Ji Chang Son et al v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:16-cv-02282-JVS-KES
District Judge James V. Selna, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 20, 2020 at 9:47 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ali Jarrahi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Ghodrat Khansari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Ji Chang Son, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benedict O Kwon +1 949 725 4165 +1 949 725 4100 bkwon@sycr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen L Ram +1 949 725 4000 +1 949 823 5102 sram@sycr.com
No Logo K. M. S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benedict O Kwon +1 949 725 4165 +1 949 725 4100 bkwon@sycr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen L Ram +1 949 725 4000 +1 949 823 5102 sram@sycr.com
No Logo Madhusudhana Shastrula, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Michael Tomko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Rhea Gosling +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 kgosling@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penelope Athene Preovolos +1 415 268 7187 +1 415 268 7522 ppreovolos@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James Wilson +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 dwilson@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Rhea Gosling +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 kgosling@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penelope Athene Preovolos +1 415 268 7187 +1 415 268 7522 ppreovolos@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James Wilson +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 dwilson@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean P. Gates +1 626 508 1717 +1 626 508 1730 sgates@charislex.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean P. Gates +1 626 508 1717 +1 626 508 1730 sgates@charislex.com
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Stipulation to Dismiss Case
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by PLAINTIFFS K. M. S., Ji Chang Son.(Jung, Youngwoon)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [102] by Judge James V. Selna. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss June 17, 2019. Deadline for Defendant to file Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss June 24, 2019. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss June 17, 2019 July 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (es)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint [100] filed by PLAINTIFFS K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jung, Youngwoon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint [100] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Proposed Order)(Gates, Sean)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019, Terminated: 6/17/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Order) (Gates, Sean)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Amended Complaint/Petition
          FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tesla, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition[80], filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son(Jung, Youngwoon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
            MINUTES OF Order Regarding Defendant Tesla, Inc's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 91] Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court's tentative ruling is issued. Counsel make their arguments. The Court GRANTS the Defendant's motion and rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs third, fifth, ninth, and tenth causes of action are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted 15 days to amend. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
              LREF
              Blank 97 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
              (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [91] set for 04/08/2019 at 1:30 PM is CONTINUED to 4/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                LREF
                Legal Document 96 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [91] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Gates, Sean)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                  OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [91] filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit)(Jung, Youngwoon)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [93] by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply Regarding Tesla's Motion to Dismiss, and good cause appearing, hereby APPROVES the Stipulation and ORDERS that the following schedule applies: Deadline for Plaintiffs to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 3/18/2019. Deadline for Defendant to file Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss 3/25/2019. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 4/8/2019 at 1:30 p.m. (es)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [91] filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jung, Youngwoon)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019, Terminated: 6/17/2019 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
                      REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Penelope A. Preovolos as counsel of record filed by defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Preovolos, Penelope)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 2/18/2019, Entered: 2/18/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Order) (Gates, Sean)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/3/2019, Entered: 2/3/2019 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                        ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (kt)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR TEN (10) DAY EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Tesla, Inc. is hereby granted a ten (10) day extension to respond to the Third Amended Complaint filed in this action, and will submit its response no later than February 18, 2019. (es)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas J Beteta counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Adding Douglas J. Beteta as counsel of record for Defendant Tesla, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attorney Douglas J Beteta added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Beteta, Douglas)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 18, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition[80] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gates, Sean)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 2/3/2019 Scheduling Conference - optional html formCourt Filing
                                MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer. Court sets the following case management dates with the agreement of counsel Discovery cut-off 10/14/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM; and the Jury Trial set for 1/28/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement) (kt)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                  JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 8 days, filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son.. (Jung, Youngwoon)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. [83] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The case management conference set for January 14, 2019 at 8:00 a.m. is continued to January 28, 2019 at 8:00 a.m., at which time the Court will hold a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference. 2. The parties shall submit a Rule 26(f) Joint Report by January 22, 2019. (es)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Stipulation to Continue
                                      Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference from 1/14/19 to 1/28/19 filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gates, Sean)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Order on Request to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING [63] Plaintiff K.M.S. Request to Substitute Attorney Yohan Lee, Retained Counsel as attorney of record instead of Attorney Richard D. McCune, Esq.; David C. Wright, Esq. (es)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Order on Request to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING [62] Plaintiff Son Ji Chang Request to Substitute Attorney Yohan Lee, Retained Counsel as attorney of record instead of Richard D. McCune, Esq.; David C. Wright, Esq. (es) Modified on 1/10/2019 (es).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                            THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tesla, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition, [40], filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son(Jung, Youngwoon)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' FILING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Ji Chang Son and K.M.S., a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem Yun Soo Oh's ("Plaintiffs") Proposed Third Amended Complaint Shall be Filed by Plaintiff and is deemed filed and served on the date of electronic filing with the Court. 2. Defendant Tesla, Inc. ("Defendant") has thirty (30) days to file a response to the Third Amended Complaint. [77] (es)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Stipulation to Dismiss Party
                                                Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Kenneth Helman filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Helman.(Wright, David)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                  STIPULATION to AMEND filed by PLAINTIFFS K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) [PROPOSED] ORDER, # (2) EXHIBIT A (PROPOSED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT) TO JOINT STIPULATION)(Jung, Youngwoon)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Stipulation to Dismiss Party
                                                  Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Bridgette Waldemar, Kenneth Helman, Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ali Jarrahi, Michael Tomko, Ghodrat Khansari filed by Plaintiffs Bridgette Waldemar, Kenneth Helman, Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ali Jarrahi, Michael Tomko, Ghodrat Khansari.(Attorney David C Wright added to party Kenneth Helman(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Bridgette Waldemar(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference [74] The case management conference previously set for November 19, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to January 14, 2019, at 8:00 a.m. (See order for further details.) (es)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Stipulation to Continue
                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference from November 19, 2018 to January 14, 2019 filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING CONCLUSION OF MEDIATION DISCUSSIONS [72] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before November 13, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for October 22, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to November 19, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                        STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions. [70] IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before October 16, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for September 24, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to October 22, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                            STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions [68] The scheduling conference previously set for August 20, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to September 24, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions. [66] IT IS ORDERED THAT: The dates set forth in in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. The scheduling conference shall be continued to August 20, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                    STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions [64]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before July 10, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for May 21, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to July 16, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 08:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.) (twdb)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                        STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2019 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
                                                                          REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Yohan Lee in place of attorney David C. Wright filed by plaintiff K. M. S.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Attorney Youngwoon Jung added to party K. M. S.(pty:pla)) (Jung, Youngwoon)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018, Terminated: 1/10/2019 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
                                                                            REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Yohan Lee in place of attorney David C. Wright filed by plaintiff Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Attorney Youngwoon Jung added to party Ji Chang Son(pty:pla)) (Jung, Youngwoon)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Rhea Gosling counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. Kimberly R. Gosling is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Tesla, Inc. and Tesla Motors, Inc. (Gosling, Kimberly)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions by Judge James V. Selna. Having reviewed the Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions [59], and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before May 15, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for April 16, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to May 21, 2018. (dro)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                  STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Rhea Gosling counsel for Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Kimberly R. Gosling is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant TESLA, INC.. (Gosling, Kimberly)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING CONCLUSION OF MEDIATION DISCUSSIONS [56] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before April 10, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for March 19, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to April 16, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                        STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel James Wilson counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Anderson Zeigler P.C.. Changing e-mail to dwilson@andersonzeigler.com. Filed by Defendant Daniel James Wilson. (Wilson, Daniel)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel James Wilson counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Daniel James Wilson. (Wilson, Daniel)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, to Stay Case Pending Conclusions of Mediation Discussions[52], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before March 13, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for February 12, 2018, at 8:00 a.m., shall be continued to March 19, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING CONCLUSION OF MEDIATION DISCUSSIONS [50] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before February 6,2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for January 16, 2018, at 8:30 a.m., shall be continued to February 12, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (es)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussion by Judge James V. Selna. Having reviewed the Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions [48], and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall remain stayed. 2. The parties shall submit a report to the Court on or before January 10, 2018, regarding the outcome of mediation discussions. 3. The scheduling conference previously set for December 18, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., shall be continued to January 16, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (dro)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Conclusion of Mediation Discussions filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Mediation [46]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The dates set forth in the current scheduling order and all discovery shall be stayed. 2. The parties shall complete court-ordered private mediation on December 6, 2017, and shall submit a report to the Court on or before December 13, 2017, regarding the outcome of the mediation. 3. The parties shall appear for a scheduling conference on December 18, 2017 at 11 a.m. (mt)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, having considered the parties' Supplemental Joint Proposed Dates, filed June 2, 2017 (Dkt. No. [35], 35-1), and good cause appearing, hereby approves the Supplemental Joint Proposed Dates and orders that the following schedule applies: (see document for details). (dro)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT PROPOSED PRETRIAL DATES [Dkt. No. 35, 35-1] re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan, [35] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Answer
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, [40] with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc..(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT TESLA MOTORS, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDEDCOMPLAINT [41] by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Teslas deadline to respond to the Second Amended Complaint is extended until 30 days from the filing of the Second Amended Complaint, to and including July 27, 2017. (es)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tesla, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, [25], filed by Plaintiffs Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ali Jarrahi, K. M. S., Michael Tomko, Ji Chang Son, Ghodrat Khansari, Kenneth Helman, Bridgette Waldemar(Attorney Richard D McCune added to party Kenneth Helman(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune added to party Bridgette Waldemar(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian Lee Hazen on behalf of Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Attorney Brian Lee Hazen added to party Tesla, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hazen, Brian)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/19/2017 at 1:34 p.m. re Transcript [37] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/19/2017 at 1:34 p.m.****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 7/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2017. (dhs)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Order on Motion to dismiss caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [26]. Plaintiffs have twenty days to file an amended pleading. (mba)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                  JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (SUPPLEMENTAL) ; estimated length of trial 15-25 Court Days, filed by Plaintiffs Ali Jarrahi, Ghodrat Khansari, K. M. S., Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ji Chang Son, Michael Tomko.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Pretrial Dates)(Wright, David)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (kt)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Scheduling Conference - optional html form
                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 11/6/2018 at 8:30 AM. The Court directs counsel to meet, confer and submit, within 7 days, a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the remainder of the case management dates as referenced on Exhibit A of the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference (See Document for Further Details and Deadlines) Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (kt)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Motion Hearing with html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court takes the Defendant's [26] MOTION to Dismiss Case under submission. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (kt)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                          JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-25 Court days, filed by Plaintiffs Ali Jarrahi, Ghodrat Khansari, K. M. S., Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ji Chang Son, Michael Tomko.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Schedule of Pretrial Dates, # (2) Exhibit B - List of Tesla, Inc.'s U.S. Subsidiaries)(Wright, David)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                            REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike[26] filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike[26] filed by Plaintiffs Ali Jarrahi, Ghodrat Khansari, K. M. S., Madhusudhana Shastrula, Ji Chang Son, Michael Tomko. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Ali Jarrahi(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Ghodrat Khansari(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Madhusudhana Shastrula(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Michael Tomko(pty:pla))(Wright, David)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply Regarding Tesla's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike and to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference [27]. Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike is due April 24, 2017. Defendants Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike is due May 8, 2017. The hearing on defendant's Motion to Dismiss is continued to May 19, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Parties Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference is continued to May 19, 2017 at 1:30 pm.m. (es)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply Regarding Tesla's Motion to Dismiss and or Strike and to Continue Rule 26(F) Conference)(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 6/7/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Defendant Tesla Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and or Strike) (Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1], filed by Plaintiffs Ji Chang Son, K. M. S., Ghodrat Khansari, Madhusudhana Shastrula, Michael Tomko, Ali Jarrahi(Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Ghodrat Khansari(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Madhusudhana Shastrula(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Ali Jarrahi(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Michael Tomko(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation Filing First Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond, and Continuing Scheduling Conference [23]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs shall file a First Amended Complaint on or before March 1, 2017; Defendant's shall file its response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on or before March 31, 2017; Scheduling Conference continued to 5/8/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (mt)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, re Stipulation Filing First Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond, and Continuing Scheduling Conference 23 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs shall file a First Amended Complaint on or before March 1, 2017; Defendant's shall file its response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on or before March 31, 2017; Scheduling Conference continued to 5/8/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (mt) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1], Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ji Chang Son answer now due 3/31/2017; K. M. S. answer now due 3/31/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1], Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 4/3/2017 to 5/8/2017 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only[21] filed by Plaintiffs Ji Chang Son; K. M. S.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wright, David)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.'s Notice of Name Change filed by Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING RULE 26(F) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/27/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                                                                                                                    INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Vacating Local Rule 23-3 Deadline for Filing of Class Certification Motion, re Stipulation [17] (mt)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Vacating Local Rule 23-3 Deadline for Filing of Class Certification Motion, re Stipulation 17 (mt) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Stipulation to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Vacate LOCAL RULE 23-3 DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION filed by Plaintiffs K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kimberly Rhea Gosling on behalf of Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (Attorney Kimberly Rhea Gosling added to party Tesla Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gosling, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tesla Motors, Inc. answer now due 2/24/2017, filed by defendants Tesla Motors, Inc..(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel James Wilson on behalf of Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (Attorney Daniel James Wilson added to party Tesla Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wilson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Penelope A Preovolos on behalf of Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (Attorney Penelope A Preovolos added to party Tesla Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Preovolos, Penelope)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean P Gates counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. Adding Sean Gates as counsel of record for Tesla Motors, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attorney Sean P Gates added to party Tesla Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gates, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ji Chang Son, K. M. S., upon Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. served on 1/4/2017, answer due 1/25/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez c/o CT Corporation System, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian ad LitemCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, GRANTING [6] PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Yun Soo Oh as Guardian ad Litem for K.M.S. (es)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, GRANTING 6 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Yun Soo Oh as Guardian ad Litem for K.M.S. (es) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                            21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) [1] as to Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016, Terminated: 1/4/2017 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION for Appointment of Yun Soo Oh as Guardian ad Litem for K.M.S. filed by Plaintiff Ji Chang Son. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Ji Chang Son re Consumer Legal Remedies Act Venue filed by Plaintiff Ji Chang Son (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Summons Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), [1] filed by Plaintiffs Yun Soo Oh, K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Yun Soo Oh, K. M. S., Ji Chang Son. (McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19126133 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ji Chang Son, Yun Soo Oh, K. M. S.. (Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Yun Soo Oh(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party K. M. S.(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Ji Chang Son(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 473 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?