Hensel Phelps Construction Co v. Cooper Carry Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 16-7128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2018 at 10:51 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207903750 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE [1662016] to withdraw attorney Leila Kimberly Mongan who represented Hensel Phelps Construction Co. in 16-7128 filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 02/17/2017 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207903655 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1661972] for response [1661926-2] filed by Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207903556 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE [1661926] to motion to participate as amicus curiae [1660247-2] filed by Cooper Carry Inc. [Service Date: 02/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 376 Words. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207900664 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1660249] filed by The Associated General Contractors of America and Associated General Contractors of Metropolitan Washington, D.C. [Service Date: 02/08/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3382. [16-7128]--[MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--Edited 02/08/2017 by LMC] (Kiernan, Paul)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207900658 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION [1660247] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The Associated General Contractors of America and Associated General Contractors of Metropolitian Washington, D.C. [Service Date: 02/08/2017 ] [16-7128]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 02/08/2017 by LMC] (Kiernan, Paul)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207900623 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION [1660227] for leave to file brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/21/2017) filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. (Service Date: 02/08/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3382 words. [16-7128]--[Edited 02/08/2017 by LMC] (Kiernan, Paul)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207900612 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1660221] filed by Paul J. Kiernan and co-counsel Stephen B. Shapiro on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128]--[Edited 02/08/2017 by LMC] (Kiernan, Paul)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207900037 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CLERK'S ORDER [1659866] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 04/21/2017. [16-7128]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898050 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPENDIX [1658808] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 02/01/2017 ] [16-7128] (Mongan, Leila)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898047 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPELLANT BRIEF [1658806] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 02/01/2017 ] Length of Brief: 8196 words. [16-7128] (Mongan, Leila)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207886797 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CLERK'S ORDER [1652726] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/01/2017. APPENDIX due 02/01/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/03/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/17/2017 [16-7128]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207886797 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CLERK'S ORDER [1652726] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/01/2017. APPENDIX due 02/01/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/03/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/17/2017 [16-7128]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207880258 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1649157] filed by Catherine E. Stetson and co-counsel Leila K. Mongan on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Mongan, Leila)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207880258 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1649157] filed by Catherine E. Stetson and co-counsel Leila K. Mongan on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Mongan, Leila)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207878009 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1647997] submitted by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207878009 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1647997] submitted by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207878003 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1647995] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207878003 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1647995] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877997 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1647993] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877997 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1647993] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877992 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1647991] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877992 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1647991] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877989 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT [1647987] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877989 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT [1647987] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877986 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647981] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877986 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647981] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877172 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647569] filed by Cooper Carry Inc. [Service Date: 11/23/2016 ] [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877172 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647569] filed by Cooper Carry Inc. [Service Date: 11/23/2016 ] [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877109 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1647541] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker and co-counsel James F. Lee, Jr. on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207877109 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1647541] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker and co-counsel James F. Lee, Jr. on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207872847 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645233] filed by Catherine E. Stetson on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207872847 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645233] filed by Catherine E. Stetson on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207872545 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645036] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207872545 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645036] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868756 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CLERK'S ORDER [1643110] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/12/2016. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/12/2016 [16-7128]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868756 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CLERK'S ORDER [1643110] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/12/2016. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/12/2016 [16-7128]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868750 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          LETTER [1643109] sent regarding attorney membership to Brian N. Krulick for Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. Application for Admission due 11/28/2016. [16-7128]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868750 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            LETTER [1643109] sent regarding attorney membership to Brian N. Krulick for Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. Application for Admission due 11/28/2016. [16-7128]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868744 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL [1643107] filed seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01961-RJL. filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7128. [16-7128]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207868744 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL [1643107] filed seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01961-RJL. filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7128. [16-7128]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207886797 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1652726] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/01/2017. APPENDIX due 02/01/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/03/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/17/2017 [16-7128]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207880258 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1649157] filed by Catherine E. Stetson and co-counsel Leila K. Mongan on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Mongan, Leila)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207878009 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1647997] submitted by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207878003 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1647995] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877997 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1647993] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877992 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1647991] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877989 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT [1647987] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877986 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647981] filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877172 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1647569] filed by Cooper Carry Inc. [Service Date: 11/23/2016 ] [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877109 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1647541] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker and co-counsel James F. Lee, Jr. on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207872847 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645233] filed by Catherine E. Stetson on behalf of Appellant Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. [16-7128] (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207872545 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1645036] filed by Jonathan C. Shoemaker on behalf of Appellee Cooper Carry Inc.. [16-7128] (Shoemaker, Jonathan)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207868756 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1643110] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/12/2016. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/28/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/12/2016 [16-7128]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207868750 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            LETTER [1643109] sent regarding attorney membership to Brian N. Krulick for Hensel Phelps Construction Co.. Application for Admission due 11/28/2016. [16-7128]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207868744 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL [1643107] filed seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01961-RJL. filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7128. [16-7128]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?