Harr v. WRAL-5 News
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-00001

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2020 at 5:41 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Exhibit Disposal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/8/2017. (Collins, S.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Response to Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Recusal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Self-Representation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None notice of filing
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?