United States v. Sealed 1
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-mj-07713

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2018 at 10:51 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Michelle Griswold +1 212 637 1205 +1 212 637 2443 andrea.griswold@usdoj.gov
Space A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
No Logo Irfan Amanat, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Adam Silverman +1 212 792 4911 +1 212 792 4946 benjamin.patelshellowllp@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill R. Shellow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill R. Shellow +1 212 792 4911 +1 212 792 4946 jrs@shellowlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sarita Kedia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Retained Sarita Kedia +1 212 681 0202 +1 212 614 0202 skedia@kedialaw.com
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Irfan Amanat in amount of $1.5 Million. Co-signed by 3 financially responsible persons. Secured by $250,000 cash or property. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/District of New Jersey. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Strict pretrial supervision. Electronic monitoring. GPS. Deft to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: Signature of 2 FRP and wife; remaining conditions to be met by: 12/16/16. Mr. Amanat's wife Fatima Sami to sign as moral suasion. Other co-signors on 12/5/16 to be Nasrgen Amanat and Afzal Amanat. Third financially responsible co-signor to be interviewed by AUSA and co-sign bond by 12/16/16. Residence to be maintained at 68 Windsor Dr. Pine Brook, N.J 07058. Must return to Pre-trial Services at 9:00 a.m. on 12/6/16 5th Floor, Room 550 for fitting of electronic monitoring device. Electronic monitoring without prejudice to apply for it to be ended if Pre-trial services recommends that it is no longer necessary. No contact with victims/witnesses. (gq) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker:Initial Appearance as to Irfan Amanat held on 12/5/2016. Deft appears with atty Sarita Kedia. AUSA Andrea M. Griswold present for the gov't. Deft released on own recognizance. $1.5 Million PRB. 3 FRP. Secured by $250,000 cash or property. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/District of New Jersey. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Strict pretrial supervision. Electronic monitoring. GPS. Deft to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: Signature of 2 FRP and wife; remaining conditions to be met by: 12/16/16. Mr. Amanat's wife Fatima Sami to sign as moral suasion. Other co-signors on 12/5/16 to be Nasrgen Amanat and Afzal Amanat. Third financially responsible co-signor to be interviewed by AUSA and co-sign bond by 12/16/16. Residence to be maintained at 68 Windsor Dr. Pine Brook, N.J 07058. Must return to Pre-trial Services at 9:00 a.m. on 12/6/16 5th Floor, Room 550 for fitting of electronic monitoring device. Electronic monitoring without prejudice to apply for it to be ended if Pre-trial services recommends that it is no longer necessary. No contact with victims/witnesses. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 1/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (gq) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarita Kedia appearing for Irfan Amanat. (gq) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        SEALED COMPLAINT as to Irfan Amanat (1) in violation of 15 U.S.C. 78j(b), 78ff; 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5; 18 U.S.C. 371, 1343,1349 & 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (gq) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 294 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?