter is due 4/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 4/6/2019, Entered: 4/6/2019, Terminated: 4/12/2019 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small. (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 4/6/2019, Entered: 4/6/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by the government, dated April 6, 2019, respectfully requesting that the Court schedule opening statements to begin on April 23, 2019 as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to David Levy re [606] Letter seeking clarification on the protective order (Dkt. No. 76). So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/5/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re clarification on the protective order (Dkt. No. 76) as to David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: [604, 605]. The Government's opposition to defendant Nordlicht's motion for reconsideration and motion to inspect is due 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/3/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019, Terminated: 4/12/2019 Motion to Inspect
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Inspect by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019, Terminated: 4/12/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019, Terminated: 4/12/2019 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude expert testimony by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 3/30/19 that A&M's [599] motion to quash is GRANTED. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/30/19 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER deferring ruling on [603]. Any opposition to the Government's [603] motion to exclude expert testimony is due 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/1/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: 3/29/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on June 29, 2018, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda D Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: Linda_Danelczyk@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2019. (Danelczyk, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change: Counsel please note the Pre-Trial Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, and Daniel Small scheduled for April 11, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. will now take place in Courtroom 6G North. (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan in response to non-party Alvarez and Marsal Valuation Services, LLCs letter of March 21, 2019 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sanket J. Bulsara respectfully requesting that the Court reschedule the Pre-Trial Conference as to David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The parties letter [597] requesting to re-schedule the Pre-Trial Conference is hereby granted. The in person Pre-Trial Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, and Daniel Small is re-scheduled to April 11, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 2F North before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Defendants should be present for the Pre-Trial Conference. (Manson, Eddie) .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 3/21/19 from John G. Moon, representing non-party Alvarez & Marsal Valuation Services, LLC. regarding a motion to quash subpoena. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: # (1) notice of appearance) (Guzzi, Roseann).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY SELECTION as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for selection of a trial jury on April 15, 2019. An in person Pre-Trial Conference to discuss proposed questionnaire will be held at 2:30 PM on April 12, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 2F North. Defendants should be present for the Pre-Trial Conference. Counsel must appear promptly at 9:30 AM on April 15, 2019 in Courtroom 8D South to begin selection. The parties must submit no later than noon on April 10, 2019 the following (to the extent not previously submitted): proposed questions to ask prospective jurors during voir dire, a short description of the case and a list of the names of all persons, entities, and locations that the party expects may be mentioned during the trial. Only questions specifically addressing the issues to be tried should be submitted; routine background questions are not necessary. (Manson, Eddie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019 Order on Motion to Release Bond ObligationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER dated 3/13/19 re: release of cash bail in the mount of $100,000.00 as to defendant Uri Landesman. re: [592] Motion to Release Bond Obligation as to Uri Landesman (3) ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/13/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion to Release Bond Obligation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Release Bond Obligation by USA as to Uri Landesman. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019, Terminated: 3/12/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct [588] Letter MOTION for Disclosure RE Scheduling Order Dated 3-5-19 filed by Mark Nordlicht by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht. Because the [588] letter motion contains contact information for third parties not involved in this matter, the Clerk of Court is directed to seal this letter motion. By 3/12/2019, defendant Nordlicht is ordered to file a redacted version of this letter with all email addresses, except the email addresses of defense counsel, redacted. The Court finds these redactions are necessary to protect the privacy of third parties. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion for disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting that part of the motion [588] seeking to maintain the 4/15/19 trial date and denying the remainder. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/7/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Status Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small held on 3/7/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. The Court has decided Jury Selection will proceed as scheduled before a Magistrate Judge on 4/15/2019. (Court Reporter Victoria Butler.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019, Terminated: 3/7/2019 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for Disclosure RE Scheduling Order Dated 3-5-19 by Mark Nordlicht. (Baez, Jose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Jeffrey Shulse. (Rody, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [587] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for travel as to Jeffrey Shulse. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 Order to Unseal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order to Unseal Document. The Government's [577] Letter and it's attachments are unsealed. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/4/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER. A conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South before Judge Brian M. Cogan. The Court has received a telephone call from a state court judge advising that the attorneys for Mr. Nordlicht have a significant trial set before him to commence in early June. Not only did Mr. Nordlicht's attorneys fail to advise this Court of their competing obligation when this Court reset trial for 4/15/19, but they attempted to push the trial date for this case a month later, which would have ensured the conflict. The parties are directed to confer among themselves and see if they can agree on a schedule for this case, including the possibility of an accelerated commencement date, that will allow Mr. Nordlicht's attorneys to meet their obligations to this Court and the state court. If they cannot, and cannot agree to a date after the state court matter, this Court will take all reasonable steps to accommodate both trials. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/5/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019, Terminated: 3/1/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Stern, Dylan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [583] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release for travel as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/1/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter response in opposition by the government to the defendant Mark Nordlicht's motion to strike purported surplusage from the indictment [553] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter in response to Dkt. No. 567 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019, Terminated: 2/26/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Jeffrey Shulse. (Rody, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [580] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jeffrey Shulse without prejudice to renewal upon reporting the position of the US Attorney and Pretrial Services. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/26/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESCHEDULING ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small. In light of a medical issue relating to an individual involved in this case, trial is adjourned to 4/15/2019. Jury selection before a Magistrate Judge will begin on 4/15/2019 at 9:30 AM with trial to follow. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act until 4/15/2019. Complex case designation continued through 4/15/2019 for trial preparation. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/26/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Motion to Adjourn the Subpoena Return Date, filed on behalf of Nicole Levin Mesard as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 526 Government's motion to compel and to quash. The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within five days of the date of the filing of this order why this order and the underlying motions, oppositions, and replies cannot be unsealed in their entirety (except for Exhibit A of defendants' opposition to the motion to quash, which will remain sealed and ex parte because it discloses defense strategy). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/24/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht re 579. The letter motion to adjourn sine die the Subpoena's return date, at issue, is granted. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/25/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/24/2019, Entered: 2/24/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by the government, dated February 24, 2019, in response to the Court's Order to Show Cause [568] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Motion to Quash Subpoena Served on Nicole Levin Mesard as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of John Gleeson on behalf of Movant Nicole Levin Mesard as to Mark Nordlicht (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Selection as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small held on 2/22/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South.(Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re Dkt. No. 567 as to David Levy (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on October 29, 2018, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Denise Parisi, Telephone number 718-613-2605. Email address: deniseparisi72@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2019. (Parisi, Denise)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Motion to Address Three Points to the Government's Submissions, Docket No. 571 as to Mark Nordlicht (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by the government, dated February 21, 2019, responding in opposition to the defendant Mark Nordlicht's letter dated February 19, 2019 [569] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Voir Dire held on 2/21/2019 as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Voir Dire and Jury Selection continued to 2/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Voir Dire held on 2/20/2019 as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Voir Dire and Jury Selection continued to 2/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Proffer in Support of Theory of the Defense as to Mark Nordlicht (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION to Quash Subpoena served upon Andrew Kaplan by David Levy by David Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion to Quash Subpoena Served Upon Andrew Kaplan by David Levy, # (2) Memorandum in Support, # (3) Declaration of Eugene Ingoglia in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena, # (4) Exhibit A) (Ingoglia, Eugene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of movant Andrew Kaplan as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Ingoglia, Eugene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Government's [557] motion in limine is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/18/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Voir Dire held on 2/19/2019 as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Voir Dire and Jury Selection continued to 2/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/18/2019, Entered: 2/18/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [541] Motion in Limine as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/18/2019. (O'Brien, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/17/2019, Entered: 2/17/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [526] MOTION to Quash issuance of Rule 17(c) subpoenas MOTION to Compel disclosure of documents obtained by Rule 17(c) subpoenas to preclude arguments of alleged government misconduct (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 2/17/2019, Entered: 2/17/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [526] MOTION to Quash issuance of Rule 17(c) subpoenas MOTION to Compel disclosure of documents obtained by Rule 17(c) subpoenas to preclude arguments of alleged government misconduct (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. During trial, the Court will adhere to the Guidelines Regarding Appropriate Use of 302 Forms in Criminal Trials, authored by former Judge Forrest of the S.D.N.Y. The Guidelines can be found at docket number 819 in Case No. 17-cr-350. The parties are instructed to obtain and review these Guidelines in advance of trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/17/2019. (O'Brien, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 2/16/2019, Entered: 2/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter in reply to the defendants' opposition [Dkt. No. 555] to the government's motion to quash as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 2/16/2019, Entered: 2/16/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter reply in support of the government's motion to preclude cross-examination [545] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 2/16/2019, Entered: 2/16/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [541] Notice of MOTION in Limine by Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 2/16/2019, Entered: 2/16/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [541] Notice of MOTION in Limine (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Any opposition to the Government's [557] Letter motion to preclude arguments regarding alleged Government misconduct is due 2/17/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/16/2019. (O'Brien, Claire)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter motion by the government to preclude arguments regarding alleged government misconduct as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan in response to the Government's February 12, 2019 letter [Dkt. No. 545] as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re additional peremptory challenges as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Motion to Strike Misleading Surplusage in Indictments as to Mark Nordlicht (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: 2/14/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter enclosing the Parties joint voir dire proposals as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # (2) Exhibit List of Relevant Names) (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 1 - Exparte Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully enclosing Defendant David Levy's response to the government's motion to quash, Dkt. 526 as to David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Levy opposition to government motion to quash, # (2) Attachment A, # (3) Attachment B, # (4) Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit 9, # (13) Exhibit 10, # (14) Exhibit 11, # (15) Exhibit 12, # (16) Exhibit 13, # (17) Exhibit 14, # (18) Exhibit 15, # (19) Exhibit 16, # (20) Exhibit 17, # (21) Exhibit 18, # (22) Exhibit 19, # (23) Exhibit 20, # (24) Exhibit 21, # (25) Exhibit 22) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse re [544] Letter. ORDER granting in part and denying in part [544]. Counsel for all parties may bring electronic devices for use for the duration of trial. Mr. Levy and his wife may not bring their phones to trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/12/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter motion by the government, dated February 12, 2019, to preclude cross-examination as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting attorneys and trial team members access to the Courthouse with electronic devices and trial related equipment as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jae Young Jeong appearing for David Levy (Jeong, Jae Young)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Zachary M Kravat appearing for David Levy (Kravat, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Defendants' opposition to the Government's 545 motion in limine is due 2/15/2019; any reply is due 2/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/12/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Daniel Small. The Government's opposition to defendant Small's [541] motion in limine is due 2/15/2019; any reply is due 2/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/12/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019, Terminated: 2/18/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION in Limine by Daniel Small. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Daniel Small's Motions in Limine) (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying defendant Nordlicht's [532],[536] Motions for a 60 day continuance and motion to stay as to Mark Nordlicht (1). (Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/11/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting the Court enter our proposed Order regarding advance disclosure by the Government of its witnesses and exhibits as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to David Levy re [538]. As the Court ruled during the 1/11/2019 conference, the Government shall disclose to defendants the identify of each witness four or five days before the Government calls the witness. The Court expects the Government to disclose the identity of each witness five days in advance when possible. However, defendants' request for the Government to also disclose the exhibits associated with each witness is denied. The Government's advance disclosures of its witnesses, in conjunction with its exhibit list, provide sufficient notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/11/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 2/10/2019, Entered: 2/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter in opposition to [532] Letter Motion to Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Mark Nordlicht (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 2/10/2019, Entered: 2/10/2019, Terminated: 2/11/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue and Severance by Mark Nordlicht. (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter seeking clarification of the Court's February 7, 2019 order regarding Rule 17(c) subpoena response dates as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Jury selection will begin on 2/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. By 2/14/2019, the parties must submit their joint proposed voir dire, which should include the anticipated length of trial and a short description of the case. It should not include routine background questions. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: [535]. The Court's 2/7/2019 order extending the return date of the subpoenas at issue in the Government's 2/5/2019 Motion to Quash only applies to the subpoenas issued to Shaked Opportunity Fund LP and Daniel Sun. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/8/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht. The Government is ordered to respond to the [532] Letter Motion to Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus by 2/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/7/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse held on 01/11/2019, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number 718-613-2644. Email address: LisaSchmidCCR.RMR@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Motion for Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Mark Nordlicht (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Defendants are ordered to inform the recipients of the subpoenas at issue in the 526 Motion to Quash that the return date of the subpoenas has been extended to two weeks after the Court's decision on the 526 Motion to Quash. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/6/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: 2/6/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter requesting modification to the Court's order regarding the defendants response to the government's motion to quash Rule 17(c) subpoenas as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: 2/6/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan in response to the Governments letter of February 4, 2019 [Dkt. No. 521] as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Government's reply to defendant Levy's opposition to the Government's 526 motion to compel production of documents obtained by Rule 17(c) subpoenas is due 2/8/2019. Any opposition to the Government's motion to quash issuance of certain Rule 17(c) subpoenas is due 2/13/2019; the Government's reply is due 2/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/6/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash issuance of Rule 17(c) subpoenas, MOTION to Compel disclosure of documents obtained by Rule 17(c) subpoenas by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small. (Attachments: # (1) Shaked Subpoena, # (2) Sun Subpoena, # (3) Stevenson Letter, # (4) Transcript of Proceedings) (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTION by Joseph Sanfilippo, Letter as to Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [525]. Defendant Sanfilippo did not file an unredacted version of this motion on the docket under seal and so the Court does not know to what proceedings he is referring. The Court does not accept substantive correspondence by email. In addition, he has not provided any legal support for his contention that he is entitled to access these dockets or their underlying documents. To the extent he requests this access under Rule 16, Brady, or Giglio, he has offered no reason to believe that the Government is failing to comply with its discovery obligations. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/5/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by the government, dated February 4, 2019, enclosing supplemental Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [517] Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant Nordlicht claims that the Court overlooked the grand jury testimony of Murray Grenville in arriving at its conclusion that defendants did not make a prima facie showing that a matter occurring before the grand jury was disclosed. Defendants did not provide this testimony to the Court with their January 22, 2019 amended motion for a hearing, so there was nothing for the Court to overlook in issuing its decision on that motion. Although Nordlicht contends that defendants did not have this transcript before filing their "initial papers," the only production letter on the docket subsequent to defendants' amended motion for a hearing does not purport to have included any grand jury transcripts, so the Court assumes defendants had this transcript at least before that date. A motion to reconsider is not a means to provide the Court with additional evidence that the moving party had but failed to produce with its original motion. See United States v. Posada, 206 F. Supp. 3d 866, 868 (S.D.N.Y. 2016) (collecting cases). Even if the Court did consider Mr. Grenville's testimony, however, it would not change the Court's decision. As indicated on the top of each page in the transcript of his testimony, it appears that Mr. Grenville testified before the grand jury on August 17, 2016 six days after the article that Nordlicht contends shows a leak of the content of Mr. Grenville's testimony was published. Thus, Mr. Grenvilles testimony would provide no reason for the Court to depart from its two prior rulings that defendants have failed to make a prima facie showing that this or any other article reveals matters before the grand jury or relies on information obtained from government sources. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/3/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019, Terminated: 2/4/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Reconsideration as Grand Jury Leaks by Mark Nordlicht. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order: Defendants [495] motion for a hearing on Government leaks and [491] motion to compel exculpatory evidence are denied. The hearing scheduled for February 1, 2019 is canceled.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/31/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Judge Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting a written Order re witness disclosures as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER dated 1/25/19 denying defendants' [493] Motion for Reconsideration as to Mark Nordlicht (1), David Levy (2), Joseph Sanfilippo (4), Daniel Small (6). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/25/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 1/27/2019, Entered: 1/27/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [495] Amended MOTION for Hearing on Government Leaks, [491] MOTION to Compel Exculpatory Evidence (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 1/27/2019, Entered: 1/27/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter in Reply to Response in Opposition to Amended Motion for Hearing on Government Leaks re [496] as to David Levy, Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [495] Amended MOTION for Hearing on Government Leaks , [491] & [496] (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anjula Prasad appearing for Joseph Sanfilippo (Prasad, Anjula)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew Aaron Ford appearing for Joseph Sanfilippo (Ford, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Join Amended Motion for Hearing on Government Leaks as to David Levy, Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019, Terminated: 1/31/2019 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for Hearing on Government Leaks by Mark Nordlicht as to Mark Nordlicht, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Appendix) (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying defendants' [432] Motion to Dismiss as to Mark Nordlicht (1), David Levy (2), Joseph Sanfilippo (4). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [485] Memorandum Opinion by David Levy as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 16, 2019 Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Indictment) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER. The Government should include any opposition to defendant Nordlicht's [491] MOTION to Compel Exculpatory Evidence in its opposition to defendants' amended motion for an evidentiary hearing regarding leaks from law enforcement, which is due 1/25/2019. Defendants' reply to the Government's opposition is now due 1/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/19/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: 1/21/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter by the government, dated January 21, 2019, enclosing the government's exhibits, exhibits list and current witness list as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019, Terminated: 1/31/2019 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Exculpatory Evidence by Mark Nordlicht. (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants' Updated Expert Disclosures as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo re [404] Notice (Other) (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER. By 1/22/2019, defendants may file their amended motion for an evidentiary hearing regarding leaks from law enforcement based on the evidence defendant Nordlicht identified in his [488] letter. The Government's opposition is due 1/25/2019 and defendants' reply is due 1/26/2019. Defendants are cautioned, however, that the Court is not granting them another opportunity to litigate the issues resolved in the [442] order, so any basis for a hearing must be grounded in the new evidence that defendants obtained through the FOIA production. An evidentiary hearing is tentatively scheduled for 2/1/2019 at 11:00 a.m., should the Court determine that defendants' new evidence meets the standard for such a hearing. The parties are further cautioned that this motion practice and tentative hearing will not delay the start of trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/17/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter in Support of the Application by Defendant Mark Nordlicht dated 1/17/19 as to Joseph Sanfilippo (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in Response to the January 16, 2019 Government Letter as to Mark Nordlicht (Fryer, Lisabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by the government, dated January 16, 2019, relating to a FOIA production to the defendant Mark Nordlicht as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 1/15/19 that defendants' 443 motion to dismiss for prosecutorial misconduct is denied. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/15/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019, Terminated: 1/11/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashley C. Burns. by Joseph Mann. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration) (Burns, Ashley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [483] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ashley Christine Burns withdrawn from case as to Joseph Mann. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/11/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion to sever defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small and Jeffrey Shulse held on 1/11/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan denying [444] Motion to Sever Defendant as to Daniel Small and Defense request for a jury questionnaire are denied for reasons stated on the record. Jury Selection scheduled for February 19, 2019 will be held in Courtroom 8D South before Judge Cogan with trial to follow. Complex case designation continued through 2/19/2019 for pending motions and trial preparation. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to AUSAs Alicyn L. Cooley, et al. re Dkt. 479, providing further information relating to evidence that Mr. Levy may introduce at trial relating to legal advice provided to him and to others as to David Levy (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [468]. Because the Government's response to defendants' motion to dismiss the indictment has been publicly filed with minimal redactions [473], there is no reason for defendants' reply papers to remain under seal. The Clerk is directed to unseal [464, 467]. ORDER conditionally granting: [430], provided that all parties in the Schmidt case execute a stipulation that is endorsed by that Court that contains substantially the same restrictions as in [76]. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by the government, dated January 9, 2019, containing the parties' joint proposed agenda for the January 11, 2019 status conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by the government, dated January 8, 2019, enclosing supplemental Section 3500 material as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER dated 1/8/19 re: motions in limine [433, 434, 435, 440, 446 ]. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/8/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter by the government, dated January 4, 2019, detailing the government's supplemental Rule 16 discovery production as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Regarding January 4, 2019 Supplemental Disclosure by Government Firewall Production Team Pursuant to Rule 16 and the November 13, 2017 Stipulation and Order as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cruz Melendez, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTION by Daniel Small to [445] 1 - Sealed Document CR, Letter (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTION by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [446] First MOTION in Limine by the USA (Pitluck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2019 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting leave to file under seal Defendants' reply papers by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNREDACTED DOCUMENT by David Levy as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small re [439] Letter, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [444] Notice of MOTION to Sever Defendant Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Join Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Indictment Filed by Co-Defendants as to Daniel Small (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [443] MOTION to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [440] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO PURPORTED INVESTOR LOSSES (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [433] Amended MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence pertaining to "preferential" redemptions (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [432] MOTION to Dismiss Count Four of the Indictment (Ford, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/14/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [460] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release to travel as to David Levy.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/14/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018, Terminated: 12/13/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Permission to Travel by Daniel Small. (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [459] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Small. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/13/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTION by David Levy as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse to [443] MOTION to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct filed by David Levy (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct, # (2) Declaration of Michael S. Sommer, # (3) Exhibits 1 to 4, # (4) Exhibits 5 to 7, # (5) Exhibit 8, # (6) Exhibits 9 to 14, # (7) Exhibits 15 to 19) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [440] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO PURPORTED INVESTOR LOSSES, [435] MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF FLIGHT, [434] MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF BLACK ELK DEATHS, INJURIES AND OIL SPILL, [432] MOTION to Dismiss Count Four of the Indictment, [433] Amended MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence pertaining to "preferential" redemptions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Join Opposition to Government's Motions in Limine, Filed by Co-Defendants as to Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [446] First MOTION in Limine (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION respectfully requesting an adjournment of the motion in limine response and reply deadlines as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Hein, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [450] adjournment of the deadlines for all parties' motion in limine as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo and Daniel Small. Application Granted. Government response to MIL is extended until December 7, 2018 and replies are due by December 14, 2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/5/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Status Conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small and Jeffrey Shulse held on 11/30/2018 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Parties present. Trial schedule: Jury selection is reset to February 19, 2019 before a Magistrate Judge with trial to follow before this Court. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act until 1/11/2019 for previously designated complex case. The next Status Conference is set for 1/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter by the government, dated November 28, 2018, containing the parties' joint proposed agenda for the November 30, 2018 status conference as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018, Terminated: 12/11/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting leave to file publicly a redacted version of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct by David Levy. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [447]. Defendant Levy is ordered to file his proposed redactions under seal by 12/3/2018. The Government is ordered to either file its alternative redactions under seal or consent to Levy's redactions by 12/10/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/26/2018. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018, Terminated: 1/8/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION in Limine by USA as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Cooley, Alicyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Join Motion To Dismiss Indictment Filed by Co-Defendants as to Daniel Small (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018, Terminated: 1/11/2019 motion to sever defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to Sever Defendant Daniel Small by Daniel Small. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Daniel Small's Motion for Severance) (Levine, Seth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct by David Levy as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Prosecutorial Misconduct, # (2) Declaration of Michael S. Sommer, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Exhibit 18, # (21) Exhibit 19) (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [389] Motion for Reconsideration re [107] MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing as to Mark Nordlicht (1), David Levy (2), Joseph Sanfilippo (4), Joseph Mann (5), Daniel Small (6), Jeffrey Shulse (7); denying [391] Motion for Reconsideration as to Mark Nordlicht (1); ORDER as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Uri Landesman, Joseph Sanfilippo, Joseph Mann, Daniel Small, Jeffrey Shulse -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Moving Defendants' motion for dismissal of Counts One through Five of the indictment, suppression of evidence, preclusion of testimony, discovery, and an evidentiary hearing based on alleged violations of the Grand Jury Secrecy Rule and motion for reconsideration are denied. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/21/2018. (Irizarry, Dora)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [440] MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO PURPORTED INVESTOR LOSSES (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018, Terminated: 1/8/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO PURPORTED INVESTOR LOSSES by David Levy as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo. (Sommer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Brian M. Cogan respectfully requesting the Court employ a jury questionnaire as part of voir dire in this case as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo, Daniel Small (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Fodeman, Morris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTION by Joseph Sanfilippo as to Mark Nordlicht, David Levy, Joseph Sanfilippo to [433] Amended MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence pertaining to "preferential" redemptions filed by Joseph Sanfilippo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Offering Memorandum) (O'Brien, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,830 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?