Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00539
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 9:19 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Leukosite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Takeda Ventures, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
v.
No Logo Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Defendant
Officer/Director, Curis, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit - re 17 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. USCA Case Number 16-1009 (mdb) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc. Transcripts Already on File (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 15 Judgment, (and the Final Judgment (D.I. 150), the Court's August 20, 2015 Memorandum Opinion (D.I. 148) and Order (D.I. 149) in Civil Action 12-1011). Appeal filed by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (mdb) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          JUDGMENT - re 13 Proposed Judgment: That claims 20, 31, 49, and 53 of U.S. Patent No. 6,713,446 are invalid due to obviousness; That all claims and counterclaims in this action relating to any claim other than claims 20, 31, 49, and 53 of U.S. Patent No. 6,713,446 are dismissed with prejudice; That the parties shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/23/2015. (mdb) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            SO ORDERED - re 13 Stipulation Requesting Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/23/2015. (mdb) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION Requesting Entry of Judgment by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/26/2015. (asw) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Louis H. Weinstein - filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Weinstein Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. for Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to September 16, 2015 - filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DECLARATION of Mailing (as to service on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.) by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. served on 6/26/2015, answer due 7/17/2015. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: adding Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited to Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc., as Corporate Parent filed by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (sar) Modified on 6/26/2015 (rwc). (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,713,446 B2; 6,958,319 B2;. (sar) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: May 22, 2015. Date of Expiration of Patent: January 25, 2022.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/22/2017. (sar) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COMPLAINT filed against Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1745821.) - filed by Millennium Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?