John Shaw v. Experian Information Solutions
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-56587

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 19, 2019 at 8:43 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE ISSUED.(MMS, MDS and GAD) [10944667] (RL) [Entered: 07/17/2018 09:10 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and GERSHWIN A. DRAIN) The panel has unanimously voted to deny the petition for panel rehearing. Judge Smith voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc, and Judge Schroeder and Judge Drain so recommended. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge of the court has requested a vote on it. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc are DENIED. [10934554] (OC) [Entered: 07/09/2018 09:33 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/29/2018 opinion). Date of service: 06/12/2018. [10905907] [16-56587] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected petition. 6/13/2018 by TYL] (Cento, Guerino) [Entered: 06/12/2018 01:53 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        FILED OPINION (MARY M. SCHROEDER, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and GERSHWIN A. DRAIN) AFFIRMED. Judge: MDS Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10887220] (MM) [Entered: 05/29/2018 09:07 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/[10832546] (JN) [Entered: 04/11/2018 11:10 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO MARY M. SCHROEDER, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and GERSHWIN A. DRAIN. [10831642] (JFF) [Entered: 04/10/2018 03:43 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Guerino John Cento for Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw. [10782052] [16-56587] (Cento, Guerino) [Entered: 03/01/2018 06:16 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew J. Zevin, Esquire for Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw. [10781494] [16-56587] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice and certificate of service. 3/1/2018 by TYL] (Zevin, Matthew) [Entered: 02/28/2018 02:49 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Adam W. Wiers for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [10773419] [16-56587] (Wiers, Adam) [Entered: 02/22/2018 12:25 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, April 10, 2018 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 2 - Pasadena CA.View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: PASADENA Office.[10744804] (DJW) [Entered: 01/30/2018 03:06 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 12/07/2016 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [10207677] (VS) [Entered: 11/22/2016 03:56 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Guerino John Cento for Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw. Date of service: 11/02/2016. [10182671] [16-56587] (Cento, Guerino) [Entered: 11/02/2016 07:07 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/31/2016. [10180376] [16-56587] (Zevin, Matthew) [Entered: 10/31/2016 03:05 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam W. Wiers for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 10/26/2016. [10173971] [16-56587] (Wiers, Adam) [Entered: 10/26/2016 09:01 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/01/2016. Transcript ordered by 11/23/2016. Transcript due 12/23/2016. Appellants Kenneth Coke, Raymond Rydman and John T. Shaw opening brief due 02/01/2017. Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answering brief due 03/03/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10172563] (IV) [Entered: 10/25/2016 10:44 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?