Suzette Wood, et al v. Midland Funding, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-2206

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2017 at 12:21 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013002195 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
****LOCKED - Incorrect filing**** LETTER filed by Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Barbara King, Suzette Wood, Denise Ash, Edward Korbinski, Daniel Prough, Eddie Babcock, Russell Rulason, Tina White and David Bryant regarding supplemental authority. Certificate of Service: 02/27/2017. ****COUNSEL directed to refile document as an addiitonal citation****--[Edited 02/27/2017 by PJE] (ABP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION filed : AFFIRMED, decision not for publication. Eugene E. Siler , Jr., (Authoring) Circuit Judge; Karen Nelson Moore, Circuit Judge and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge. (KSF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Appellants Barbara King, et al, Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellee Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA and Mr. Aaron L. Vorce for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC before Siler,Circuit Judge; Moore,Circuit Judge and Griffin,Circuit Judge. (KSC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Barbara King, Suzette Wood, Denise Ash, Edward Korbinski, Daniel Prough, Eddie Babcock, Russell Rulason, Tina White and David Bryant. Certificate of Service: 02/27/2017. (ABP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Appellants Barbara King, Suzette Wood, Denise Ash, Edward Korbinski, Daniel Prough, Eddie Babcock, Russell Rulason, Tina White and David Bryant. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2017. (ABP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron L. Vorce for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2017. (ALV)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellee Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2017. (JCG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, March 8, 2017. (LAG)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006012846384 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  [DISREGARD. A corrected form has been filed] APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC by Aaron L. Vorce. Certificate of Service: 09/08/2016. --[Edited 09/09/2016 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (ALV)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Appellants Barbara King, Suzette Wood, Denise Ash, Edward Korbinski, Daniel Prough, Eddie Babcock, Russell Rulason, Tina White and David Bryant. Certificate of Service:11/23/2016. (ABP)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      JOINT APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA, and Mr. Aaron L. Vorce for Midland Funding, LLC. Certificate of Service:11/09/2016. Argument Request: requested.--[Edited 11/09/2016 by KSF] (JCG)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Arvid B. Perrin for Barbara King, Suzette Wood, Denise Ash, Edward Korbinski, Daniel Prough, Eddie Babcock, Russell Rulason, Tina White and David Bryant. Certificate of Service:09/29/2016. Argument Request: requested. (ABP)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron L. Vorce for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC Certificate of Service: 09/08/2016. (ALV)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC by Theodore W. Seitz. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2016. (TWS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Midland Funding, LLC by Aaron L. Vorce. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2016. (ALV)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellee Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA Certificate of Service: 09/07/2016. (JCG)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA by Jeffrey C. Gerish. Certificate of Service: 09/07/2016. (JCG)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?