USA v. MASOOD

Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:11-cr-00270
District Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 1:21 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo YOUSUF MASOOD, Defendant (1)

Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained JOHN T. DOYLE +1 908 787 2638 +1 973 475 9138 jd1counsel@gmail.com

Represented by Suite 325

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained KEVIN ARTHUR BUCHAN +1 973 992 5300 kabuchan@walderhayden.com

Represented by Walder Hayden, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 11/16/2011, before Judge GARRETT E. BROWN, JR.. Court Reporter/Transcriber John Stone (973-824-4483). Tape Number: SENTENCE. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (ma) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Yousuf Masood by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Process Receipt and Return Certificate of Service by USA as to YOUSUF MASOOD re 67 Final Order for Forfeiture of Property (jn, ) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Process Receipt and Return, Certificate of Service by USA as to YOUSUF MASOOD re 67 Final Order for Forfeiture of Property (jn, ) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN T. DOYLE appearing for YOUSUF MASOOD Attorney JUSTIN P. WALDER terminated. (DOYLE, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED JUDGMENT as to YOUSUF MASOOD (1), Count 1, Imprisonment for a term of 43 months; Supervised Release for a term of 3 years (36 months) w/ conditions; Restitution of $929,772.19 due immediately; Fine of $75,000 due immediately; Special Assessment of $100.00 due immediately. Ordered deft. to voluntarily surrender to the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons on a date and time to be set by the Bureau of Prisons. Signed by Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr on 12/5/11. (Reason for Amendment: Modification of Restitution Order) (jgb) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Signed by Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr on 11/16/11. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jacob T. Elberg) (jgb) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to YOUSUF MASOOD (1), Count 1, Imprisonment for a term of 43 months; Supervised Release for a term of 3 years (36 months) w/ conditions; Restitution of $929,772.19 due immediately; Fine of $75,000 due immediately; Special Assessment of $100.00 due immediately. Ordered deft. to voluntarily surrender to the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons on a date and time to be set by the Bureau of Prisons. Signed by Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr on 11/21/11. (jgb) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr: Sentencing held on 11/16/2011 for YOUSUF MASOOD (1), Count 1, Imprisonment for a term of 43 months; Supervised Release for a term of 3 years (36 months) w/ conditions; Restitution of $929,772.19 due immediately; Fine of $75,000 due immediately; Special Assessment of $100.00 due immediately. Ordered deft. to voluntarily surrender to the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons on a date and time to be set by the Bureau of Prisons. (Court Reporter/Recorder JOHN STONE.) (jgb) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Faith S. Hochberg no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr on 11/10/2011. (mn, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 4/21/11, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber John K. Stone, Telephone number 973 824 4483. Tape Number: Plea. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber only. (tjg, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr:Telephone Conference as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 10/26/2011. Ordered further submissions due 11/9/11. Ordered sentencings reset to 11/16/11 at 1:00pm, in Newark, NJ before Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown Jr. (ESR: KORCHICK.) (eh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Process Receipt and Return Certificate of Service, Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by USA as to YOUSUF MASOOD re 59 Order for Forfeiture of Property (jn, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Petition and ORDER for action on conditions of Pretrial Release as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 6/20/11. (jn, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to YOUSUF MASOOD.. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 5/26/2011. (msd) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 6/2/11. (jgb) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/21/11. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Plea Agreement Hearing as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 4/21/2011, Plea entered by YOUSUF MASOOD (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 7/27/2011 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Faith S. Hochberg. Ordered bail continued. (Court Reporter/Recorder JOHN STONE.) (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to YOUSUF MASOOD. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PLEA AGREEMENT as to YOUSUF MASOOD. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by YOUSUF MASOOD. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INFORMATION as to YOUSUF MASOOD (1) count(s) 1. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF REFERRAL as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 4/21/11. (jgb) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Time excluded from 3/21/2011 until 5/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/15/2011. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Time excluded from 1/18/2011 until 3/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 1/18/2011. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JUSTIN P. WALDER appearing for YOUSUF MASOOD (WALDER, JUSTIN) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: KEVIN ARTHUR BUCHAN appearing for YOUSUF MASOOD Attorney JOHN T. DOYLE terminated. (BUCHAN, KEVIN) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Time excluded from 11/19/2010 until 1/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/19/2010. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to YOUSUF MASOOD. Time excluded from 9/13/2010 until 11/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/14/2010. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to YOUSUF MASOOD (1), $300,000 Secured by Property.Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/7/2010. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by YOUSUF MASOOD. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN T. DOYLE appearing for YOUSUF MASOOD. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo:Initial Appearance as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 9/7/2010, Defendant Advised of Rights, Bail Hearing as to YOUSUF MASOOD held on 9/7/2010, Waiver of Preliminary Hearing, and Bail Set at $300,000 secured by property. (CD #10-09K, 3:57.) (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order to Seal Case as to YOUSUF MASOOD, MARUK MASOOD, HAMID BHATTI, CARLOS QUIJADA, and HAKIM MUTA MUHAMMAD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/3/2010. (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT as to YOUSUF MASOOD (1), MARUK MASOOD (2), HAMID BHATTI (3), CARLOS QUIJADA (4), HAKIM MUTA MUHAMMAD (5). (kd) [2:10-mj-08214-MCA] (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 98 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?