Purcell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02357
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 11:13 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Barbara Purcell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Paul Kolker +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4677 kolker@whafh.com
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter R. Dolan, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Lane, Defendant
No Logo Banyan Equity Management, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Columbia Partners, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. ( signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska ) (kw) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Loretta A. Preska . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Gustavo Bruckner, Lawrence P. Kolker, Fred Taylor Isquith . (gmo) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 434420. (dle) (Entered: 03/29/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 18 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?