Catuara v. Heavner Handegan, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00563
District Judge Joan B. Gottschall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2017 at 6:04 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chad F Catuara, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chad F Catuara

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad F Catuara +1 708 597 1873
v.
No Logo Craig S Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
No Logo Heavner, Handegan, Scott & Beyers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Mitchell +1 847 605 6840 +1 212 277 6501 jeffrey.mitchell@zurichna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konicek & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francis Konicek +1 630 262 9655 dan@konicekdillonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowis & Gellen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Katherine Wendlinger +1 312 364 2500 mwendlinger@lowis-gellen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, Smith & Amundsen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Lynn Maloney +1 312 894 3200
No Logo J Gregory Scott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Mitchell +1 847 605 6840 +1 212 277 6501 jeffrey.mitchell@zurichna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konicek & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francis Konicek +1 630 262 9655 dan@konicekdillonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowis & Gellen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Katherine Wendlinger +1 312 364 2500 mwendlinger@lowis-gellen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, Smith & Amundsen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Lynn Maloney +1 312 894 3200
No Logo Jason Doe, Defendant
No Logo Julie Beyers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Mitchell +1 847 605 6840 +1 212 277 6501 jeffrey.mitchell@zurichna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konicek & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francis Konicek +1 630 262 9655 dan@konicekdillonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowis & Gellen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Katherine Wendlinger +1 312 364 2500 mwendlinger@lowis-gellen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, Smith & Amundsen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Lynn Maloney +1 312 894 3200
No Logo Kerry K Killinger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
No Logo Nancy M Handegan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Mitchell +1 847 605 6840 +1 212 277 6501 jeffrey.mitchell@zurichna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konicek & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francis Konicek +1 630 262 9655 dan@konicekdillonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowis & Gellen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Katherine Wendlinger +1 312 364 2500 mwendlinger@lowis-gellen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, Smith & Amundsen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Lynn Maloney +1 312 894 3200
No Logo Richard L Heavner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T. Mitchell +1 847 605 6840 +1 212 277 6501 jeffrey.mitchell@zurichna.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konicek & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francis Konicek +1 630 262 9655 dan@konicekdillonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowis & Gellen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Katherine Wendlinger +1 312 364 2500 mwendlinger@lowis-gellen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, Smith & Amundsen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy Lynn Maloney +1 312 894 3200
No Logo Robert H Miles, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
No Logo Thomas, Casey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
Washington Mutual Bank, FA Washington Mutual Bank, FA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
No Logo William A Longbrake, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R. Sup +1 312 382 6954 bsup@fdic.gov
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE ORDER of 4/21/04 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Enter order on remand. As directed by the Seventh Circuit in its order of 12/03/03, the court hereby dismisses this case as moot. Case terminated. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFIED COPY of order from the 7th Circuit: The state court's judgment of foreclosure and sale renders the appellant's appeal seeking a stay of the state foreclosure proceedings moot. Accordingly, the district court's order is vacated and this case is remanded with instructions that the district court dismiss it as moot. See United States v. Musingwear, Inc. 340 U.S. 36, 39 (1950) (03-2641). (lc) Modified on 12/03/2003 (Entered: 12/03/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      LETTER from the 7th Circuit returning the record on appeal no. 03-2641 consisting of: One volume of pleadings and one volume of exhibits. (lc) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ENTERED JUDGMENT (lc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MINUTE ORDER of 10/31/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Hearing held. The court hereby dismisses this matter as moot pursuant to Seventh Circuit order decided 10/27/03. All motions are terminated as moot. Case termanatied, terminating case. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION by defendant WA Mtl Bk FA to quash the subpoena to produce documents and stay discovery (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION by plaintiff for Washington Mutual defendant to comply and compel production of documents (Attachment); Notice with Verified affidavit. (lc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION by plaintiff for judgment as a matter of law (Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(A) . (lc) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MANDATORY JUDICIAL NOTICE NO. 2 by plaintiff; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY by defendants Heavner Handegan, Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers in support of motion for summary judgment [42-1] (lc) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      OPPOSITION by defendants to plaintiff's LR 56.1(b)(3)(B) statement of additional facts; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MINUTE ORDER of 8/1/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file a Rule 56 reply to defendant's motion for summary judgment to the date it is received by the Clerk of Court through the U.S. mail is granted [50-1]. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION by plaintiff for extension of time to file reply to defendant's motion for summary judgment (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY by plaintiff to defendants' motion for summary judgement [42-1]/counter motion for summary judgement; supporting memorandum; 56.1(b)(3) reply (49-1 through 49-3); Notice. (aga) Modified on 08/01/2003 (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY by defendants in support to their motion to dismiss [22-1]; Notice (cdy) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Heavner Handegan, Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers by Stacy Lynn Maloney, Michelle Katherine Ross; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in reply to defendants' 05/02/03 reply [29-1]; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MINUTE ORDER of 6/27/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Answer brief to defendants' motion for summary judgment due 07/25/03 [42-1]. Reply to answer brief due 8/8/03. Ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment will be by mail. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file instanter, Judicial notice; Notice of non-waiver of unalienable rights is granted [43-1]. Plaintiff is given leave to file supplemental response to Washington Mutual's reply filed 05/02/03 on or before 07/14/03. Defendant may file supplemental reply on or before 07/28/03. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      JUDICIAL NOTICE by plaintiff; Notice of non-wavier of unalienable rights. (lc) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file instanter ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION by defendants for summary judgment ; Memorandum in support (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CERTIFICATE by plaintiff not requesting transcripts; Notice. (ntf) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 40 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE by plaintiff of harmless errors and deficiencies (Attachments). (ntf) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal [38-1] USCA 03-2641. (aga) (Entered: 06/23/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Chad F Catuara from motion to reconsider order of 05/08/03 denying plaintiff's motion to stay [35-1], from motion minute order [36-1] ( Fee Due)Notice (dj) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY by defendants Heavner Handegan, Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers in support of motion to dismiss. (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 5/20/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Plaintiff's motion to reconsider the order of 05/08/03 denying plaintiff's motion to stay is denied [35-1]. The court carefully considered each of the objections raised by plaintiff, but found that none of them justifies reconsideration. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION by plaintiff to reconsider order of 05/08/03 denying plaintiff's motion to stay ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 5/20/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Motion by defendants to file reply in support of motion to dismiss instanter is granted [33-1]. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION by defendants Heavner Handegan, Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers for leave to file, instanter ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 5/8/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Plaintiff's motion to stay Circuit Court of Cook County foreclosure complaint is denied [20-1]. (Entered Order.) Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file, instanter (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants WA Mtl Bk FA, Kerry K Killinger, Thomas Casey, William A Longbrake, Craig S Davis, Robert H Miles by Arika Joy Osacky (lc) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    REPLY by defendant WA Mtl Bk FA to plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's motion to dismiss [28-1]; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff to strike defendant's motion to dismiss ; Memorandum in support (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE by defendants Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Kerry K. Killinger, Thomas Casey, William A. Longbrake, Craig S. Davis, Robert H. Miles to motion to stay Circuit Court of Cook County foreclosure complaint case no. 02ch01197 [20-1] (Attachments); Notice (cdy) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 3/28/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Motion by defendants for leave to file their motion to dismiss and answer instanter is granted [24-1]. Plaintiff's response is due by 04/22/03. Defendants' reply is due by 05/02/03. No appearance is required on 03/31/03 at 9:30a.m. Please note that Judge Joan B. Gottschall requires that motions are noticed up for the days that she hears motions which are Wednesday and Friday with three business days notice. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION by defendant Heavner Handegan to dismiss counts I-11, IV-XI, IVX-XVI, XX-XXI ; Memorandum in support. (lc) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION by defendant Heavner Handegan for leave to file, instanter ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ANSWER by defendants Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers to count III of plaintiff's complaint [1-1]; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION by defendants WA Mtl Bk FA, Kerry K Killinger, Thomas Casey, William A Longbrake, Craig S Davis, Robert H Miles to dismiss case ; Memorandum in support; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 3/19/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Plaintiff's motion to stay Circuit Court of Cook County foreclosure complaint, case no. 02 CH 01197 is entered [20-1]. Defendant's response to said motion is due by 4/2/03. Ruling by mail. Defendant is to file its motion to dismiss the complaint by 03/21/03. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss is due by 04/18/03. Defendant's reply is due by 05/02/03. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff to stay Circuit Court of Cook County foreclosure complaint case no. 02ch01197 (Attachment); Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 3/7/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Defendants' motion for extension of time to 03/20/03 to answer or otherwise plead is granted [18-1]. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION by defendants WA Mtl Bk FA, Kerry K Killinger, Thomas Casey, William A Longbrake, Craig S Davis, Robert H Miles for extension of time to answer plaintiffs' complaint ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Richard L Heavner 02/24/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant WA Mtl Bk FA on 02/13/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Kerry K Killinger on 02/10/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Thomas Casey on 02/13/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant William A Longbrake on 02/13/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Craig S Davis on 02/13/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Robert H Miles on 02/13/03 (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 2/28/03 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Defendant's motion for an extension of time to 03/20/03 to file their responsive pleadings to plaintiff's complaint is granted [9-1]. Mailed notice (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Heavner Handegan for an extension fo time to answer complaint ; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants WA Mtl Bk FA, Kerry K Killinger, Thomas Casey, William A Longbrake, Craig S Davis, Robert H Miles by Edward Sidney Weil, Patrick Thomas Stanton, Bryan R. Sup (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Heavner Handegan, Richard L Heavner, Nancy M Handegan, J Gregory Scott, Julie Beyers by Daniel Francis Konicek, Jeffrey T. Mitchell; Notice (lc) (Entered: 02/26/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Julie Beyers on 02/11/03 (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant J Gregory Scott on 02/11/03 (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Heavner Handegan on 02/11/03 (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendant Nancy M Handegan on 02/11/03 (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS by plaintiff. (lc) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT; jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Pro Se Appearance by plaintiff (Eleven original and eleven copies summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (hp) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?