Schrecker v. Radlink Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-03511
District Judge Diane J. Humetewa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2017 at 12:55 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christian Schrecker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve-Lynn J. Rapp +1 312 589 6370 erapp@edelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edelson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rafey S. Balabanian +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 rbalabanian@edelson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Scott Thomassen +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 bthomassen@edelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hollingsworth Kelly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Fortune Kelly +1 520 882 8080 +1 520 882 0428 jkelly@hollingsworthkelly.com
v.
No Logo Radlink, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Radlink Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Doug C Northup +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5562 dnorthup@fclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hernan D Vera +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 hvera@birdmarella.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Chad Gough re: 48 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND SEARCH OF DEFENDANT'S SERVERS . filed by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Thomassen re: 48 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND SEARCH OF DEFENDANT'S SERVERS . filed by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Tao Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Hacking Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email Chain re Inspection, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Second Email Chain re Inspection, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email re Inspection Protocol)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND SEARCH OF DEFENDANT'S SERVERS by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER that Plaintiffs' 41 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is GRANTED IN PART with the limitations as set forth. ORDERED the discovery granted pursuant to this Order shall be completed no later than October 27, 2017. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall then file a response to Defendant's 38 Motion to Dismiss on or before November 10, 2017. Defendant's reply is due within seven days of the date the response is filed. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant's 46 Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/11/2017. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          *MOTION for Hearing re: Defendant's Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Defendant Radlink Incorporated. (Vera, Hernan) *Modified to correct event type on 4/21/2017 (EJA). (Entered: 04/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY to Response to Motion re: 41 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE in Opposition re: 41 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Radlink Incorporated. (Vera, Hernan) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting the 42 Stipulation and the deadlines for Plaintiffs' 41 MOTION for Jurisdictional Discovery are modified. Defendant's deadline to file a response is April 10, 2017. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a reply is April 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/6/2017. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Deadlines re Plaintiffs' Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Radlink Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Ashley) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Discovery [Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery] by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting the 39 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' deadline to file and serve a Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery is March 31, 2017. Defendant's deadline to oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery is April 7, 2017. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant's opposition is April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/31/2017. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STIPULATION re: 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery] by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Radlink Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Thomas Hacking in Support of Motion, # 2 Affidavit - Declaration of Wenchao Tao in Support of Motion)(Bowman, Ashley) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting the parties' 36 Stipulation. Defendant's deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be March 13, 2017. Plaintiffs' deadline to oppose any motion filed by Defendant shall be April 3, 2017. Defendant's deadline to reply to any opposition filed by Plaintiffs shall be April 17, 2017. ORDERED that Defendant Radlink, Inc.'s 32 Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/24/2017. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: 35 Amended Complaint [Stipulation & (Proposed) Order Setting Briefing Schedule For Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint] by Radlink Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Ashley) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Radlink Incorporated filed by Debra Blum, Jordan Garst. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Declaration of Santiago Ayala)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Christian Schrecker . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redline Copy of Amended Complaint)(Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE re: Intent to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) by Christian Schrecker . (Thomassen, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Radlink Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tom Hacking, # 2 Declaration of Wenachao Tao, # 3 Declaration of Ashley Bowman)(Bowman, Ashley). *Modified to add Motion part on 1/23/2017* (REW). (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE re: 30 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendant Radlink Incorporated. (Northup, Doug) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 28 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Christian Schrecker. (ATD) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall unseal this case and all documents that have been filed in the case. See document for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/09/2016. (ATD) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              *ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before December 7, 2016, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order to Show Cause setting forth the reasons why, if any, this case, and all previous filings, should remain under seal. If Plaintiff fails to file a response by that date, the Court will rescind the order sealing the case. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/29/2016. (cc: Pla Cnsl/Def Cnsl) (ATD) *Modified to add distribution to docket text on 12/1/2016 (ATD). (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 25 Stipulation. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is January 20, 2017; Plaintiff's deadline to oppose any motion filed by Defendant is February 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/29/2016. (cc: Plaintiff's Cnsl/Def Cnsl) (ATD) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 23 , 24 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (cc: Counsel of Record/BAS) (MAP) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and for Plaintiff to Respond thereto by Radlink Incorporated. (MAP) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Herman Vera on behalf of Radlink Incorporated. (MAP) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ashley D Bowman on behalf of Radlink Incorporated. (MAP) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: 9 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Christian Schrecker. (DLC) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re: 9 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Radlink Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit A) (ATD) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Sealed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (cc: Counsel/BAS) (ATD) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rafey S Balabanian by Christian Schrecker. (ATD) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting the 17 Stipulation. Defendant's deadline to file its opposition to Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is extended to November 4, 2016; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is extended to November 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/01/16. (cc: Pla/Def) (ATD) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: 9 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christian Schrecker. (ATD) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 14 , 15 Sealed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (cc: Counsel of Record/BAS) (MAP) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eve-Lynn Rapp on behalf of Christian Schrecker. (MAP) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin S Thomassen on behalf of Christian Schrecker. (MAP) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            * ORDER granting 12 Stipulation and that the briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 9 ) is modified as follows: 1. Defendant's deadline to file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is extended to October 28, 2016; and 2. Plaintiff's reply in support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is extended to November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/18/16. (LAD) * Modified to add distribution on 10/18/2016 (LAD). cc: Pla counsel; Def counsel (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Extending Briefing Schedule) by Christian Schrecker. (MAP) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 8 Sealed Motion and allowing Plaintiff to file a brief totaling 25 (twenty-five) pages in support of the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/17/16. (cc: Pla's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to 9 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Defendant, having been served with Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 4 ), shall file a response no later than Tuesday, October 18, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than Wednesday, October 19, 2016. The Court will then either rule on the motion or set a hearing. Upon receipt of this order, Plaintiff must immediately contact Defendant and arrange for prompt service of the order on Defendant today by electronic means or in person delivery. (LAD) cc: Pla's counsel) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    *WITHDRAWN BY DOC 22 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christian Schrecker. (LAD) *Modified on 11/15/2016 (DLC)*. (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Oversized Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Christian Schrecker. (LAD) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        * COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX177528 filed by Christian Schrecker. (LAD) * Modified to add text on 10/14/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 1 Sealed Motion and that the Clerk of Court shall file under seal the following lodged documents: 1. Complaint, lodged at Doc. 2 ; 2. Motion for Leave to File Instanter Oversized Brief In Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, lodged at Doc. 3 ; and 3. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, lodged at Doc. 4 . Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/14/16. (LAD) cc: Plaintiff's counsel (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE: Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX177528. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-3511-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (cc: Pla's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              * (Filed at Doc. 9 ) LODGED Proposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re: 1 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Christian Schrecker. (MAP) Modified on 10/14/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                * (Filed at Doc. 8 ) LODGED Proposed Motion for Leave to File Instanter Oversized Brief In Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re: 1 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Christian Schrecker. (MAP) Modified on 10/14/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  * (Filed at Doc. 7 ) LODGED Proposed Complaint re: 1 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Christian Schrecker. (MAP) Modified on 10/14/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Temporarily Seal Case by Christian Schrecker. (MAP) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?