Dixon v. Toyota of New Orleans
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00111

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 3:24 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER and REASONS granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; all claims against TMCC in this matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/10/2017. (blg)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Docket Call
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Request for Summons Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Set Hearings
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?