Brown v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03231
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2017 at 5:49 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chayrmar Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 13-R-0944

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chayrmar Brown
v.
No Logo C.O. Acosta, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Washington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 amoe@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 amoe@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Commissioner Dora B. Schriro, Defendant
No Logo Warden Luis Rivera, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alison Moe dated 10/8/2013 re: Counsel for defendants write to notify the Court that the parties have reached a settlement agreement. Document filed by Acosta, City of New York, Luis Rivera, Washington.(tn) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. The conference scheduled for November 22, 2013, is adjourned. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/8/2013) (tn) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 9/25/2013 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Chayrmar Brown. New Address: 13-R-0944, Livingston Correctional Facility, P. O. Box 91, Sonyea, NY, 14556. (man) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: that the Warden or other official in charge of the Livingston Correctional Facility produce inmate Chayrmar Brown, Inmate No. 13-R-0944, at 3:15 p.m. on November 22, 2013, at a suitable location within Livingston Correctional Facility equipped witha telephone, for purposes of participating in a conference by telephone with the Court and defense counsel in the above-referenced matter. If this time and date presents an inconvenience, the Warden or the Warden's designee should promptly inform Chambers by calling (212) 805-0162. Defense counsel must (1) transmit this Order to the Warden forthwith; and (2) contact the Livingston Correctional Facility to arrange the call and to determine the telephone number at which Plaintiff will be reachable at the above time and date. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/25/2013) *** See 16 Order and Notice of Initial Conference. (tn) Modified on 10/1/2013 (tn). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: that by October 25, 2013, Plaintiff shall submit a letter to the Court and the New York City Law Department containing any additional details he may have to assist in identifying Defendant Acosta. Such details may include a physical description and additional information about his or her role in incidents at issue in this case. Initial case management conference set for 11/22/2013 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Each party may submit a letter no longer than 2 pages by November 11, 2013, addressing discovery it may need and any specific issues it intends to raise at the conference. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/25/2013) (tn) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to C.O. Acosta. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 7/23/13. Document filed by Chayrmar Brown. (sc) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to C.O. Washington. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 7/23/13. Document filed by Chayrmar Brown. (sc) Modified on 8/2/2013 (sc). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Washington waiver sent on 7/31/2013, answer due 9/30/2013. Document filed by Washington. (Pinnock, Nadene) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York waiver sent on 7/26/2013, answer due 9/24/2013. Document filed by City of New York. (Moe, Alison) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to CO Washington, CO Acosta. Document filed by Acosta, Washington. (Pinnock, Nadene) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Luis Rivera waiver sent on 6/13/2013, answer due 8/12/2013; Dora B. Schriro waiver sent on 6/13/2013, answer due 8/12/2013. Document filed by Luis Rivera; Dora B. Schriro. (Pinnock, Nadene) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiffs claims against Commissioner Schriro and Warden Rivera without prejudice for failure to state a claim. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to renewal. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket number 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to notify the New York City Department of Correction andthe New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants City ofNew York, and Correction Officers Acosta and Washington of West 17 lower at AMKC waive service of summons. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Waiver of Service due by 7/11/2013. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/4/2013) (cd) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 5/17/2013. (laq) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/17/2013) (sbr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Chayrmar Brown.(laq) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    COMPLAINT against Acosta, City of New York, Luis Rivera, Dora B. Schriro, Washington. Document filed by Chayrmar Brown.(laq) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Chayrmar Brown.(laq) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?