Fabletics, LLC v. Landmark Technology LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00075

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 20, 2017 at 8:56 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fabletics, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcel F. De Armas +1 415 944 9789 mdearmas@mcolawoffices.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Edward Mitchell +1 415 766 3515 +1 415 402 0058 brian.mitchell@mcolawoffices.com
v.
No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/8/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Case assigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?