United States v. $39,510.00 in U.S. Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-09505

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 3:32 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Judgment - consent
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE by Judge Percy Anderson Related to: Stipulation for Order 13 . The following shall be returned to Claimant as follows: a. $5,000.00, without interest, will be returned to Ciera A. Marcano. The following currency shall be forfeited to the United States, and no other right, title or interest shall exist therein. The Government shall dispose of the following according to law: a. $34,510.00. (See document for details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mrgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Warrant for Seizure Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?