Rappard v. DGD Transport, L.L.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-25252
District Judge Marcia G. Cooke, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 6:11 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Javier Rappard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul M. Botros +1 954 967 5377
v.
No Logo DGD Transport, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Luis Lopez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Jordan Mason Anderson +1 361 906 0001 +1 361 906 2849 jmaattorney@gmail.com
an individual James Rick Holstein +1 361 883 8649 +1 361 883 3199 rickholstein@mac.com
an individual Kevin J. Reddington +1 508 583 4280 +1 508 588 2174 kevinreddington@msn.com
an individual Rose Vela +1 956 248 7673 rose.vela@me.com
an individual Norval John Welsh, IV +1 361 884 1967 +1 361 883 0129 njwelsh@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by AITCHISON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Will Aitchison +1 503 282 6160

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDERSON2X, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Austin W Anderson +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 austin@a2xlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brookstone Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Vito Torchia, Jr. +1 800 946 8655 +1 886 257 6172 VTorchia@BrookstoneLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
an individual Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Laura L. Ho +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 lho@gbdhlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Demchak, Baller, Borgen & Dardarian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Teresa Demchak +1 510 763 9800 +1 510 835 1417 tdemchak@gdblegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Christopher Lebsock - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 633 1949 +1 415 358 4980 clebsock@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heygood Orr & Pearson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael Everett Heygood +1 214 237 9001 +1 214 237 9002 michael@hop-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JOSEPH, GREENWALD & LAAKE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Steven M. Pavsner +1 301 220 2200 +1 301 220 1214 spavsner@jgllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua S. Androphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Joshua S. Androphy

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Elliot M. Weinstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Elliot M. Weinstein +1 617 367 9334 +1 617 523 7554 elliot@eweinsteinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loren & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual James M. Loren +1 954 585 4878 +1 954 585 4886 Jloren@lorenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Antonio Faillace

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael Antonio Faillace

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael A. Wolak, III +1 203 946 7970 +1 203 946 7942 mwolak@newhavenct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael F. Buchanan +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 mfbuchanan@pbwt.com
an individual William F Schmedlin +1 212 336 2049 +1 212 336 1208 wschmedlin@pbwt.com
an individual Stephen P. Younger +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 spyounger@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Damon William Taaffe +1 202 775 4500 dtaaffe@robbinsrussell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Charles Edgar Tompkins, IV +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 ctompkins@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shavitz Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Gregg I. Shavitz +1 561 447 8888 +1 561 447 8831 gshavitz@shavitzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shulman Kessler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Troy L. Kessler +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 tk@shulmankessler.com
an individual Marijana F Matura +1 631 499 9100 +1 631 499 9120 mm@shulmankessler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Jason R. Sims +1 248 643 4440 jrsims@grsims.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 615

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Eli Zev Freedberg +1 347 651 0044 +1 212 214 0799 efreedberg@ezf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Klein Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Darren Paul Brian Rumack +1 212 344 9022 +1 212 344 0301 Darren@thekleinlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Sara Lyn Faulman +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 slf@wmlaborlaw.com
an individual Gregory Keith McGillivary +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 gkm@wmlaborlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0002
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Motion to Seal (Public)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/27/2016. (tm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE, (Expedited Service Deadline 2/27/2017.) Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/27/2016. (tm)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in FLSA case Statement of Claim due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/27/2016. (tm)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/27/2016. (tm)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Paul M. Botros on behalf of Javier Rappard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A Notice of Consent to Join) (Botros, Paul) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (fbn) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (fbn) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9341551, filed by Javier Rappard. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix Summons 1, # 3 Appendix Summons 2)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 114 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?