Douglas Suter v. Porsche Cars N Amer, Inc, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 14-3421

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 12:16 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3385 - Property Damage: Product Liability
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012040110 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas J. Suter by Gregory M. Travalio. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT FILER - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE USING HIS OWN PACER LOGIN.)--[Edited 05/02/2014 by RD] (MHT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE filed regarding a motion to extend time to file en banc petition, [34]; previously filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange in 14-3421. Response from Attorney Mr. William Francis Kiniry, Jr. for Appellee Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Certificate of Service:08/10/2015. (WFK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to extend time to file en banc petition, [34]; previously filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange in 14-3421. Response from Attorney Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Appellee Douglas J. Suter Certificate of Service:08/10/2015. (MHT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        TENDERED petition for rehearing en banc which is 7 days late. Received from Interested Party Appellant Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange. (BLH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of service: 08/03/2015. (BLH)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER filed : AFFIRMED, pursuant to FRAP 34(a)(2)(C), decision not for publication. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Circuit Judge; John M. Rogers, Circuit Judge and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge. (RB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY BRIEF filed by Party Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange Copies:1. Certificate of Service:01/28/2015. (RB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION filed by Mr. William Francis Kiniry, Jr. for Porsche Cars North America, Inc. to take judicial notice. Certificate of Service: 01/12/2015. (WFK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. William Francis Kiniry, Jr. for Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. Certificate of Service:01/12/2015. Argument Request: waived. (WFK)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Douglas J. Suter. Certificate of Service:01/12/2015. Argument Request: waived. (MHT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief FILED 10/3/14; appellee brief due 01/12/2015;. (RB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER filed the motion to reinstate is GRANTED. Kalange is cautioned that she may be subject to sanctions under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 38 if her appeal is found to be frivolous. Ralph B. Guy , Jr., Circuit Judge; Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Circuit Judge and Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judge. (RB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to reinstate case, [20]; previously filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange in 14-3421. Response from Attorney Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Appellee Douglas J. Suter Certificate of Service:10/14/2014. (MHT)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to reinstate case, [20]; previously filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange in 14-3421. Response from Attorney Mr. William Francis Kiniry, Jr. for Appellee Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Certificate of Service:10/14/2014. (WFK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange Copies:1. Argument Request: waived. Certificate of Service: Not provided. (RB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange to reinstate case and declaration. Certificate of service: 10/02/2014. (RB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER filed to dismiss for want of prosecution for failure to file the appellant's brief by September 5, 2014 and granting appellee's motion to dismiss appeal for want of prosecution and request for expedited dismissal filed by Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman. (RB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas J. Suter by Gregory M. Travalio. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2014. (GMT)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Douglas J. Suter to dismiss appeal for want of prosecution and request for expedited dismissal. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2014. (MHT)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/05/2014;. appellee brief due 10/08/2014;. (RB)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        APPEARANCE filed for Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Plastic Coolant Tubes Products Liability Litigation by William F. Kiniry, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2014. (WFK)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          APPEARANCE filed for Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Plastic Coolant Tubes Products Liability Litigation by Matthew A. Goldberg. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2014. (MAG)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terrance Michael Miller for Appellee Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/06/2014. (TMM)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Porsche Cars North America, Inc. by Terrance M. Miller. Certificate of Service: 05/06/2014. (TMM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Douglas J. Suter; transcript ordered on 05/02/2014 from Court Reporter Ms. Denise N. Errett. [8] Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (MHT)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Mark Hayden Troutman for Appellee Douglas J. Suter Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (MHT)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas J. Suter by Gary Klein. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (GK)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas J. Suter by Mark Landes. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (MDL)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas J. Suter by Mark H. Troutman. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2014. (MHT)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Mary Ellen Kalange. Transcript needed: n. (RB)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?