Alegent Health - Immanuel Med v. Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-5134

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 9:56 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207631794 Unknown Document Type
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207631560 Unknown Document Type
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207619620 Unknown Document Type
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608761 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1501191] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608731 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1501182] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608728 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1501181] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608725 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1501180] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608719 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1501178] by Peter C. Pfaffenroth and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee Sylvia Mathews Burwell. [14-5134] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608716 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1501177] by Sylvia Mathews Burwell [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] [14-5134] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608672 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1501162] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608669 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1501161] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center [Service Date: 07/07/2014 ] [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207608605 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1501133] by Christopher L. Crosswhite on behalf of Appellant Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center. [14-5134] (Crosswhite, Christopher)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599906 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CLERK'S ORDER filed [1496375] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/07/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/21/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 07/07/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/07/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/07/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/21/2014 [14-5134]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207599901 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1496372] by Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-00812-RJL. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-5134]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 80 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?