USA v. Hazer et al
Criminal Case Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cr-00553-HEA-3

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 27, 2020 at 1:28 PM ST (1.4 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Timothy Bateman +1 202 252 7881 +1 314 539 2777 kyle.bateman2@usdoj.gov
Space Gwendolyn E. Carroll +1 315 448 0672 +1 315 448 0954 gwendolyn.e.carroll@usdoj.gov
Space Richard E. Finneran +1 314 539 2183 +1 314 539 2287 richard.finneran@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph Mahfood, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WOLFF AND D'AGROSA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. D'Agrosa +1 314 725 8019 +1 314 725 8443 paul@wolffdagrosa.com
Space William J. Ekiss +1 314 725 8019 +1 314 725 8443 bill@wolffdagrosa.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office St. Louis
Filed 12/22/2016
County St. Louis - County
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 11r
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
Count 12r
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-5800.F
Offense Level 4
Count 13r-16r
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1r
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2r
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7440.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Marshal's Return
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Final Order for Forfeiture of Property
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Marshal's Return on Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Passport Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order (Financial)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Extension
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 statement of reasonsCourt Filing
                                        STATEMENT OF REASONS for Sentence as to defendant Joseph Mahfood Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/21/17. (CLA)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 judgmentCourt Filing
                                          JUDGMENT as to Joseph Mahfood (3), Count(s) 11r, 12r, 13r-16r, 1r, 2r, The deft. pleaded guilty to cts. 1,2,11,12, and 13; cts. 14, 15, and 16 are dismissed; the deft. is sentenced to 3 yrs. probation; special assessment of $500 and restitution in the amt. of $147,450.00. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/21/17. (CLA)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Notice regarding 12.07
                                            NOTICE by Joseph Mahfood of Certification of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07. (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 sentencingCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey:Sentencing as to Joseph Mahfood held on 11/21/2017 ; sentence imposed; see jgm. (Court Reporter:Angela Daley, Angela_Daley@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7978) (FTR Gold: No) (proceedings started: 11:30) (proceedings ended: 11:50) (Defendant Location: bond) (CLA)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Sealed document
                                                MOTIONSealed Document (Carroll, Gwendolyn) Modified on 11/20/2017 (CLA).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                  ACCEPTANCE TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by USA as to Joseph Mahfood (Carroll, Gwendolyn)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                    ACCEPTANCE TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Joseph Mahfood (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 presentence investigation report
                                                      FINAL PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT (including addendum) as to Joseph Mahfood (Attachments: # (1) Letter)(MDH)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 sentencing memorandum
                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM - SEALED by defendant Joseph Mahfood (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Judgment of ForfeitureCourt Filing
                                                          JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE as to Joseph Mahfood Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/17/17. cc: USM (CLA)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 10/17/2017 Preliminary Motion for Order for Forfeiture of Property
                                                            PRELIMINARY MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bateman, Kyle)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                              ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kyle Timothy Bateman appearing for USA. (Bateman, Kyle)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement
                                                                GUILTY PLEA AGREEMENT SUPPLEMENT as to Joseph Mahfood (CLA)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec and Stipulations
                                                                  GUILTY PLEA AGREEMENT by USA, Joseph Mahfood as to Joseph Mahfood (CLA)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Change of Plea Hearing - GuiltyCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey:Change of Plea Hearing as to Joseph Mahfood held on 8/22/2017 as to count(s) 1, 2, 11, 12, and 13. Sentencing set for 11/21/2017 11:00 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. (Court Reporter:A.D.) (FTR Gold: No) (proceedings started: 11:10) (proceedings ended: 11:30) (Defendant Location: bond) (CLA)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Joseph Mahfood - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Change of Plea hearing is set in this matter for Tuesday, August 22, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/17. (KJS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                        ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Gwendolyn Eleanor Carroll appearing for USA. (Carroll, Gwendolyn)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial setting as to Defendants Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, and Joseph Mahfood, are RESET to September 18, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/16/17. (KJS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            Docket Text ORDER as to Joseph Mahfood Re: [91] MOTION for Joinder in Defendant Douglas Hazer's Motion to Continue Trial by Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit speedy trial waiver)(D'Agrosa, Paul) filed by Joseph Mahfood ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/14/17. (CLA)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017, Terminated: 6/14/2017 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                              MOTION for Joinder in Defendant Douglas Hazer's Motion to Continue Trial by Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit speedy trial waiver)(D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if the co-defendants in this matter wish to join in defendant Samuel Douglas Hazers Motion to Continue [Doc. #88], each defendant is to file with the Court a motion indicating his or her request to join in the motion to continue the trial setting as well as a fully executed waiver of speedy trial by Wednesday, June 19, 2017. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/12/17. (CLA)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Cases as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. (See order for full details.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/6/17. (KJS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MOTION STATUS HEARING AND TRIAL SETTING as to Joseph Mahfood. This matter came before the Court for an evidentiary hearing on pretrial motions. The defendant appeared with counsel and after being advised of the right to file motions and to have an evidentiary hearing, defendant knowingly and voluntarily waived his right to file or proceed on pretrial motions and to an evidentiary hearing. There being no outstanding motions in this matter, the evidentiary hearing is canceled. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 6/5/17. (CLA)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)Court Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker:In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions) as to Joseph Mahfood held on 6/5/2017 Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. (FTR Gold Operator initials:K Shirley) (FTR Gold: Yes) (proceedings started: 10:06 am) (proceedings ended: 10:10 am) (Defendant Location: Bond) (KJS)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 A Docket Text Order with SchedulesCourt Filing
                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER as to Joseph Mahfood - Pretrial Motion Status Hearing is set for June 5, 2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/30/2017. (GGB)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions
                                                                                          WAIVER of Filing Pretrial Motions by Joseph Mahfood (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER AND SPEEDY TRIAL FINDING - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for an Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions [Doc. #[73]] is GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including May 24, 2017 to file any pretrial motions or waiver of motions. The Government shall have until May 31, 2017 to respond. No additional extension will be granted without reasonable cause. If Defendant fails to file pretrial motions or a waiver of pretrial motions, the Court will set the matter for a hearing. (Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 5/24/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 4/27/17. (KJS)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 4/27/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File pretrial motions by Joseph Mahfood. (Ekiss, William)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [55] Request for Discovery by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Motion for ExtensionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER AND SPEEDY TRIAL FINDING - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants second motions for extension of time [Doc. #[62], Doc. #[63]] are GRANTED. Defendants shall have to and including April 24, 2017 to file any pretrial motions or waiver of motions. The Government shall have until May 1, 2017 to respond. If Defendants fail to file pretrial motions or a waiver of pretrial motions, the Court will set the matter for a hearing. (Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 4/24/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 4/4/17. (KJS)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Motion for Extension
                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of time to file pretrial motions by Joseph Mahfood. (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 55 Request for Discovery by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017, Terminated: 3/22/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [55] Request for Discovery by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Passport Notice
                                                                                                          PASSPORT NOTICE as to Joseph Mahfood has been filed. Notice of Court Order: Order File Date: 12/27/16. The above-named defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport during the pendency of this action. Passport 441975298 surrendered to U.S. District Court on 12/27/16. (KJS)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood re [40] MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 2/8/17. (CLA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017, Terminated: 2/8/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/23/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue ; Arraignment and Set Hearing for Inquiry by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/27/2017 SEALED MOTION
                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/23/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion by USA as to Samuel Douglas Hazer, Carol Jean Hazer, Joseph Mahfood. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Order on Motion for ExtensionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER AND SPEEDY TRIAL FINDING - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants First Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions [Doc. #[24]] is GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including April 4, 2017 to file any pretrial motions or waiver of motions. The Government shall have until April 11, 2017 to respond. Due to the length of this extension, no additional extension will be granted without good cause. If Defendant fails to file pretrial motions or a waiver of pretrial motions, the Court will set the matter for a hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a status report with the Court regarding the prospect of joint representation and potential conflicts no later than March 6, 2017. Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 4/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 1/17/17. (KJS)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017, Terminated: 1/17/2017 Motion for Extension
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of time to file pretrial motions by Joseph Mahfood. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment speedy trial waiver)(D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Order Concerning Pretrial MotionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER CONCERNING PRETRIAL MOTIONS as to Joseph Mahfood. Forthwith each party may propound to opposing party and may file w/the court any request for pretrial disclosure of evidence or information not later than 1/10/17. The parties shall respond to any such request for pretrial disclosure not later than 1/17/17. Counsel for defendant to file with the court a memorandum if defendant chooses not to file any pretrial motions not later than 2/3/17. Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 1/4/17. (KJS)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker:Arraignment: Parties present for arraignment. Defendant waives reading of indictment, plea of not guilty as to Joseph Mahfood (3) Count 1r,2r,11r,12r,13r-16r held on 1/3/2017. Oral motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions is granted. Attorney William J. Ekiss for Joseph Mahfood added. Criminal Pretrial Motion due by 2/3/2017. (FTR Gold Operator initials: G. Bales) (FTR Gold: Yes) (proceedings started: 2:40 PM) (proceedings ended: 2:47 PM) (Defendant Location: BOND) (GGB)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Bail Report
                                                                                                                              BAIL REPORT(FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Joseph Mahfood. (LMG)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Docket Text OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Docket Text ORDER as to Joseph Mahfood resetting the arraignment for 2:30 p.m. on Tuesday, January 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/28/2016. (ESF)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Receipt
                                                                                                                                  Receipt 4644061687 in the amount of $0.00 for PASSPORT on behalf of Joseph Mahfood (CCAM)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Receipt
                                                                                                                                    Receipt 4644061687 in the amount of $0.00 for PASSPORT on behalf of Joseph Mahfood (CCAM)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 bondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Appearance Bond Entered as to defendant Joseph Mahfood in amount of $ O/R, Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/27/16. (KJS)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release by Defendant Joseph Mahfood. as to Joseph Mahfood (3) O/R Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/27/16. (KJS)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Initial Appearance/Rule 5Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker:Initial Appearance/Rule 5 as to Joseph Mahfood held on 12/27/2016 Joseph Mahfood (3) O/R. Defendant given copy of: Indictment. Defendant to retain: Cousel. Pretrial Services bail report received on: 12/27/16. Pretrial Services Officer: Lauren.( Arraignment set for 1/3/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker.), Bond Execution as to Joseph Mahfood held on 12/27/2016 bond executed in the amount of: O/R (FTR Gold Operator initials:K Shirley) (FTR Gold: Yes) (proceedings started: 11:19 am) (proceedings ended: 11:27 am) (Defendant Location: Bond) (KJS)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                            ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: by Paul J. D'Agrosa on behalf of Joseph Mahfood (D'Agrosa, Paul)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                              Arrest of defendant Joseph Mahfood date of arrest: 12/27/16 (KJS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard E. Finneran appearing for USA. (Finneran, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
                                                                                                                                                  Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Indictment-RedactedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on 12/22/2016 to Judge Catherine D. Perry by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker as to Samuel Douglas Hazer (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2 is now count 2r. Former count 3 is now count 3r. Former count 4 is now count 4r. Former count 5 is now count 5r. Former count 6 is now count 6r. Carol Jean Hazer (2): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2 is now count 2r. Former count 3 is now count 3r. Former count 7-10 is now count 7r-10r. Joseph Mahfood (3): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2 is now count 2r. Former count 11 is now count 11r. Former count 12 is now count 12r. Former count 13-16 is now count 13r-16r.. (DJO)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 indictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT returned in open court on 12/22/2016 to Judge Catherine D. Perry by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker as to Samuel Douglas Hazer (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, Carol Jean Hazer (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 7-10, Joseph Mahfood (3) count(s) 1, 2, 11, 12, 13-16. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION). (DJO)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?