Dede Stratton v. Portfolio Recovery Associates
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 16-5468

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 5:32 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Dede Stratton by James H. Lawson. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2016. (JRM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REDACTED APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert Brooks Herrick for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Certificate of Service:08/23/2016. Argument Request: not requested.--[Edited 08/24/2016 by LMN] (RBH)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REDACTED REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Trevor Wayne Wells for Appellant Dede Stratton. Certificate of Service:08/15/2016.--[Edited 08/15/2016 by LMN] (TWW)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REDACTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Trevor Wayne Wells for Dede Stratton. Certificate of Service:08/08/2016. Argument Request: requested.--[Edited 08/08/2016 by LMN] (TWW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER filed : The motion to seal is GRANTED in part. Stratton’s brief may be filed under seal provided that, within seven days of the entry of this order, a public version of the brief is filed, redacting only the confidential information that is sealed in the district court and has otherwise not been disclosed to the public. If either Portfolio’s brief or the reply brief refer to such information, those briefs may also be filed under seal, provided that a public version redacting the confidential information is filed. Should either party wish for this court’s opinion to be sealed or redacted, either in whole or in part, a separate motion must be filed, which will be considered by the panel that will be assigned to decide the merits of the appeal. Entered by order of the court. (LMN)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION filed by Mr. Robert Brooks Herrick for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC to seal brief. Certificate of Service: 07/29/2016. (RBH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by Robert Brooks Herrick. Certificate of Service: 07/28/2016. (RBH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 27 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?