American Civil Liberties Union v. United States
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-445

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 2:58 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3895 - Statutes: FOIA 1974
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Permanent link to multimedia source cited in opinion, ATTACHED.[1319034] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 09/12/2014 04:06 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ERRATA ORDER, dated 08/25/2014, to implement additional revisions to the revised opinion filed June 23, 2014, as ordered by the opinions filed July 10, 2014, and August 11, 2014, denying the petition for rehearing (with respect to the bifurcated Vaughn index issues), the June 23, 2014, revised opinion is further revised, by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1304033] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/25/2014 03:31 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1297823] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/18/2014 04:05 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER, petition for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[1297797] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/18/2014 03:53 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION, PETITION FOR REHEARING DENIED, Supplemental request for additional redactions from the Vaughn index granted in part and denied in part; by JON, JAC, RSP, FILED.[1291146] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 08/11/2014 09:18 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1281201] [13-445] [Entered: 07/28/2014 04:41 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to submit ex parte and in camera, two supplemental declarations, one classified and privileged, in support of their pending petition for rehearing en banc [228] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice, by RAK, FILED. [1279999][235] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/25/2014 04:18 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file document [228], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation in 13-422, 13-445, FILED. Service date 07/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1279698][230] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/25/2014 01:00 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice in 13-422, Appellee Central Intelligence Agency, United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice in 13-445, FILED. Service date 07/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1278045] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/23/2014 07:24 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1275701] [13-422, 13-445] [Entered: 07/21/2014 03:07 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136303] [13-445]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DAVIS WRIGHT, with fee, RECEIVED.[1081741] [13-422, 13-445]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079359] [13-422, 13-445]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion for permission to file an ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission to address questions posed at oral argument [137] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense, by JAC, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1069888][149] [13-422, 13-445]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069511] [13-445]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument [137], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1065578][142] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument, [137], on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 10/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064871][141] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?