HCR Manor Care, Inc. v. Mary Youngblood
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2376

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:26 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF by Appellee Mary Beth Youngblood in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/24/2017. [1000030684] [16-2376] Douglas Chaffin
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/25/2017. [1000010372] [16-2376] Charles Printz
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF by Appellants HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/25/2017. [1000010365] [16-2376] Charles Printz
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by J. Tyler Mayhew for HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg.[999997608] [16-2376] Jonathan Mayhew
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Michael J. Fuller for Mary Beth Youngblood filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Requested document due 01/19/2017, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Requested document due 01/19/2017. Mailed to: Fuller. [16-2376] (TF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER filed [999997438] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/25/2017. Response brief due 02/24/2017 Copies to all parties.. [16-2376] (TF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Mary Beth Youngblood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999997421] [16-2376] Douglas Chaffin
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by D. Bryant Chaffin for Mary Beth Youngblood.[999997408] [16-2376] Douglas Chaffin
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-2376] (LP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Michael J. Fuller for Appellee Mary Beth Youngblood re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 01/03/2017 from Michael J. Fuller, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Mary Beth Youngblood on 01/03/2017. Mailed to: Fuller. [16-2376] (TF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999988588] [16-2376] Charles Printz
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999988585] [16-2376] Charles Printz
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg. [16-2376] Charles Printz
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Charles F. Printz, Jr. for HCR Manor Care, Inc. and Heartland of Martinsburg.[999988570] [16-2376] Charles Printz
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Fuller, Mayhew. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/11/2017. Response Brief due 02/10/2017 [16-2376] (TF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00032-GMG. Mailed to: Fuller, Mayhew. [16-2376] (TF)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00032-GMG. Case manager: TFischer. [16-2376] (TF)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?