Bigler v. U.S. Bank Trust
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-04194

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 1:06 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/31/2017. Mailed to pro se party Jody Ann and Everett Bigler by regular mail. (ms)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?